Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2731587 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2731587



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 332
12.07.2012 Priority document (RO-procedure) PCT receiving Office 36
12.07.2012 Drawings PCT receiving Office 1
12.07.2012 Description PCT receiving Office 22
12.07.2012 Claims PCT receiving Office 2
12.07.2012 Abstract PCT receiving Office 1
12.07.2012 (Electronic) Receipt PCT receiving Office 2
07.09.2012 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
07.09.2012 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
07.09.2012 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
02.10.2012 Document concerning representation PCT receiving Office 5
24.01.2013 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 27
24.01.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
13.02.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 37
29.11.2013 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
19.12.2013 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 4
19.12.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
09.01.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
09.01.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
06.02.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 5
15.02.2014 Priority search results copy provided by EPO Search / examination 5
19.02.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
19.02.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
19.02.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
19.02.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
21.02.2014 Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
24.04.2014 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
20.08.2014 Reply to Written Opinion prepared by the EPO Search / examination 4
20.08.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
20.08.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
26.08.2014 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
26.08.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
26.08.2014 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 4
26.08.2014 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
26.08.2014 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
26.08.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
31.07.2015 Examination started Search / examination 1
13.08.2015 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
13.08.2015 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
14.09.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
23.09.2015 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
07.10.2015 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
07.10.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
07.10.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
12.10.2015 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
11.02.2016 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
11.02.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
11.02.2016 Claims Search / examination 3
11.02.2016 Claims Search / examination 3
11.02.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
11.02.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
11.02.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
30.03.2016 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
13.04.2016 CDS Clean up - amended applicant details Search / examination 1
31.05.2016 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 2
09.06.2016 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 7
14.06.2016 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
24.05.2017 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
24.05.2017 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
31.05.2017 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
31.05.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
31.05.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
07.06.2017 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 2
23.11.2017 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
23.11.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
23.11.2017 Description Search / examination 31
23.11.2017 Claims Search / examination 3
23.11.2017 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 32
23.11.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
23.11.2017 Abstract Search / examination 1
23.11.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
19.09.2018 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
19.09.2018 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
03.01.2019 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
03.01.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
03.01.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
08.01.2019 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 2
15.03.2019 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
15.03.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
15.03.2019 Claims Search / examination 3
15.03.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
15.03.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1