blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2731587 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2731587



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 332
15.03.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
15.03.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
15.03.2019 Claims Search / examination 3
15.03.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
15.03.2019 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
08.01.2019 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 2
03.01.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
03.01.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
03.01.2019 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
19.09.2018 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
19.09.2018 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
23.11.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
23.11.2017 Abstract Search / examination 1
23.11.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
23.11.2017 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 32
23.11.2017 Claims Search / examination 3
23.11.2017 Description Search / examination 31
23.11.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
23.11.2017 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
07.06.2017 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 2
31.05.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
31.05.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
31.05.2017 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
24.05.2017 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
24.05.2017 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
14.06.2016 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
09.06.2016 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 7
31.05.2016 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 2
13.04.2016 CDS Clean up - amended applicant details Search / examination 1
30.03.2016 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
11.02.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
11.02.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
11.02.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
11.02.2016 Claims Search / examination 3
11.02.2016 Claims Search / examination 3
11.02.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
11.02.2016 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
12.10.2015 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
07.10.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
07.10.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
07.10.2015 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
23.09.2015 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
14.09.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
13.08.2015 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
13.08.2015 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
31.07.2015 Examination started Search / examination 1
26.08.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
26.08.2014 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
26.08.2014 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
26.08.2014 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 4
26.08.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
26.08.2014 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
20.08.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
20.08.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
20.08.2014 Reply to Written Opinion prepared by the EPO Search / examination 4
24.04.2014 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
21.02.2014 Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
19.02.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
19.02.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
19.02.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
19.02.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
15.02.2014 Priority search results copy provided by EPO Search / examination 5
06.02.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 5
09.01.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
09.01.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
19.12.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
19.12.2013 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 4
29.11.2013 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
13.02.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 37
24.01.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
24.01.2013 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 27
02.10.2012 Document concerning representation PCT receiving Office 5
07.09.2012 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
07.09.2012 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
07.09.2012 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
12.07.2012 (Electronic) Receipt PCT receiving Office 2
12.07.2012 Abstract PCT receiving Office 1
12.07.2012 Claims PCT receiving Office 2
12.07.2012 Description PCT receiving Office 22
12.07.2012 Drawings PCT receiving Office 1
12.07.2012 Priority document (RO-procedure) PCT receiving Office 36