blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2731587


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
29.07.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
16.03.2019 New entry: Reply to examination report
04.01.2019 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
01.10.2018 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
31.07.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
24.11.2017 New entry: Reply to examination report
27.07.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
02.06.2017 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
02.06.2017 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
26.07.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
10.06.2016 Change - representative
12.02.2016 New entry: Reply to examination report
07.10.2015 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
19.09.2015 Change - representative
24.08.2015 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
14.08.2015 First examination report
27.07.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
19.09.2014 Change - extension states published on  22.10.2014  [2014/43]
30.08.2014 Amendment by applicant
26.08.2014 Amendment by applicant
26.07.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
18.04.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  21.05.2014  [2014/21]
18.04.2014 Request for examination filed published on  21.05.2014  [2014/21]
22.01.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
21.01.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
20.12.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
05.02.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
25.01.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
04.09.2012 PCT data prior to European publication
03.08.2012 PCT data prior to European publication