blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2731587 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201280035030 EP12738429



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9168303Global Dossier 27.10.2015B2
US2014154293 05.06.2014A1
Priority number Date
WO2012EP63702 12.07.2012
EP11174103 15.07.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP6010120BGlobal Dossier 19.10.2016B2
JP2014520871 25.08.2014A
Priority number Date
WO2012EP63702 12.07.2012
EP11174103 15.07.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN103648482BGlobal Dossier 02.01.2018B
CN103648482 19.03.2014A
Priority number Date
WO2012EP63702 12.07.2012
EP11174103 15.07.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2731587Global Dossier 21.05.2014A1
Priority number Date
WO2012EP63702 12.07.2012
EP11174103 15.07.2011
EP12738429 12.07.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2013010915Global Dossier 24.01.2013A1
Priority number Date
EP11174103 15.07.2011