Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2731587

EP2731587 - INTRAVAGINAL DELIVERY SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  02.06.2017
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip29.07.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Universiteit Gent
Sint-Pietersnieuwstraat 25
9000 Gent / BE
[N/P]
Former [2014/21]For all designated states
Universiteit Gent
Sint-Pietersnieuwstraat 25
9000 Gent / BE
Inventor(s)01 / REMON, Jean Paul
John Youngestraat 14
B-9090 Melle / BE
02 / VERVAET, Chris
Pieter Pruimstraat 11
B-8870 Kachtem / BE
03 / VERSTRAELEN, Hans
Cornelius Sneyssenslaan 124
B-9820 Merelbeke / BE
04 / TEMMERMAN, Marleen
Rechtstraat 32
B-9160 Eksaarde / BE
 [2014/21]
Representative(s)LC Patents
Kempische Steenweg 542A
3500 Hasselt / BE
[N/P]
Former [2014/21]Laenen, Bart Roger Albert
LC Patents Crutzenstraat 26
3500 Hasselt / BE
Application number, filing date12738429.512.07.2012
WO2012EP63702
Priority number, dateEP2011017410315.07.2011         Original published format: EP 11174103
[2014/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013010915
Date:24.01.2013
Language:EN
[2013/04]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2731587
Date:21.05.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.01.2013
[2014/21]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP24.01.2013
ClassificationInternational:A61K9/00, A61K31/00
[2014/21]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/21]
TitleGerman:INTRAVAGINALES FREISETZUNGSSYSTEM[2014/21]
English:INTRAVAGINAL DELIVERY SYSTEM[2014/21]
French:SYSTÈME D'ADMINISTRATION VAGINALE[2014/21]
Entry into regional phase09.01.2014National basic fee paid 
09.01.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
09.01.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.01.2014Examination requested  [2014/21]
26.08.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.08.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.02.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.05.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.11.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.09.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.03.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  13.08.2015
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
23.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
22.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
24.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
27.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
25.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 08
Cited inInternational search[ID]WO2010133761  (BAYER SCHERING PHARMA OY [FI]; TALLING CHRISTINE [FI]; OWENS PHILIP [D) [ID] 1-16 * claims 1-9 *;
 [YD]US2007196433  (RON EYAL S [US] ET AL) [YD] 1-16 * example 1 * * claims 1-23 *;
 [YD]WO2009066006  (BAYER SCHERING PHARMA OY [FI]; TALLING CHRISTINE [FI]; HANES VLADIMIR) [YD] 1-16 * claims 1-21 *
by applicantWO2006065873
 US2007196433
 WO2009066006
 WO2010133761
    - ADRIAENS, E.; REMON, J.P., "Gastropods as an evaluation tool for screening the irritating potency of absorption enhancers and drugs", PHARM. RES., (1999), vol. 16, pages 1240 - 1244
    - ADRIAENS, E.; DIERCKENS, K.; BAUTERS, T.G.M.; NELIS, H.J.; VAN GOETHEM, F.; VANPARYS, P.; REMON, J.P., "The mucosal toxicity of different benzalkonium chloride analogues with an alternative test using slugs", PHARM. RES., (2001), vol. 18, pages 937 - 942
    - ADRIAENS E.; REMON J.P., "The evaluation of an alternative mucosal irritation test using slugs", TOX. APPL. PHARM., (2002), vol. 182, pages 169 - 175
    - ADRIAENS, E.; AMEYE, D.; DHONDT, M. M. M.; FOREMAN, P.; REMON, J. P, "Evaluation of the mucosal irritation potency of co-spray dried Amioca/Poly(Acrylic Acid) and Amioca/Carbopol 974P mixtures", J. CONTROL. RELEASE, (2003), vol. 88, no. 3, doi:doi:10.1016/S0168-3659(03)00012-9, pages 393 - 399, XP004414809

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0168-3659(03)00012-9
    - ADRIAENS, E.; DHONDT, M.M.M.; REMON, J.P., "Refinement of the Slug Mucosal Irritation test as an alternative screening test for eye irritation", TOXICOL. IN VITRO, (2005), vol. 19, no. 1, pages 79 - 89, XP027831745
    - ANDERSCH B.; LINDELL D.; BRANDBERG A., "Bacterial Vaginosis and the effect of intermittent prophylactic treatment with an acid lactate gel", GYNACOL OBSTET INVEST, (1990), vol. 30, pages 114 - 119
    - ARGEMI A.; ELLIS J.L.; SAURINA J.; TOMASKO D.L., "Development of a polymeric patch impregnated with naproxen as a model of transdermal sustained release system", J. PHARM SCI, (2011), vol. 100, pages 992 - 1000
    - BHATT H.R.; GURNASINGHANI M.L.; DATTANI K.K.; LALLA J.K., "Controlled release nitroglycerin capsules", J. OF CONTROLLED RELEASE, (1989), vol. 9, no. 1, doi:doi:10.1016/0168-3659(89)90032-1, pages 43 - 55, XP025484347

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0168-3659(89)90032-1
    - BOSKEY E.R.; CONE R.A.; WHALEY K.J.; MOENCH T.R., "Origins of vaginal acidity: high D/L lactate ratio is consistent with bacteria being the primary source", HUMAN REPRODUCTION, (2001), vol. 16, no. 9, doi:doi:10.1093/humrep/16.9.1809, pages 1809 - 1813, XP055072120

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/humrep/16.9.1809
    - CALLENS, C.; ADRIAENS, E.; DIERCKENS, K.; REMON, J.P., "Toxicological evaluation of a bioadhesive nasal powder containing a starch and carbopol 974 p on rabbit nasal mucosa and slug mucosa", J. CONTROL. REL., (2001), vol. 76, doi:doi:10.1016/S0168-3659(01)00419-9, pages 81 - 91, XP004302040

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0168-3659(01)00419-9
    - CEULEMANS J.; VERMEIRE A.; ADRIAENS E.; REMON J.P.; LUDWIG A., "Evaluation of a mucoadhesive tablet for ocular use", J. CONTROL. RELEASE, (2001), vol. 77, doi:doi:10.1016/S0168-3659(01)00522-3, pages 333 - 344, XP004328585

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0168-3659(01)00522-3
    - DHONDT, M.M.M.; ADRIAENS, E.; REMON, J.P., "The Evaluation of the local tolerance of vaginal formulations, with or without Nonoxynol-9, using the Slug Mucosal Irritation test", SEX. TRANS. DIS, (2004), vol. 31, no. 4, pages 229 - 235
    - DHONDT, M.M.M.; ADRIAENS, E.; VAN ROEY, J.; REMON, J.P, "Evaluation of the local tolerance of vaginal formulations containing TMC 120 using rabbits and slugs", EUR. J. PHARM. BIOPHARM., (2005), vol. 60, pages 419 - 425
    - DRAIZE, J.H.; WOODWARD, G.; CALVERY, H.O., "Methods for the study of irritation and toxicity of substances applied to the skin and mucous membranes", J. PHARMACOL. EXP. THER., (1944), vol. 82, page 377
    - HARVEY, M. D.; BABLEKIS, V.; BANKS, P. R.; SKINNER, C. D., "Utilization of the non-covalent fluorescent dye, NanoOrange, as a potential clinical diagnostic tool - Nanomolar human serum albumin quantitation", J. CHROMATOGR. B, (2001), vol. 754, doi:doi:10.1016/S0378-4347(00)00627-7, pages 345 - 356, XP004232819

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0378-4347(00)00627-7
    - WEYENBERG, W.; VERMEIRE, A.; DHONDT, M.M.M; ADRIAENS, E.; KESTELYN, P.; REMON, J.P.; LUDWIG, A., "Ocular bioerodible minitablets as strategy for the managementof microbial keratitis", INVESTIGATIVE OPHTHALMOLOGY & VISUAL SCIENCE, (2004), vol. 45, no. 9, pages 3229 - 3233