Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2734842

EP2734842 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR LATERAL FLOW AFFINITY ASSAYS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.11.2016
Database last updated on 23.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip25.11.2016No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 28.12.2016  [2016/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Bio Nano Centre Limited
The Gridiron Building
One Pancras Square
London
N1C 4AG / GB
[2015/24]
Former [2014/22]For all designated states
The Bio Nano Centre Limited
338 Euston Road
London NW1 3BT / GB
Inventor(s)01 / CASS, Anthony Edward George
Bio Nano Consulting
338 Euston Road
London NW1 3BT / GB
02 / CELAYA SANFIZ, Almudena
Bio Nano Consulting
338 Euston Road
London NW1 3BT / GB
03 / REHAK, Marian
Bio Nano Consulting
338 Euston Road
London NW1 3BT / GB
 [2014/49]
Former [2014/22]01 / CASS, Anthony Edward George
Bio Nano Consulting
338 Euston Road
London NW1 3BT / GB
02 / CELAYA, Sanfiz Almudena
Bio Nano Consulting
338 Euston Road
London NW1 3BT / GB
03 / REHAK, Marian
Bio Nano Consulting
338 Euston Road
London NW1 3BT / GB
Representative(s)Gill Jennings & Every LLP
The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/22]Clarke, Lionel Paul
Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
Application number, filing date12738592.019.07.2012
[2016/03]
WO2012GB51733
Priority number, dateGB2011001239519.07.2011         Original published format: GB 201112395
[2014/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2013011323
Date:24.01.2013
Language:EN
[2013/04]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2734842
Date:28.05.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.01.2013
[2014/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2734842
Date:20.01.2016
Language:EN
[2016/03]
International and Supplementary
search report(s)
International search report -
published on:
EP07.03.2013
ClassificationInternational:G01N33/543, G01N33/558
[2014/22]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/22]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN FÜR AFFINITÄTS QUERFLUSSASSAY[2014/48]
English:APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR LATERAL FLOW AFFINITY ASSAYS[2014/22]
French:APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ UTILISÉS POUR RÉALISER DES DOSAGES D'AFFINITÉ[2014/22]
Former [2014/22]VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN FÜR AFFINITÄTSASSAYS
Entry into regional phase07.02.2014National basic fee paid 
07.02.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
07.02.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.02.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.02.2014Examination requested  [2014/22]
17.04.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.07.2015Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
23.07.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.11.2015Fee for grant paid
19.11.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
19.11.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  17.04.2015
Opposition(s)21.10.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
10.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipEE20.01.2016
HR20.01.2016
LT20.01.2016
LV20.01.2016
PL20.01.2016
RO20.01.2016
RS20.01.2016
SK20.01.2016
SM20.01.2016
NO20.04.2016
GR21.04.2016
IS20.05.2016
PT20.05.2016
[2016/50]
Former [2016/49]EE20.01.2016
HR20.01.2016
LT20.01.2016
LV20.01.2016
PL20.01.2016
RS20.01.2016
NO20.04.2016
GR21.04.2016
IS20.05.2016
PT20.05.2016
Former [2016/39]HR20.01.2016
LT20.01.2016
LV20.01.2016
PL20.01.2016
RS20.01.2016
NO20.04.2016
GR21.04.2016
IS20.05.2016
PT20.05.2016
Former [2016/38]HR20.01.2016
LT20.01.2016
PL20.01.2016
NO20.04.2016
GR21.04.2016
IS20.05.2016
PT20.05.2016
Former [2016/36]HR20.01.2016
LT20.01.2016
PL20.01.2016
NO20.04.2016
GR21.04.2016
Former [2016/35]HR20.01.2016
NO20.04.2016
GR21.04.2016
Cited inInternational search[A]US2005170405  (UTSUNOMIYA NORIHIKO [JP]) [A] 1-22 * paragraph [0062]; figure 1 *;
 [A]US2003077642  (FRITSCH INGRID [US], et al) [A] 1-22 * figure 5; claims 7-9 *
by applicant   US2010267166 A1 20101021