blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2726600

EP2726600 - MAMMALIAN CELL CULTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  08.08.2023
Database last updated on 17.05.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  13.01.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  04.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip11.08.2023Revocation of patentpublished on 13.09.2023  [2023/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Amgen Inc.
One Amgen Center Drive
Thousand Oaks, California 91320 / US
[2014/19]
Inventor(s)01 / FOLLSTAD, Brian, D.
3414 42nd Avenue West
Seattle, Washington 98199 / US
02 / MCCOY, Rebecca, E.
9884 SE Southworth Drive
Port Orchard, Washington 98366 / US
03 / MORRIS, Arvia, E.
4535 Thackeray Place NE
Seattle, Washington 98105 / US
 [2014/19]
Representative(s)Uexküll & Stolberg
Partnerschaft von
Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Beselerstraße 4
22607 Hamburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2017/07]Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
Former [2014/19]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
Application number, filing date12738674.629.06.2012
[2017/07]
WO2012US45070
Priority number, dateUS201161503737P01.07.2011         Original published format: US 201161503737 P
[2014/19]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report
No.:WO2013006479
Date:10.01.2013
Language:EN
[2013/02]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2726600
Date:07.05.2014
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.01.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2014/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2726600
Date:15.02.2017
Language:EN
[2017/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.03.2013
ClassificationIPC:C12P21/02, C12N5/00, C12P21/00, C07K16/00
[2016/34]
CPC:
C07K16/00 (EP,IL,KR,US); C12N5/0037 (EP,IL,KR,US); C07K1/14 (IL,US);
C12N5/0604 (IL,US); C12P21/00 (IL,US); C12P21/02 (EP,IL,US);
C07K2317/14 (EP,IL,KR,US); C12N2500/02 (US); C12N2500/32 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C12N2500/99 (IL,US); C12N2510/02 (EP,IL,US); C12N2523/00 (EP,IL,US) (-)
Former IPC [2014/19]C12N5/00, C12N5/10, C12P21/00, C07K16/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/19]
Extension statesBA24.01.2014
ME24.01.2014
TitleGerman:SÄUGETIERZELLKULTUR[2014/19]
English:MAMMALIAN CELL CULTURE[2014/19]
French:CULTURE DE CELLULES MAMMIFÈRES[2014/19]
Entry into regional phase24.01.2014National basic fee paid 
24.01.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
24.01.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.01.2014Examination requested  [2014/19]
25.08.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.07.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.12.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.08.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.12.2016Fee for grant paid
23.12.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
23.12.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP14187232.5  / EP2837680
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  27.07.2015
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  15.11.2017    ADMISSIBLE
Strawman Limited
Orchard Lea
Horns Lane
Combe, Witney
Oxfordshire OX29 8NH / GB
Opponent's representative
Potter Clarkson
Chapel Quarter
Mount Street
Nottingham NG1 6HQ / GB
 [N/P]
Former [2017/51]
Opponent(s)01  15.11.2017    ADMISSIBLE
Strawman Limited
Orchard Lea
Horns Lane
Combe, Witney
Oxfordshire OX29 8NH / GB
Opponent's representative
Potter Clarkson LLP
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
19.12.2017Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
30.04.2018Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
15.05.2019Date of oral proceedings
09.07.2019Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
09.07.2019Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
06.10.2022Legal effect of revocation of patent [2023/37]
09.08.2023Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition10.09.2019Appeal received No.  T2524/19
19.11.2019Statement of grounds filed
06.10.2022Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent
09.08.2023Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal
06.10.2022Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
10.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
10.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL15.02.2017
HR15.02.2017
MK15.02.2017
RS15.02.2017
SM15.02.2017
NO15.05.2017
[2020/34]
Former [2019/51]HR15.02.2017
MK15.02.2017
RS15.02.2017
SM15.02.2017
NO15.05.2017
Former [2018/01]HR15.02.2017
RS15.02.2017
SM15.02.2017
NO15.05.2017
Former [2017/42]HR15.02.2017
RS15.02.2017
NO15.05.2017
Cited inInternational search[A]WO2006026445  (WYETH RES IRELAND LTD [IE], et al) [A] 1-11,37-41,47-50 * example 1 *;
 [A]WO2006128908  (ARES TRADING SA [CH], et al) [A] 12-24,26-50 * the whole document *;
 [A]  - CHEN Z-L ET AL, "Temperature shift as a process optimization step for the production of pro-urokinase by a recombinant Chinese hamster ovary cell line in high-density perfusion culture", JOURNAL OF BIOSCIENCE AND BIOENGINEERING, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20040101), vol. 97, no. 4, doi:10.1016/S1389-1723(04)70198-X, ISSN 1389-1723, pages 239 - 243, XP008105293 [A] 8-11 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1389-1723(04)70198-X
 [A]  - JENG-DAR YANG ET AL, "Achievement of high cell density and high antibody productivity by a controlled-fed perfusion bioreactor process", BIOTECHNOLOGY AND BIOENGINEERING, WILEY & SONS, HOBOKEN, NJ, US, vol. 69, no. 1, doi:_, ISSN 0006-3592, (20000705), pages 74 - 82, (20000515), XP002619089 [A] 1-11 * the whole document *
 [A]  - HAYTER P M ET AL, "CHINESE HAMSTER OVARY CELL GROWTH AND INTERFERON PRODUCTION KINETICS IN STIRRED BATCH CULTURE", APPLIED MICROBIOLOGY AND BIOTECHNOLOGY, SPRINGER VERLAG, BERLIN, DE, (19910101), vol. 34, doi:10.1007/BF00167898, ISSN 0175-7598, pages 559 - 564, XP001088303 [A] 1-11 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00167898
 [A]  - CHU L ET AL, "Industrial choices for protein production by large-scale cell culture", CURRENT OPINION IN BIOTECHNOLOGY, LONDON, GB, (20010101), vol. 12, doi:10.1016/S0958-1669(00)00197-X, ISSN 0958-1669, pages 180 - 187, XP003014088 [A] 1-11 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0958-1669(00)00197-X
 [AP]  - JEE YON KIM ET AL, "CHO cells in biotechnology for production of recombinant proteins: current state and further potential", APPLIED MICROBIOLOGY AND BIOTECHNOLOGY, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, (20111209), vol. 93, no. 3, doi:10.1007/S00253-011-3758-5, ISSN 1432-0614, pages 917 - 930, XP035006081 [AP] 1-11 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00253-011-3758-5
 [A]  - SAUER PAUL W ET AL, "A high-yielding, generic fed-batch cell culture process for production of recombinant antibodies", BIOTECHNOLOGY AND BIOENGINEERING, (20000305), vol. 67, no. 5, ISSN 0006-3592, pages 585 - 597, XP002690472 [A] 12-24,26-50 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1097-0290(20000305)67:5<585::AID-BIT9>3.0.CO;2-H
 [A]  - MICHAEL BUTLER, "Animal cell cultures: recent achievements and perspectives in the production of biopharmaceuticals", APPLIED MICROBIOLOGY AND BIOTECHNOLOGY, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, (20050801), vol. 68, no. 3, doi:10.1007/S00253-005-1980-8, ISSN 1432-0614, pages 283 - 291, XP019331930 [A] 12-24,26-50 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00253-005-1980-8
 [A]  - RODRIGUEZ J ET AL, "High productivity of human recombinant beta-interferon from a low-temperature perfusion culture", JOURNAL OF BIOTECHNOLOGY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 150, no. 4, doi:10.1016/J.JBIOTEC.2010.09.959, ISSN 0168-1656, (20101201), pages 509 - 518, (20101123), XP027516641 [A] 39,40 * figure 5 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jbiotec.2010.09.959
 [A]  - MATTHEW L LIPSCOMB ET AL, "Production of a secreted glycoprotein from an inducible promoter system in a perfusion bioreactor", BIOTECHNOLOGY PROGRESS, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF CHEMICAL ENGINEERS, US, vol. 20, no. 5, doi:10.1021/BP049973J, ISSN 8756-7938, (20040901), pages 1402 - 1407, (20080905), XP002623481 [A] 12-24,26-50 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bp049973j
by applicantUS4695623
 AU588819B
 US4897471
 EP0367566
 US4968607
 EP0460846
 US5075222
 US5149792
 US5272064
 WO9410308
 WO9428391
 US5395760
 WO9701633
 US5610279
 US5672502
 US5767064
 US5856296
 US5981713
 US6015938
 US6096728
 US6204363
 US6235883
 WO0136637
 US6271349
 US6337072
 US6544424
    - STETTLER, BIOTECHNOL BIOENG. DEC 20, (2006), vol. 95, no. 6, pages 1228 - 33
    - CHU; ROBINSON, CURRENT OPIN. BIOTECHNOL., (2001), vol. 12, pages 180 - 87
    - VOISARD ET AL., BIOTECHNOLOGY AND BIOENGINEERING, (2003), vol. 82, pages 751 - 65
    - FUREY, GEN. ENG. NEWS., (2002), vol. 22, no. 7, pages 62 - 63
    - KAUFMAN, R.J., LARGE SCALE MAMMALIAN CELL CULTURE, (1990), pages 15 - 69
    - BRASEL ET AL., BLOOD, (1996), vol. 88, pages 2004 - 2012
    - KAUFMAN ET AL., J. BIOL CHEM, (1988), vol. 263, pages 6352 - 6362
    - MCKINNON ET AL., J MOL ENDOCRINOL, (1991), vol. 6, pages 231 - 239
    - WOOD ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1990), vol. 145, pages 3011 - 3016
    - URLAUB ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (1980), vol. 77, pages 4216 - 4220
    - KAUFMAN R.J., METH ENZVMOL, (1990), vol. 185, pages 537 - 566
    - MAISONPIERRE ET AL., SCIENCE, (1997), vol. 277, no. 5322, pages 55 - 60
    - RUEGG; PYTELA, GENE, (1995), vol. 160, pages 257 - 62
    - The Cytokine Handbook, ACADEMIC PRESS, vol. 1, 2
    - DO; CHEN-KIANG, CYTOKINE GROWTH FACTOR REV., (2002), vol. 13, no. 1, pages 19 - 25
    - LOVEJOY ET AL., SCIENCE, (1993), vol. 259, pages 1288 - 1293
    - HARBURY ET AL., SCIENCE, (1993), vol. 262, pages 1401 - 05
    - HARBURY ET AL., NATURE, (1994), vol. 371, pages 80 - 83
    - HÅKANSSON ET AL., STRUCTURE, (1999), vol. 7, pages 255 - 64
OppositionUS6544424
 WO03083066
 WO2006026445
 WO2008063892
 WO2008154014
 WO2009023562
 WO2011014838
 US2011086411
 WO2011062926
 WO2011065940
    - WERNER et al., "Serum-free production of a chimeric E-selectin-IgG protein from 1 to 100 l scale: Repeated batch cultivation versus continuous spin filter perfusion", Cytotechnology, (20020000), vol. 38, pages 47 - 56, XP055440174

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1021145813253
    - HUANG et al., "Process development for a recombinant Chinese hamster ovary (CHO) cell line utilizing a metal induced and amplified metallothionein expression system", Biotechnology and Bioengineering, (20040921), vol. 88, no. 4, pages 437 - 450, XP008064032

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/bit.20194
    - KHATTAK et al., "Feed development for fed-batch CHO production process by semisteady state analysis", Biotechnol. Prog., (20100501), vol. 26, no. 3, pages 797 - 804, XP055440182

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/btpr.362
    - XING et al., "Optimizing amino acid composition of CHO cell culture media for a fusion protein production", Process Biochemistry, (20110329), vol. 46, pages 1423 - 1429, XP028223218

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.procbio.2011.03.014
    - KHETAN et al., "Control of misincorporation of serine for asparagine during antibody production using CHO cells", Biotechnology and Bioengineering, (20100426), vol. 107, no. 1, pages 116 - 123, XP055440189

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/bit.22771
    - STETTLER et al., "New disposable tubes for rapid and precise biomass assessment for suspension cultures of mammalian cells", Biotechnology and Bioengineering, (20061220), vol. 95, no. 6, pages 1228 - 1233, XP002439286

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/bit.21071
    - Anonymous, "Determination of biomass in suspension cell cultureswith VoluPAC tubes", VWR International, (20061201), pages 1 - 2, XP055440198
    - "Cell Discovery Research Products Catalog 2009-2010", LONZA, (20090000), XP055410650
    - HU et al., "Bioprocess development for the production of mouse-human chimeric anti-epidermal growth factor receptor vIII antibody C12 by suspension culture of recombinant Chinese hamster ovary cells", Cytotechnology, (20110501), vol. 63, no. 3, pages 247 - 258, XP055049843

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10616-011-9336-y
    - PATTERSON et al., "Effects of L-Asparagine Deprivation on the Cell Cycle of the Jensen Sarcoma", Cancer Research, (19700400), vol. 30, pages 1064 - 1067, XP055440207
    - GREC O et al., "Organization and Expression of the Cell Cycle Gene, tsll,That Encodes Asparagine Synthetase", Molecular and Cellular Biology, (19890600), vol. 9, no. 6, pages 2350 - 2359, XP055440209

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/MCB.9.6.2350
    - SEEWÖSTER et al., "Influence of tareted asparagine starvation on exra- and intracellular amino acid pools of cultivated hamster ovary cells", Appl. Microbiol Biotechnol, (19950000), vol. 44, pages 344 - 350, XP035173334

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00169927
    - MEUWLY et al., "Optimization of the medium perfusion rate in a packed-bed bioreactor charged with CHO cells", Cytotechnology, (20040901), vol. 46, no. 1, pages 37 - 47, XP019236851

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10616-005-2105-z
    - GORENFLO et al., "Scale-up and optimization of an acoustic filter for 200 L/day perfusion of a CHO cell culture", Biotechnology and Bioengineering, (20020000), vol. 80, no. 4, pages 438 - 444, XP055440282

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/bit.10386
    - KIM et al., "Application of a Cell-Once-Through Perfusion Strategy for Production of Recombinant Antibody from rCHO Cells in a Centritech Lab II Centrifuge System", Biotechnol. Prog., (20070811), vol. 23, pages 1186 - 1197, XP055440287

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bp0700861
    - FURUKAWA et al., "Enhancement of productivity of recombinant [alpha]-amidating enzyme by low temperature culture", Cytotechnology, (19990000), vol. 31, pages 85 - 94, XP019236635

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1008059803038
    - KIM et al., "Limited Use of Centritech Lab II Centrifuge in Perfusion Culture of rCHO Cells for the Production of Recombinant Antibody", Biotechnol. Prog., (20080200), vol. 24, no. 1, pages 166 - 174, XP055273688

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bp070235f
    - DOWD et al., "Optimization and control of perfusion cultures using a viable cell probe and cell specific perfusion rates", Cytotechnology, (20030500), vol. 42, no. 1, pages 35 - 45, XP019236785

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1026192228471
    - OZTURK, "Engineering challenges in high density cell culture systems", Cytotechnology, (19960000), vol. 22, pages 3 - 16, XP008062814

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00353919
    - GRIFFITHS et al., "Maximisation of perfusion systems and process comparison with batch-type cultures", Cytotechnoloy, (19920200), vol. 9, pages 3 - 9, XP055440332

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF02521726
    - GORFIEN et al., "Optimized Nutrient Additives for Fed-Batch Cultures", Bio Pharm International, (20030400), pages 34 - 40, XP007920843
    - J. E. DOWD, "Predictive control and optimization of bioprocesses for recombinant t-PA protein production by mammalian cells, dissertation", (20000426), pages ii - 176, XP055440356
    - ZHU et al., "Effects of elevated pCO2 and osmolality on growth of CHO cells and production of antibody-fusion protein B1: A case study", Biotechnol. Prog., (20050000), vol. 21, no. 1, pages 70 - 77, XP002651721

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bp049815s
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.