blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2750567 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2750567



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 198
12.09.2018 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
12.09.2018 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
29.08.2018 Closing of application Search / examination 1
28.08.2018 Processing of grant of a patent after appeal (internal) Search / examination 1
20.08.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
03.08.2018 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
31.07.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
16.07.2018 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 15
16.07.2018 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
01.06.2018 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
26.05.2018 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
03.04.2018 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 6
29.12.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
20.12.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
20.12.2017 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
11.12.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
11.12.2017 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
04.12.2017 F3045 Inadmissibility of the appeal: missing address / missing name Appeal 1
27.11.2017 F3203 Composition of the Board (J) Appeal 1
21.11.2017 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
06.11.2017 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
09.10.2017 Letter concerning fees and payments Appeal 1
19.09.2017 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
11.09.2017 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
21.08.2017 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
28.07.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
28.07.2017 Decision Search / examination 3
28.07.2017 Means of redress Search / examination 1
13.06.2017 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 2
13.06.2017 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
18.04.2017 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 2
17.03.2017 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
06.03.2017 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
02.03.2017 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
01.03.2017 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
01.03.2017 Request for re-establishment of rights Search / examination 1
28.02.2017 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
27.02.2017 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 2
21.02.2017 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
14.02.2017 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
31.01.2017 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
31.01.2017 Request for re-establishment of rights Search / examination 1
27.01.2017 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of renewal fee) Search / examination 1
09.01.2017 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
09.01.2017 Request for re-establishment of rights Search / examination 2
03.08.2016 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
19.07.2016 Claims Search / examination 2
19.07.2016 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 9
13.07.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 1
13.07.2016 Claims Search / examination 2
13.07.2016 Drawings Search / examination 2
13.07.2016 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
23.03.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
23.03.2016 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
02.03.2016 Examination started Search / examination 1
04.08.2015 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
18.02.2015 Statement of non-availability of priority search results Search / examination 1
10.02.2015 Statement of non-availability of priority search results Search / examination 1
29.01.2015 Invitation to file a copy of search results(priority) Search / examination 1
11.12.2014 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
04.08.2014 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
13.06.2014 Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
12.06.2014 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
11.03.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
05.03.2014 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
05.02.2014 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
05.02.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 6
07.01.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
19.03.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 32
28.02.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
28.02.2013 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 15
19.09.2012 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
19.09.2012 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
19.09.2012 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
17.07.2012 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
17.07.2012 Claims International Searching Authority 2
17.07.2012 Description International Searching Authority 1
17.07.2012 Drawings International Searching Authority 6