Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2828174 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2828174



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 452
21.07.2016 Transmittal of third party observations to applicant Search / examination 60
11.07.2016 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 22
11.07.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 8
11.07.2016 Patent document filed by a Third party Search / examination 23
11.07.2016 Patent document filed by a Third party Search / examination 6
11.05.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
11.05.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
11.05.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
11.05.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
11.05.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
30.01.2015 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
23.01.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
23.01.2015 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
23.01.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
23.01.2015 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
16.01.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
16.01.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
16.01.2015 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
12.01.2015 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
08.01.2015 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
24.12.2014 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
12.12.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
12.12.2014 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
12.12.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
12.12.2014 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
05.12.2014 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
28.11.2014 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
18.11.2014 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
30.10.2014 Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
28.10.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
28.10.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
28.10.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
28.10.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
28.10.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
28.10.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
07.10.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 7
12.09.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
12.09.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 6
13.08.2014 CDS Clean up - amended applicant details Search / examination 1
30.07.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
15.10.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 77
15.10.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 82
26.09.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
26.09.2013 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 52
30.11.2012 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
30.11.2012 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
30.11.2012 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 3
13.07.2012 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
13.07.2012 Claims International Searching Authority 6
13.07.2012 Description International Searching Authority 28
13.07.2012 Drawings International Searching Authority 17