19.03.2024 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
27.06.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.11.2022 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
16.07.2022 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
28.06.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.05.2022 |
Change - representative |
|
17.11.2021 |
Change - representative |
|
30.06.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.09.2020 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
10.07.2020 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
30.06.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.03.2020 |
Change - representative |
|
13.03.2020 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
13.03.2020 |
First examination report |
|
01.07.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.06.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.06.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.07.2016 |
New entry: Observations by third parties |
|
01.07.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.07.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.05.2015 |
Change - extension states |
published on 01.07.2015 [2015/27] |
12.05.2015 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
30.01.2015 |
Change - inventor |
published on 04.03.2015 [2015/10] |
23.01.2015 |
Change - inventor |
|
26.12.2014 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 28.01.2015 [2015/05] |
26.12.2014 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 28.01.2015 [2015/05] |
16.12.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.10.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.09.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.09.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.09.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.10.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.09.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.08.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|