Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP2828174

Designated contracting statesAL 
AT 
BE 
BG 
CH 
CY 
CZ 
DE 
DK 
EE 
ES 
FI 
FR 
GB 
GR 
HR 
HU 
IE 
IS 
IT 
LI 
LT 
LU 
LV 
MC 
MK 
MT 
NL 
NO 
PL 
PT 
RO 
RS 
SE 
SI 
SK 
SM 
TR 
Examination procedure11.07.2016Observations by third parties
Entry into regional phase12.09.2014National basic fee paid 
12.09.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
12.09.2014Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
29.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
27.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
27.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
27.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
27.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 08
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:28.01.2015 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20140912
 
Event date:28.01.2015 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
 
Event date:28.01.2015 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Countries concerned:BA ME
 
Event date:25.02.2015 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
INVENTOR NAME:PAXSON, ADAM, T.
 
Event date:25.02.2015 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
INVENTOR NAME:SMITH, JONATHAN, DAVID
 
Event date:25.02.2015 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
INVENTOR NAME:DHIMAN, RAJEEV
 
Event date:25.02.2015 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
INVENTOR NAME:SOLOMON, BRIAN, R.
 
Event date:25.02.2015 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
INVENTOR NAME:VARANASI, KRIPA, K.
 
Event date:25.02.2015 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
INVENTOR NAME:LOVE, CHRISTOPHER, J.
 
Event date:04.03.2015 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
INVENTOR NAME:LOVE, CHRISTOPHER, J.
 
Event date:04.03.2015 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
INVENTOR NAME:SOLOMON, BRIAN, R.
 
Event date:04.03.2015 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
INVENTOR NAME:SMITH, JONATHAN, DAVID
 
Event date:04.03.2015 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
INVENTOR NAME:PAXSON, ADAM, T.
 
Event date:04.03.2015 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
INVENTOR NAME:DHIMAN, RAJEEV
 
Event date:04.03.2015 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
INVENTOR NAME:VARANASI, KRIPA, K.
 
Event date:01.07.2015 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)