Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2828174

EP2828174 - SELF-LUBRICATING SURFACES FOR FOOD PACKAGING AND FOOD PROCESSING EQUIPMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  26.12.2014
Database last updated on 18.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.07.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Massachusetts Institute of Technology
77 Massachusetts Avenue
Cambridge, MA 02139 / US
[2015/05]
Inventor(s)01 / SMITH, Jonathan, David
285 3rd Street, Apt. 843
Cambridge, MA 02142 / US
02 / DHIMAN, Rajeev
14 Persimmon Lane
Glastonbury, CT 06033 / US
03 / PAXSON, Adam, T.
898 Massachusetts Ave. 8
Cambridge, MA 02139 / US
04 / LOVE, Christopher, J.
544 Woodland Circle
Atlantis, FL 33462 / US
05 / SOLOMON, Brian, R.
11504 Evelake Court
Rockville, MD 20878 / US
06 / VARANASI, Kripa, K.
31 Fletcher Avenue
Unit 5
Lexington, MA 02420 / US
 [2015/10]
Former [2015/05]01 / SMITH, Jonathan, David
285 3rd Street, Apt. 843
Cambridge, MA 02142 / US
02 / DHIMAN, Rajeev
8 Island Hill Avenue
No. 213
Malden, MA 02148 / US
03 / PAXSON, Adam, T.
48 Pearl Street
Cambridge, MA 02139 / US
04 / LOVE, Christopher, J.
544 Woodland Circle
Atlantis, FL 33462 / US
05 / SOLOMON, Brian, R.
11504 Evelake Court
Rockville, MD 20878 / US
06 / VARANASI, Kripa, K.
31 Fletcher Avenue
Unit 5
Lexington, MA 02420 / US
Representative(s)Kirkham, Nicholas Andrew , et al
Graham Watt & Co. LLP
St. Botolph's House
7-9 St. Botolph's Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 3AJ / GB
[2015/05]
Application number, filing date12740419.213.06.2012
WO2012US42326
Priority number, dateUS201261614941P23.03.2012         Original published format: US 201261614941 P
US201261651545P24.05.2012         Original published format: US 201261651545 P
[2015/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013141888
Date:26.09.2013
Language:EN
[2013/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2828174
Date:28.01.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.09.2013
[2015/05]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP26.09.2013
ClassificationInternational:B65D23/02, B08B17/06
[2015/05]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/05]
TitleGerman:SELBSTSCHMIERENDE OBERFLÄCHEN FÜR LEBENSMITTELVERPACKUNGEN UND LEBENSMITTELVERARBEITUNGSANLAGE[2015/05]
English:SELF-LUBRICATING SURFACES FOR FOOD PACKAGING AND FOOD PROCESSING EQUIPMENT[2015/05]
French:SURFACES AUTOLUBRIFIANTES POUR CONDITIONNEMENT ALIMENTAIRE ET ÉQUIPEMENT DE TRANSFORMATION DE PRODUITS ALIMENTAIRES[2015/05]
Entry into regional phase12.09.2014National basic fee paid 
12.09.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
12.09.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.09.2014Examination requested  [2015/05]
11.05.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.07.2016Observations by third parties
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
29.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
27.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
27.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
27.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
27.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 08
Cited inInternational search[A]US4069933  (NEWING CHARLES WESLEY) [A] 1,18 * column 1, line 49 - column 2, line 41; figure - *;
 [A]US2003096083  (MORGAN ROBERT [DE], et al) [A] 1,18 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0040]; figure - *;
 [A]US2005112326  (NUN EDWIN [DE], et al) [A] 1,18 * paragraph [0106] - paragraph [0123]; figure - *;
 [A]US2002164443  (OLES MARKUS [DE], et al) [A] 1,18 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0045] *
otherUS6247603
 WO2010028752
    - T-S WONG et al., "Bioinspired self-repairing slippery surfaces pressure-stable omniphobicity", Nature, (20110000), vol. 477, pages 443 - 447, XP055025131

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature10447