Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2734469

EP2734469 - POROUS CARBON AND METHODS OF PRODUCTION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  25.04.2014
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip29.07.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
British American Tobacco (Investments) Ltd
Globe House
1 Water Street
London, WC2R 3LA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/22]For all designated states
British American Tobacco (Investments) Ltd
Globe House 1
Water Street
London, WC2R 3LA / GB
Inventor(s)01 / BRANTON, Peter
c/o: British American Tobacco (Investments)
Limited
Globe House
1 Water Street
London WC2R 3LA / GB
02 / BOHRINGER, Bertram
c/o R&D Blucher GmbH
Mettmannerstrasse 25
40699 Erkrath / DE
03 / FICHTNER, Sven
c/o R&D Blucher GmbH
Mettmannerstrasse 25
40699 Erkrath / DE
04 / GIEBELHAUSEN, Jann-Michael
c/o R&D Blucher GmbH
Mettmannerstrasse 25
40699 Erkrath / DE
 [2014/22]
Representative(s)Handley, Matthew Edward , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London EC1A 4HD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/22]Cowley, Catherine Mary , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London EC1A 4HD / GB
Application number, filing date12741059.518.07.2012
WO2012GB51718
Priority number, dateGB2011001253921.07.2011         Original published format: GB 201112539
GB2011001383911.08.2011         Original published format: GB 201113839
[2014/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013011312
Date:24.01.2013
Language:EN
[2013/04]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2734469
Date:28.05.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.01.2013
[2014/22]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP24.01.2013
ClassificationInternational:C01B31/08, A24D3/16, B01J20/20
[2014/22]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/22]
TitleGerman:PORÖSER KOHLENSTOFF UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR[2014/22]
English:POROUS CARBON AND METHODS OF PRODUCTION THEREOF[2014/22]
French:CARBONE POREUX ET PROCÉDÉS DE PRODUCTION DE CELUI-CI[2014/22]
Entry into regional phase14.01.2014National basic fee paid 
14.01.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
14.01.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.05.2013Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
14.01.2014Examination requested  [2014/22]
30.07.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
23.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
22.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
24.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
27.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
25.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 08
Cited inInternational search[XI]US3355317  (KEITH II CHARLES H ET AL) [X] 1-4,12-16 * claims 1-3 * * column 1, line 14 - line 20 * * column 3, line 9 - line 44 * * column 4, line 23 - line 33 * * column 5, line 37 - line 41 * * column 6; table 1 * [I] 5-8;
 [XI]US3460543  (KEITH CHARLES H ET AL) [X] 1-4,12-16 * claims 1-3 * * example 1 * [I] 5-8;
 [XI]US3251365  (KEITH II CHARLES H ET AL) [X] 1-4,12-16 * claims 1-8 * * column 7, line 3 - line 7 * * table 1, sample 9A * [I] 5-8;
 [X]WO2010059607  (REYNOLDS TOBACCO CO R [US]; BANERJEE CHANDRA KUMAR [US]; SEARS STEPHEN) [X] 1-16 * claims 1,15-17,18-20 * * page 11, lines 13-16 * * page 6, line 15 - line 31 * * page 9, line 7 - line 10 *;
 [A]US6344071  (SMITH SIMON J [CA] ET AL) [A] 1-4,13,14 * column 3, line 36 - line 38 * * column 6, line 15 - line 19 *
 [X]  - BYRAPPA K ET AL, "Impregnation of ZnO onto activated carbon under hydrothermal conditions and its photocatalytic properties", JOURNAL OF MATERIALS SCIENCE, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, BO, (20060301), vol. 41, no. 5, doi:10.1007/S10853-006-7341-X, ISSN 1573-4803, pages 1355 - 1362, XP019211638 [X] 1,3,12-14 * abstract * * page 1356, column r, paragraph 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10853-006-7341-x
by applicantWO2008110233
    - ADSOLPTIOLL, (2008), vol. 14, pages 335 - 341