blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2734469 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2734469



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 215
27.07.2012 Drawings International Searching Authority 3
27.07.2012 Description International Searching Authority 14
27.07.2012 Claims International Searching Authority 2
27.07.2012 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
13.11.2012 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 3
13.11.2012 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
13.11.2012 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
24.01.2013 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 21
24.01.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
13.02.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 24
13.02.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 24
21.05.2013 Payment of fees and costs PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
21.05.2013 Payment of fees and costs PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
21.05.2013 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
21.05.2013 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
21.05.2013 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
21.05.2013 Letter regarding PCTII procedure PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
11.06.2013 Notification of receipt of demand PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
11.06.2013 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 6
21.06.2013 Amendments of documents (Article 19 PCT) PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
02.07.2013 Notification of election of EPO Search / examination 1
18.07.2013 Written opinion - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
18.07.2013 Written opinion - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
18.07.2013 Written opinion PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
18.09.2013 Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
08.11.2013 Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
08.11.2013 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
08.11.2013 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 5
08.11.2013 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
08.11.2013 Annex to International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 6
29.11.2013 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
14.01.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 6
14.01.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
24.01.2014 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
28.01.2014 Reply to Written Opinion prepared by the EPO Search / examination 4
28.01.2014 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 8
28.01.2014 Annexes to the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 2
04.02.2014 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
04.02.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
04.02.2014 Annex Search / examination 3
04.02.2014 Annex Search / examination 6
04.02.2014 Annex Search / examination 16
04.02.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
26.02.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
26.02.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
26.02.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
26.02.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
28.02.2014 Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
30.04.2014 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
30.07.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
30.07.2014 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
30.07.2014 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
30.07.2014 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 1
30.07.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
18.05.2015 Communication of amended entries concerning the applicant/patent proprietor Search / examination 1
05.01.2017 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
05.01.2017 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 1
16.01.2017 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1