blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2734469


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
29.07.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
31.07.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
27.07.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
11.01.2017 Change - representative
26.07.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
27.07.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
15.05.2015 Change - name/address published on  17.06.2015  [2015/25]
26.09.2014 Change - extension states published on  29.10.2014  [2014/44]
01.08.2014 Amendment by applicant
26.07.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
25.04.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  28.05.2014  [2014/22]
25.04.2014 Request for examination filed published on  28.05.2014  [2014/22]
26.02.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
24.01.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
15.01.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
01.07.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
06.02.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
25.01.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
08.08.2012 PCT data prior to European publication