blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2734469 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201280035614 CN201710952452 EP12741059



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9642394Global Dossier 09.05.2017B2
US2014216487 07.08.2014A1
Priority number Date
WO2012GB51718 18.07.2012
GB201112539 21.07.2011
GB201113839 11.08.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR101898078BGlobal Dossier 12.09.2018B1
KR20140054113 08.05.2014A
Priority number Date
WO2012GB51718 18.07.2012
GB201112539 21.07.2011
GB201113839 11.08.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2014523849Global Dossier 18.09.2014A
Priority number Date
WO2012GB51718 18.07.2012
GB201112539 21.07.2011
GB201113839 11.08.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN107758663Global Dossier 06.03.2018A
Priority number Date
CN201280035614 18.07.2012
GB201112539 21.07.2011
GB201113839 11.08.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN103687806Global Dossier 26.03.2014A
Priority number Date
WO2012GB51718 18.07.2012
GB201112539 21.07.2011
GB201113839 11.08.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2838913Global Dossier 30.01.2018C
CA2838913 04.12.2013A1
Priority number Date
WO2012GB51718 18.07.2012
GB201112539 21.07.2011
GB201113839 11.08.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2734469Global Dossier 28.05.2014A1
Priority number Date
WO2012GB51718 18.07.2012
GB201112539 21.07.2011
GB201113839 11.08.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2012285504B 15.01.2015B2
AU2012285504 16.01.2014A1
Priority number Date
WO2012GB51718 18.07.2012
GB201112539 21.07.2011
GB201113839 11.08.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BR112013033174 01.03.2017A2
Priority number Date
WO2012GB51718 18.07.2012
GB201112539 21.07.2011
GB201113839 11.08.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
GB201112539D 31.08.2011D0
Priority number Date
GB201112539 21.07.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
GB201113839D 28.09.2011D0
Priority number Date
GB201112539 21.07.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
RU2602116 10.11.2016C2
RU2014106345 27.08.2015A
Priority number Date
WO2012GB51718 18.07.2012
GB201112539 21.07.2011
GB201113839 11.08.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
UA113414 25.01.2017C2
Priority number Date
WO2012GB51718 18.07.2012
GB201112539 21.07.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ZA201400064 31.05.2017B
Priority number Date
WO2012GB51718 18.07.2012
GB201112539 21.07.2011
GB201113839 11.08.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2013011312Global Dossier 24.01.2013A1
Priority number Date
GB201112539 21.07.2011
GB201113839 11.08.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP6212174BGlobal Dossier 11.10.2017B2
JP2017019711 26.01.2017A
Priority number Date
GB201112539 21.07.2011
GB201113839 11.08.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
AR088027 07.05.2014A1
Priority number Date
GB201112539 21.07.2011
GB201113839 11.08.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
TW201323330 16.06.2013A
Priority number Date
GB201112539 21.07.2011
GB201113839 11.08.2011