Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2750810

EP2750810 - VACUUM STEAM CLEANING APPARATUS AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.03.2017
Database last updated on 26.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Boeing Company
100 North Riverside Plaza
Chicago, IL 60606-1596 / US
[2016/20]
Former [2014/28]For all designated states
The Boeing Company
100 North Riverside Plaza
Chicago, IL 60606-2016 / US
Inventor(s)01 / PONOMAREV, Sergey G.
6621 198th Place Southwest
Lynnwood, WA 98036 / US
 [2016/20]
Former [2014/28]01 / PONOMAREV, Sergey G.
6621 198th Place Southwest
Lynnwood, Washington 98036 / US
Representative(s)Lloyd, Robin , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
Lacon London
84 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8NL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/28]Lloyd, Robin , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Application number, filing date12741195.718.07.2012
[2016/20]
WO2012US47152
Priority number, dateUS20111328325027.10.2011         Original published format: US201113283250
[2014/28]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013062646
Date:02.05.2013
Language:EN
[2013/18]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2750810
Date:09.07.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.05.2013
[2014/28]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2750810
Date:18.05.2016
Language:EN
[2016/20]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP02.05.2013
ClassificationInternational:B08B3/00, B08B5/04
[2014/28]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/28]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VAKUUMDAMPFREINIGER UND VERFAHREN[2014/28]
English:VACUUM STEAM CLEANING APPARATUS AND METHOD[2014/28]
French:APPAREIL ET PROCEDE DE NETTOYAGE A LA VAPEUR SOUS VIDE[2016/01]
Former [2014/28]APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE NETTOYAGE À LA VAPEUR SOUS VIDE
Entry into regional phase31.03.2014National basic fee paid 
31.03.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
31.03.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure31.03.2014Examination requested  [2014/28]
02.10.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.11.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.03.2016Fee for grant paid
29.03.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
29.03.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  30.11.2015
Opposition(s)21.02.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
27.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU18.07.2012
AL18.05.2016
AT18.05.2016
BE18.05.2016
BG18.05.2016
CY18.05.2016
CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
IS18.05.2016
IT18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
MC18.05.2016
MK18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
PL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
SI18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
SM18.05.2016
TR18.05.2016
IE18.07.2016
LU18.07.2016
CH31.07.2016
LI31.07.2016
MT31.07.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/45]HU18.07.2012
AT18.05.2016
BE18.05.2016
BG18.05.2016
CY18.05.2016
CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
IS18.05.2016
IT18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
MC18.05.2016
MK18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
PL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
SI18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
SM18.05.2016
TR18.05.2016
IE18.07.2016
LU18.07.2016
CH31.07.2016
LI31.07.2016
MT31.07.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2018/38]HU18.07.2012
AT18.05.2016
BE18.05.2016
BG18.05.2016
CY18.05.2016
CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
IS18.05.2016
IT18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
MC18.05.2016
MK18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
PL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
SI18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
SM18.05.2016
IE18.07.2016
LU18.07.2016
CH31.07.2016
LI31.07.2016
MT31.07.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2018/31]HU18.07.2012
AT18.05.2016
BE18.05.2016
CY18.05.2016
CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
IS18.05.2016
IT18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
MC18.05.2016
MK18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
PL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
SI18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
SM18.05.2016
IE18.07.2016
LU18.07.2016
CH31.07.2016
LI31.07.2016
MT31.07.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2018/28]HU18.07.2012
AT18.05.2016
BE18.05.2016
CY18.05.2016
CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
IT18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
MC18.05.2016
MK18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
PL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
SI18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
SM18.05.2016
IE18.07.2016
LU18.07.2016
CH31.07.2016
LI31.07.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2017/37]AT18.05.2016
BE18.05.2016
CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
IT18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
MC18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
PL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
SI18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
SM18.05.2016
IE18.07.2016
LU18.07.2016
CH31.07.2016
LI31.07.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2017/23]AT18.05.2016
BE18.05.2016
CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
IT18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
MC18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
PL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
SI18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
SM18.05.2016
CH31.07.2016
LI31.07.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2017/17]AT18.05.2016
BE18.05.2016
CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
IT18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
MC18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
PL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
SM18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2017/11]AT18.05.2016
BE18.05.2016
CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
IT18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
PL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
SM18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2017/10]BE18.05.2016
CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
IT18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
PL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2017/09]CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
IT18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
BE31.07.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2017/07]DK18.05.2016
ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
IT18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
BE31.07.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2017/03]ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
IT18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
BE31.07.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2016/52]ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2016/51]ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2016/50]ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
Former [2016/49]FI18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
Former [2016/46]LT18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
Cited inInternational search[A]ZA9503212  (KENTMASTER MFG CO INC) [A] 1-20 * abstract *;
 [A]US2003233726  (MURRAY CHRISTOPHER J [US]) [A] 1-20 * abstract *;
 [A]US5607349  (KARUBIAN RALPH K [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * abstract *