Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2794963

EP2794963 - COINS BLANK [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2014/44]COIN BLANK
[2015/32]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.01.2017
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Saxonia Eurocoin GmbH
Erzstrasse 5a
09633 Halsbrücke / DE
[2014/44]
Inventor(s)01 / BILAS, Thomas
Humboldtstrasse 24
09599 Freiberg / DE
02 / SIEGEL, Stephan
Am Finkenschlag 2
01108 Dresden / DE
 [2014/44]
Representative(s)Müller Hoffmann & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
St.-Martin-Strasse 58
81541 München / DE
[2016/10]
Former [2014/44]Müller - Hoffmann & Partner
Patentanwälte
St.-Martin-Strasse 58
81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date12742809.231.07.2012
[2016/10]
WO2012EP03261
Priority number, dateDE20111012195222.12.2011         Original published format: DE102011121952
[2014/44]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013091738
Date:27.06.2013
Language:DE
[2013/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2794963
Date:29.10.2014
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2013
[2014/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2794963
Date:09.03.2016
Language:DE
[2016/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.06.2013
ClassificationInternational:C25D3/38, C25D3/58, C25D5/12, C25D5/50, A44C21/00, A44C27/00
[2014/44]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/44]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:MÜNZROHLING[2014/44]
English:COINS BLANK[2016/04]
French:FLAN DE PIÈCES DE MONNAIE[2016/04]
Former [2014/44]COIN BLANK
Former [2014/44]FLAN MONÉTAIRE
Entry into regional phase17.03.2014National basic fee paid 
17.03.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
17.03.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.10.2013Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
17.03.2014Examination requested  [2014/44]
03.12.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.07.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.11.2015Fee for grant paid
20.11.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
20.11.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.07.2015
Opposition(s)12.12.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2017/07]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
29.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU31.07.2012
AL09.03.2016
CY09.03.2016
CZ09.03.2016
DK09.03.2016
EE09.03.2016
ES09.03.2016
FI09.03.2016
HR09.03.2016
IT09.03.2016
LT09.03.2016
LV09.03.2016
MC09.03.2016
MK09.03.2016
MT09.03.2016
NL09.03.2016
PL09.03.2016
RO09.03.2016
RS09.03.2016
SE09.03.2016
SI09.03.2016
SK09.03.2016
SM09.03.2016
TR09.03.2016
BG09.06.2016
NO09.06.2016
GR10.06.2016
IS09.07.2016
PT11.07.2016
BE31.07.2016
CH31.07.2016
GB31.07.2016
IE31.07.2016
LI31.07.2016
LU31.07.2016
FR01.08.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/45]HU31.07.2012
CY09.03.2016
CZ09.03.2016
DK09.03.2016
EE09.03.2016
ES09.03.2016
FI09.03.2016
HR09.03.2016
IT09.03.2016
LT09.03.2016
LV09.03.2016
MC09.03.2016
MK09.03.2016
MT09.03.2016
NL09.03.2016
PL09.03.2016
RO09.03.2016
RS09.03.2016
SE09.03.2016
SI09.03.2016
SK09.03.2016
SM09.03.2016
TR09.03.2016
BG09.06.2016
NO09.06.2016
GR10.06.2016
IS09.07.2016
PT11.07.2016
BE31.07.2016
CH31.07.2016
GB31.07.2016
IE31.07.2016
LI31.07.2016
LU31.07.2016
FR01.08.2016
Former [2018/31]HU31.07.2012
CY09.03.2016
CZ09.03.2016
DK09.03.2016
EE09.03.2016
ES09.03.2016
FI09.03.2016
HR09.03.2016
IT09.03.2016
LT09.03.2016
LV09.03.2016
MC09.03.2016
MK09.03.2016
MT09.03.2016
NL09.03.2016
PL09.03.2016
RO09.03.2016
RS09.03.2016
SE09.03.2016
SI09.03.2016
SK09.03.2016
SM09.03.2016
BG09.06.2016
NO09.06.2016
GR10.06.2016
IS09.07.2016
PT11.07.2016
BE31.07.2016
CH31.07.2016
GB31.07.2016
IE31.07.2016
LI31.07.2016
LU31.07.2016
FR01.08.2016
Former [2018/30]HU31.07.2012
CY09.03.2016
CZ09.03.2016
DK09.03.2016
EE09.03.2016
ES09.03.2016
FI09.03.2016
HR09.03.2016
IT09.03.2016
LT09.03.2016
LV09.03.2016
MC09.03.2016
MK09.03.2016
NL09.03.2016
PL09.03.2016
RO09.03.2016
RS09.03.2016
SE09.03.2016
SI09.03.2016
SK09.03.2016
SM09.03.2016
BG09.06.2016
NO09.06.2016
GR10.06.2016
IS09.07.2016
PT11.07.2016
BE31.07.2016
CH31.07.2016
GB31.07.2016
IE31.07.2016
LI31.07.2016
LU31.07.2016
FR01.08.2016
Former [2017/36]CZ09.03.2016
DK09.03.2016
EE09.03.2016
ES09.03.2016
FI09.03.2016
HR09.03.2016
IT09.03.2016
LT09.03.2016
LV09.03.2016
MC09.03.2016
NL09.03.2016
PL09.03.2016
RO09.03.2016
RS09.03.2016
SE09.03.2016
SI09.03.2016
SK09.03.2016
SM09.03.2016
BG09.06.2016
NO09.06.2016
GR10.06.2016
IS09.07.2016
PT11.07.2016
BE31.07.2016
CH31.07.2016
GB31.07.2016
IE31.07.2016
LI31.07.2016
LU31.07.2016
FR01.08.2016
Former [2017/23]CZ09.03.2016
DK09.03.2016
EE09.03.2016
ES09.03.2016
FI09.03.2016
HR09.03.2016
IT09.03.2016
LT09.03.2016
LV09.03.2016
MC09.03.2016
NL09.03.2016
PL09.03.2016
RO09.03.2016
RS09.03.2016
SE09.03.2016
SI09.03.2016
SK09.03.2016
SM09.03.2016
BG09.06.2016
NO09.06.2016
GR10.06.2016
IS09.07.2016
PT11.07.2016
BE31.07.2016
CH31.07.2016
GB31.07.2016
LI31.07.2016
FR01.08.2016
Former [2017/19]CZ09.03.2016
DK09.03.2016
EE09.03.2016
ES09.03.2016
FI09.03.2016
HR09.03.2016
IT09.03.2016
LT09.03.2016
LV09.03.2016
MC09.03.2016
NL09.03.2016
PL09.03.2016
RO09.03.2016
RS09.03.2016
SE09.03.2016
SK09.03.2016
SM09.03.2016
BG09.06.2016
NO09.06.2016
GR10.06.2016
IS09.07.2016
PT11.07.2016
BE31.07.2016
CH31.07.2016
LI31.07.2016
Former [2017/07]CZ09.03.2016
DK09.03.2016
EE09.03.2016
ES09.03.2016
FI09.03.2016
HR09.03.2016
IT09.03.2016
LT09.03.2016
LV09.03.2016
NL09.03.2016
PL09.03.2016
RO09.03.2016
RS09.03.2016
SE09.03.2016
SK09.03.2016
SM09.03.2016
NO09.06.2016
GR10.06.2016
IS09.07.2016
PT11.07.2016
BE31.07.2016
Former [2017/03]CZ09.03.2016
EE09.03.2016
ES09.03.2016
FI09.03.2016
HR09.03.2016
IT09.03.2016
LT09.03.2016
LV09.03.2016
NL09.03.2016
PL09.03.2016
RO09.03.2016
RS09.03.2016
SE09.03.2016
SK09.03.2016
SM09.03.2016
NO09.06.2016
GR10.06.2016
IS09.07.2016
PT11.07.2016
BE31.07.2016
Former [2016/51]CZ09.03.2016
EE09.03.2016
ES09.03.2016
FI09.03.2016
HR09.03.2016
LT09.03.2016
LV09.03.2016
NL09.03.2016
PL09.03.2016
RO09.03.2016
RS09.03.2016
SE09.03.2016
SK09.03.2016
SM09.03.2016
NO09.06.2016
GR10.06.2016
IS09.07.2016
PT11.07.2016
Former [2016/50]CZ09.03.2016
EE09.03.2016
ES09.03.2016
FI09.03.2016
HR09.03.2016
LT09.03.2016
LV09.03.2016
NL09.03.2016
PL09.03.2016
RO09.03.2016
RS09.03.2016
SE09.03.2016
SK09.03.2016
SM09.03.2016
NO09.06.2016
GR10.06.2016
IS09.07.2016
Former [2016/49]EE09.03.2016
ES09.03.2016
FI09.03.2016
HR09.03.2016
LT09.03.2016
LV09.03.2016
NL09.03.2016
PL09.03.2016
RS09.03.2016
SE09.03.2016
NO09.06.2016
GR10.06.2016
IS09.07.2016
Former [2016/48]ES09.03.2016
FI09.03.2016
HR09.03.2016
LT09.03.2016
LV09.03.2016
NL09.03.2016
PL09.03.2016
RS09.03.2016
SE09.03.2016
NO09.06.2016
GR10.06.2016
IS09.07.2016
Former [2016/40]ES09.03.2016
FI09.03.2016
HR09.03.2016
LT09.03.2016
LV09.03.2016
NL09.03.2016
PL09.03.2016
RS09.03.2016
SE09.03.2016
NO09.06.2016
GR10.06.2016
Former [2016/39]ES09.03.2016
FI09.03.2016
HR09.03.2016
LT09.03.2016
LV09.03.2016
PL09.03.2016
RS09.03.2016
SE09.03.2016
NO09.06.2016
GR10.06.2016
Former [2016/36]ES09.03.2016
FI09.03.2016
HR09.03.2016
LT09.03.2016
PL09.03.2016
NO09.06.2016
GR10.06.2016
Former [2016/35]ES09.03.2016
FI09.03.2016
HR09.03.2016
NO09.06.2016
GR10.06.2016
Cited inInternational search[XI]WO2006138033  (JARDEN ZINC PRODUCTS INC [US]) [X] 1,2,5,7-9 * abstract * * claims 1,13 * * page 2, lines 12-17 * [I] 3,4,6;
 [XI]DE3940244  (VER DEUTSCHE NICKEL WERKE AG V [DE]) [X] 1-4,7-9 * claims 1,6-8,10-12,18 * * column 3, lines 1-52 * [I] 5,6;
 [X]EP0033625  (INCO RES & DEV CENTER INC [US]) [X] 1,2,5 * abstract * * page 3, line 26 - page 4, line 22 * * claims 1,3 *
by applicantDE2932229
 DE4120291