Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2732390

EP2732390 - ACCESS SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR ACCESSING SIGNAL DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  07.09.2018
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  27.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip07.09.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 10.10.2018  [2018/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nederlandse Organisatie voor toegepast- natuurwetenschappelijk onderzoek TNO
Anna van Buerenplein 1
2595 DA 's-Gravenhage / NL
[2015/17]
Former [2014/21]For all designated states
Nederlandse Organisatie voor toegepast- natuurwetenschappelijk onderzoek TNO
Schoemakerstraat 97
2628 VK Delft / NL
Inventor(s)01 / LANGIUS, Erik Alle Fokko
c/o TNO-PLT
Schoemakerstraat 97
NL-2628 VK Delft / NL
02 / VAN DER WAAIJ, Bram Dirk
c/o TNO-PLT
Schoemakerstraat 97
NL-2628 VK Delft / NL
03 / VONDER, Matthijs Raymond
c/o TNO-PLT
Schoemakerstraat 97
NL-2628 VK Delft / NL
04 / BASTIAANS, Allart
c/o TNO-PLT
Schoemakerstraat 97
NL-2628 VK Delft / NL
05 / PATHUIS, Wiltfried
c/o TNO-PLT
Schoemakerstraat 97
NL-2628 VK Delft / NL
 [2014/21]
Representative(s)V.O.
P.O. Box 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
[N/P]
Former [2014/21]Jansen, Cornelis Marinus
V.O.
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date12742966.011.07.2012
WO2012NL50498
Priority number, dateEP2011017341911.07.2011         Original published format: EP 11173419
[2014/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013009179
Date:17.01.2013
Language:EN
[2013/03]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2732390
Date:21.05.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.01.2013
[2014/21]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP17.01.2013
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/30
[2014/21]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/21]
TitleGerman:ZUGRIFFSSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN FÜR DEN ZUGRIFF AUF SIGNALDATEN[2014/21]
English:ACCESS SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR ACCESSING SIGNAL DATA[2014/21]
French:SYSTÈME D'ACCÈS ET PROCÉDÉ D'ACCÈS À DES DONNÉES DE SIGNAUX[2014/21]
Entry into regional phase03.02.2014National basic fee paid 
03.02.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
03.02.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.02.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.02.2014Examination requested  [2014/21]
27.10.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.05.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/41]
04.06.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2018/41]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  27.10.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
23.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
22.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
24.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
27.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[XI]  - ANASTASIA AILAMAKI ET AL, "Managing scientific data", COMMUNICATIONS OF THE ACM, (20100601), vol. 53, no. 6, doi:10.1145/1743546.1743568, ISSN 0001-0782, page 68, XP055037551 [X] 1-3,5-9,12,13 * "Data archiving"; page 73 * [I] 4,10,11

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/1743546.1743568
 [IP]  - "Incremental backup", (20120507), Wikipedia, URL: http://en.wikipedia.org/w/index.php?title=Incremental_backup&oldid=491157485, (20120907), XP002684006 [IP] 1-13 * the whole document *
 [XI]  - PETER BUNEMAN ET AL, "Archiving scientific data", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 2002 ACM SIGMOD INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON MANAGEMENT OF DATA , SIGMOD '02, New York, New York, USA, (20020101), doi:10.1145/564691.564693, ISBN 978-1-58-113497-1, page 1, XP055037550 [X] 1-3,5,8,9,13 * Section 4 * [I] 4,6,7,10-12

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/564691.564693
 [I]  - BHARGAV KANAGAL ET AL, "Online Filtering, Smoothing and Probabilistic Modeling of Streaming data", DATA ENGINEERING, 2008. ICDE 2008. IEEE 24TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20080407), ISBN 978-1-4244-1836-7, pages 1160 - 1169, XP031246074 [I] 1-13 * Section VI *
 [I]  - AMOL DESHPANDE ET AL, "MauveDB", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 2006 ACM SIGMOD INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON MANAGEMENT OF DATA , SIGMOD '06, Chicago, USA, (20060627), doi:10.1145/1142473.1142483, ISBN 978-1-59-593434-5, page 73, XP055020827 [I] 1-13 * Sections 1, 2, 3 Section 5 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/1142473.1142483
 [A]  - ANDRADE H ET AL, "Optimizing the Execution of Multiple Data Analysis Queries on Parallel and Distributed Environments", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON PARALLEL AND DISTRIBUTED SYSTEMS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, US, (20040601), vol. 15, no. 6, doi:10.1109/TPDS.2004.11, ISSN 1045-9219, pages 520 - 532, XP011111874 [A] 1-13 * Sections 2, 3 Section 5 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TPDS.2004.11
by applicantUS7236971
    - ANDRADE ET AL., "Optiimizing the execution of multiple data analysis queries on parallel and distributed environments", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON PARALLEL AND DISTRIBUTED SYSTEMS, vol. 15 15, no. 6, doi:doi:10.1109/TPDS.2004.11, pages 520 - 532, XP011111874

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TPDS.2004.11
    - DAR ET AL., "Semantic data caching and replacement", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON VERY LARGE DATABASES, (1996), pages 1 - 12, XP002261689