Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2790956

EP2790956 - MOTOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  06.04.2019
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.09.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Audi AG
85045 Ingolstadt / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/43]For all designated states
Audi AG
85045 Ingolstadt / DE
Inventor(s)01 / WINKLER, Josef
Altmühlstr. 3
85110 Kipfenberg / DE
 [2014/43]
Representative(s)Herbst, Matthias Heinz
Audi AG
Patentabteilung
I/EZ-14
85045 Ingolstadt / DE
[2014/43]
Application number, filing date12743088.201.08.2012
WO2012EP03267
Priority number, dateDE20111012148616.12.2011         Original published format: DE102011121486
[2014/43]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2013087127
Date:20.06.2013
Language:DE
[2013/25]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2790956
Date:22.10.2014
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.06.2013
[2014/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.03.2014
ClassificationInternational:B60L11/18, H02J7/02
[2014/43]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/43]
TitleGerman:KRAFTFAHRZEUG[2014/43]
English:MOTOR VEHICLE[2014/43]
French:VÉHICULE À MOTEUR[2014/43]
Entry into regional phase16.07.2014National basic fee paid 
Examination procedure04.06.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.09.2014Examination requested  [2014/45]
10.04.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.07.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  10.04.2019
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
31.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
31.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
31.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
31.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
02.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 08
Cited inInternational search[X]EP1657106  (JUNGHEINRICH AG [DE]) [X] 1,7-9 * paragraph [0018]; figure 2 *;
 [Y]EP0603778  (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-9 * abstract * * column 7, line 37 - column 8, line 5 *;
 [Y]US3670238  (RONK LEROY B) [Y] 1-9 * abstract *;
 [A]DE102009000096  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0030]; figures 5-7 *