Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2744963

EP2744963 - DEVICE FOR RETRACTING A MOVABLE FURNITURE PART INTO A CENTRAL POSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  07.04.2017
Database last updated on 15.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.05.2019New entry: Date of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hettich-Heinze GmbH & Co. KG
Industriezentrum 83-87
32139 Spenge / DE
[2016/13]
Former [2014/26]For all designated states
Hettich-Heinze GmbH & Co. KG
Industriestrasse 83-87
32139 Spenge / DE
Inventor(s)01 / MONTECHIO, Andreas
Gröchteweg 53
32105 Bad Salzuflen / DE
02 / NOLTE, Frank
Bussardweg 15
49086 Osnabrück / DE
 [2014/26]
Representative(s)Kleine, Hubertus , et al
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/26]Kleine, Hubertus , et al
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
Application number, filing date12743451.202.08.2012
WO2012EP65185
Priority number, dateDE2011105275616.08.2011         Original published format: DE102011052756
[2014/26]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013023934
Date:21.02.2013
Language:DE
[2013/08]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2744963
Date:25.06.2014
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.02.2013
[2014/26]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.02.2013
ClassificationInternational:E05F1/16, E05F5/00, E05F5/02
[2014/26]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/26]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUM EINZIEHEN EINES BEWEGBAREN MÖBELTEILS IN EINE MITTELSTELLUNG[2014/26]
English:DEVICE FOR RETRACTING A MOVABLE FURNITURE PART INTO A CENTRAL POSITION[2014/26]
French:DISPOSITIF POUR RÉTRACTER UNE PARTIE DE MEUBLE MOBILE DANS UNE POSITION INTERMÉDIAIRE[2014/26]
Entry into regional phase07.03.2014National basic fee paid 
07.03.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
07.03.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.03.2014Examination requested  [2014/26]
14.10.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.04.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.10.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.06.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.12.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.12.2019Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  10.04.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
27.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
30.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
31.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
30.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[XDAYI]DE202010007230U  (HAEFELE GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [XD] 1,2 * paragraphs [0001] , [0006] , [0014] - [0025] * * figures 1-3 * [A] 11,12 [Y] 7-9 [I] 3-6,10;
 [Y]DE102008009046  (ZIMMER GUENTHER [DE], et al) [Y] 7-9 * paragraphs [0029] - [0066] * * figures 1-11 *
by applicantDE202010007230U