blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2880926

EP2880926 - TECHNIQUE FOR OPERATING A RADIO NETWORK CONTROLLER DURING A SOFT HANDOVER PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.05.2019
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  01.06.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  10.05.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip03.07.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, MK
published on 05.08.2020  [2020/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
[2018/27]
Former [2015/24]For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (Publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
Inventor(s)01 / RÁCZ, Sándor
Bem utca 2
H-2700 Cegléd / HU
02 / NÁDAS, Szilveszter
Könyves Kálmán Krt. 11
H-1097 Budapest / HU
03 / SKARVE, Martin
Trädgårdsvägen 7B
S-182 47 Enebyberg / SE
 [2015/24]
Representative(s)Brann AB
P.O. Box 3690
Sveavägen 63
103 59 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2018/27]Brann AB
P.O. Box 3690
Drottninggatan 27
103 59 Stockholm / SE
Former [2015/24]Althoff, Fredrik
Ericsson AB
Patent Unit GL
Lindholmspiren 11
417 56 Göteborg / SE
Application number, filing date12743679.830.07.2012
[2018/27]
WO2012EP03237
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2014019591
Date:06.02.2014
Language:EN
[2014/06]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2880926
Date:10.06.2015
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.02.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2015/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2880926
Date:04.07.2018
Language:EN
[2018/27]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP06.02.2014
ClassificationIPC:H04W56/00, H04W36/02
[2015/24]
CPC:
H04W56/001 (EP,US); H04W36/18 (EP,US); H04W92/12 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/24]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINER FUNKNETZSTEUERUNG WÄHREND EINES SANFTEN ÜBERGABEPROZESSES[2015/24]
English:TECHNIQUE FOR OPERATING A RADIO NETWORK CONTROLLER DURING A SOFT HANDOVER PROCESS[2015/24]
French:TECHNIQUE D'EXPLOITATION D'UN CONTRÔLEUR DE RÉSEAU RADIO DURANT UN PROCESSUS DE TRANSFERT INTERCELLULAIRE CONDITIONNEL[2015/24]
Entry into regional phase29.01.2015National basic fee paid 
29.01.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
29.01.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.01.2015Examination requested  [2015/24]
02.07.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.05.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.05.2018Fee for grant paid
25.05.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
25.05.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  11.05.2018
Opposition(s)05.04.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
27.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
27.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
27.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU30.07.2012
AL04.07.2018
AT04.07.2018
CY04.07.2018
CZ04.07.2018
DK04.07.2018
EE04.07.2018
ES04.07.2018
FI04.07.2018
HR04.07.2018
IT04.07.2018
LT04.07.2018
LV04.07.2018
MC04.07.2018
MK04.07.2018
NL04.07.2018
PL04.07.2018
PT04.07.2018
RO04.07.2018
RS04.07.2018
SE04.07.2018
SI04.07.2018
SK04.07.2018
SM04.07.2018
TR04.07.2018
IE30.07.2018
LU30.07.2018
MT30.07.2018
BE31.07.2018
CH31.07.2018
LI31.07.2018
BG04.10.2018
NO04.10.2018
GR05.10.2018
IS04.11.2018
[2020/31]
Former [2020/28]HU30.07.2012
AL04.07.2018
AT04.07.2018
CZ04.07.2018
DK04.07.2018
EE04.07.2018
ES04.07.2018
FI04.07.2018
HR04.07.2018
IT04.07.2018
LT04.07.2018
LV04.07.2018
MC04.07.2018
NL04.07.2018
PL04.07.2018
PT04.07.2018
RO04.07.2018
RS04.07.2018
SE04.07.2018
SI04.07.2018
SK04.07.2018
SM04.07.2018
TR04.07.2018
IE30.07.2018
LU30.07.2018
MT30.07.2018
BE31.07.2018
CH31.07.2018
LI31.07.2018
BG04.10.2018
NO04.10.2018
GR05.10.2018
IS04.11.2018
Former [2020/16]AL04.07.2018
AT04.07.2018
CZ04.07.2018
DK04.07.2018
EE04.07.2018
ES04.07.2018
FI04.07.2018
HR04.07.2018
IT04.07.2018
LT04.07.2018
LV04.07.2018
MC04.07.2018
NL04.07.2018
PL04.07.2018
RO04.07.2018
RS04.07.2018
SE04.07.2018
SI04.07.2018
SK04.07.2018
SM04.07.2018
TR04.07.2018
IE30.07.2018
LU30.07.2018
MT30.07.2018
BE31.07.2018
CH31.07.2018
LI31.07.2018
BG04.10.2018
NO04.10.2018
GR05.10.2018
IS04.11.2018
Former [2020/08]AL04.07.2018
AT04.07.2018
CZ04.07.2018
DK04.07.2018
EE04.07.2018
ES04.07.2018
FI04.07.2018
HR04.07.2018
IT04.07.2018
LT04.07.2018
LV04.07.2018
MC04.07.2018
NL04.07.2018
PL04.07.2018
RO04.07.2018
RS04.07.2018
SE04.07.2018
SI04.07.2018
SK04.07.2018
SM04.07.2018
IE30.07.2018
LU30.07.2018
MT30.07.2018
BE31.07.2018
CH31.07.2018
LI31.07.2018
BG04.10.2018
NO04.10.2018
GR05.10.2018
IS04.11.2018
Former [2019/37]AL04.07.2018
AT04.07.2018
CZ04.07.2018
DK04.07.2018
EE04.07.2018
ES04.07.2018
FI04.07.2018
HR04.07.2018
IT04.07.2018
LT04.07.2018
LV04.07.2018
MC04.07.2018
NL04.07.2018
PL04.07.2018
RO04.07.2018
RS04.07.2018
SE04.07.2018
SI04.07.2018
SK04.07.2018
SM04.07.2018
IE30.07.2018
LU30.07.2018
BE31.07.2018
CH31.07.2018
LI31.07.2018
BG04.10.2018
NO04.10.2018
GR05.10.2018
IS04.11.2018
Former [2019/33]AL04.07.2018
AT04.07.2018
CZ04.07.2018
DK04.07.2018
EE04.07.2018
ES04.07.2018
FI04.07.2018
HR04.07.2018
IT04.07.2018
LT04.07.2018
LV04.07.2018
MC04.07.2018
NL04.07.2018
PL04.07.2018
RO04.07.2018
RS04.07.2018
SE04.07.2018
SK04.07.2018
SM04.07.2018
IE30.07.2018
LU30.07.2018
BE31.07.2018
CH31.07.2018
LI31.07.2018
BG04.10.2018
NO04.10.2018
GR05.10.2018
IS04.11.2018
Former [2019/26]AL04.07.2018
AT04.07.2018
CZ04.07.2018
DK04.07.2018
EE04.07.2018
ES04.07.2018
FI04.07.2018
HR04.07.2018
IT04.07.2018
LT04.07.2018
LV04.07.2018
MC04.07.2018
NL04.07.2018
PL04.07.2018
RO04.07.2018
RS04.07.2018
SE04.07.2018
SK04.07.2018
SM04.07.2018
LU30.07.2018
BE31.07.2018
CH31.07.2018
LI31.07.2018
BG04.10.2018
NO04.10.2018
GR05.10.2018
IS04.11.2018
Former [2019/24]AL04.07.2018
AT04.07.2018
CZ04.07.2018
EE04.07.2018
ES04.07.2018
FI04.07.2018
HR04.07.2018
IT04.07.2018
LT04.07.2018
LV04.07.2018
MC04.07.2018
NL04.07.2018
PL04.07.2018
RO04.07.2018
RS04.07.2018
SE04.07.2018
SK04.07.2018
LU30.07.2018
BE31.07.2018
CH31.07.2018
LI31.07.2018
BG04.10.2018
NO04.10.2018
GR05.10.2018
IS04.11.2018
Former [2019/22]AL04.07.2018
AT04.07.2018
CZ04.07.2018
ES04.07.2018
FI04.07.2018
HR04.07.2018
IT04.07.2018
LT04.07.2018
LV04.07.2018
NL04.07.2018
PL04.07.2018
RO04.07.2018
RS04.07.2018
SE04.07.2018
LU30.07.2018
CH31.07.2018
LI31.07.2018
BG04.10.2018
NO04.10.2018
GR05.10.2018
IS04.11.2018
Former [2019/21]AL04.07.2018
AT04.07.2018
CZ04.07.2018
ES04.07.2018
FI04.07.2018
HR04.07.2018
IT04.07.2018
LT04.07.2018
LV04.07.2018
NL04.07.2018
PL04.07.2018
RS04.07.2018
SE04.07.2018
LU30.07.2018
CH31.07.2018
LI31.07.2018
BG04.10.2018
NO04.10.2018
GR05.10.2018
IS04.11.2018
Former [2019/17]AL04.07.2018
AT04.07.2018
CZ04.07.2018
ES04.07.2018
FI04.07.2018
HR04.07.2018
LT04.07.2018
LV04.07.2018
NL04.07.2018
PL04.07.2018
RS04.07.2018
SE04.07.2018
LU30.07.2018
BG04.10.2018
NO04.10.2018
GR05.10.2018
IS04.11.2018
Former [2019/12]AL04.07.2018
AT04.07.2018
CZ04.07.2018
ES04.07.2018
FI04.07.2018
HR04.07.2018
LT04.07.2018
LV04.07.2018
NL04.07.2018
PL04.07.2018
RS04.07.2018
SE04.07.2018
BG04.10.2018
NO04.10.2018
GR05.10.2018
IS04.11.2018
Former [2019/11]AT04.07.2018
CZ04.07.2018
FI04.07.2018
HR04.07.2018
LT04.07.2018
NL04.07.2018
PL04.07.2018
RS04.07.2018
SE04.07.2018
BG04.10.2018
NO04.10.2018
GR05.10.2018
IS04.11.2018
Former [2019/10]AT04.07.2018
CZ04.07.2018
FI04.07.2018
LT04.07.2018
NL04.07.2018
PL04.07.2018
RS04.07.2018
SE04.07.2018
BG04.10.2018
NO04.10.2018
GR05.10.2018
IS04.11.2018
Former [2019/08]FI04.07.2018
LT04.07.2018
NL04.07.2018
NO04.10.2018
IS04.11.2018
Former [2019/07]LT04.07.2018
NL04.07.2018
Former [2019/04]NL04.07.2018
Cited inInternational search[A]WO2005062654  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [A] 1-20 * abstract * * page 2, line 9 - page 3, line 23 * * page 33, line 8 - page 39, line 20 * * figure - * * claim - *;
 [Y]US2005255823  (ZHANG GUODONG [US], et al) [Y] 1-20 * abstract * * paragraphs [0024] , [0025] * * figure 3 * * claim - *;
 [A]EP1901499  (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [A] 1-20* the whole document *;
 [X]US2009129313  (TAMURA TOMOFUMI [JP], et al) [X] 1-20 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] - [0005] * * paragraphs [0033] - [0036] * * paragraphs [0041] - [0048] * * figure 3 * * claim - *;
 [Y]  - QUALCOMM, "Optimum re-ordering performance with Asynchronous Iub", 3GPP DRAFT; R2-050450 REORDERING WITH ASYNCHRONOUS IUB, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20050210), vol. RAN WG2, no. Scottsdale, USA; 20050210, XP050127703 [Y] 1-20 * the whole document *
ExaminationCN105634993
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.