Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2673660

EP2673660 - COVERT SURVEILLANCE USING MULTI-MODALITY SENSING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.07.2018
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  28.07.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  12.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip17.01.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MT
published on 19.02.2020 [2020/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Rapiscan Systems, Inc.
2805 Columbia Street
Torrance, CA 90503 / US
[2013/51]
Inventor(s)01 / MORTON, Edward, James
37 Banders Rise
Guilford Surrey GU1 2SL / GB
 [2013/51]
Representative(s)Barker Brettell LLP
Medina Chambers
Town Quay
Southampton SO14 2AQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2017/35]Wilson, Alan Stuart
Barker Brettell LLP
Medina Chambers
Town Quay
Southampton SO14 2AQ / GB
Former [2013/51]Wilson, Alan Stuart
Barker Brettell LLP
Medina Chambers Town Quay
Southhampton, Hampshire SO14 2AQ / GB
Application number, filing date12744504.707.02.2012
[2017/35]
WO2012US24184
Priority number, dateUS201161440834P08.02.2011         Original published format: US 201161440834 P
[2013/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2012109273
Date:16.08.2012
Language:EN
[2012/33]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2673660
Date:18.12.2013
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.08.2012
[2013/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2673660
Date:30.08.2017
Language:EN
[2017/35]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US04.10.2012
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.02.2015
ClassificationInternational:G01T1/29, G01V5/00
[2014/51]
Former International [2013/51]G01T1/29
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/51]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERDECKTE ÜBERWACHUNG UNTER VERWENDUNG MULTIMODALER ERFASSUNG[2013/51]
English:COVERT SURVEILLANCE USING MULTI-MODALITY SENSING[2013/51]
French:SURVEILLANCE SECRÈTE UTILISANT UNE DÉTECTION À MODALITÉ MULTIPLE[2013/51]
Entry into regional phase28.08.2013National basic fee paid 
28.08.2013Search fee paid 
28.08.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
28.08.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.08.2013Examination requested  [2013/51]
28.08.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.03.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.07.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
14.07.2017Fee for grant paid
14.07.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP17176272.7  / EP3252506
EP17188027.1  / EP3270185
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  13.03.2017
Opposition(s)31.05.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
25.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
25.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
17.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT30.08.2017
CZ30.08.2017
DK30.08.2017
EE30.08.2017
ES30.08.2017
FI30.08.2017
HR30.08.2017
IT30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
LV30.08.2017
MC30.08.2017
NL30.08.2017
RO30.08.2017
RS30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
SI30.08.2017
SK30.08.2017
SM30.08.2017
BG30.11.2017
NO30.11.2017
GR01.12.2017
IS30.12.2017
IE07.02.2018
LU07.02.2018
MT07.02.2018
BE28.02.2018
CH28.02.2018
LI28.02.2018
[2020/08]
Former [2019/12]AT30.08.2017
CZ30.08.2017
DK30.08.2017
EE30.08.2017
ES30.08.2017
FI30.08.2017
HR30.08.2017
IT30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
LV30.08.2017
MC30.08.2017
NL30.08.2017
RO30.08.2017
RS30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
SI30.08.2017
SK30.08.2017
SM30.08.2017
BG30.11.2017
NO30.11.2017
GR01.12.2017
IS30.12.2017
IE07.02.2018
LU07.02.2018
BE28.02.2018
CH28.02.2018
LI28.02.2018
Former [2019/09]AT30.08.2017
CZ30.08.2017
DK30.08.2017
EE30.08.2017
ES30.08.2017
FI30.08.2017
HR30.08.2017
IT30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
LV30.08.2017
MC30.08.2017
NL30.08.2017
RO30.08.2017
RS30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
SI30.08.2017
SK30.08.2017
SM30.08.2017
BG30.11.2017
NO30.11.2017
GR01.12.2017
IS30.12.2017
IE07.02.2018
LU07.02.2018
CH28.02.2018
LI28.02.2018
Former [2018/52]AT30.08.2017
CZ30.08.2017
DK30.08.2017
EE30.08.2017
ES30.08.2017
FI30.08.2017
HR30.08.2017
IT30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
LV30.08.2017
MC30.08.2017
NL30.08.2017
RO30.08.2017
RS30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
SI30.08.2017
SK30.08.2017
SM30.08.2017
BG30.11.2017
NO30.11.2017
GR01.12.2017
IS30.12.2017
LU07.02.2018
CH28.02.2018
LI28.02.2018
Former [2018/44]AT30.08.2017
CZ30.08.2017
DK30.08.2017
EE30.08.2017
ES30.08.2017
FI30.08.2017
HR30.08.2017
IT30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
LV30.08.2017
MC30.08.2017
NL30.08.2017
RO30.08.2017
RS30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
SI30.08.2017
SK30.08.2017
SM30.08.2017
BG30.11.2017
NO30.11.2017
GR01.12.2017
IS30.12.2017
Former [2018/39]AT30.08.2017
CZ30.08.2017
DK30.08.2017
EE30.08.2017
ES30.08.2017
FI30.08.2017
HR30.08.2017
IT30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
LV30.08.2017
NL30.08.2017
RO30.08.2017
RS30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
SI30.08.2017
SK30.08.2017
SM30.08.2017
BG30.11.2017
NO30.11.2017
GR01.12.2017
IS30.12.2017
Former [2018/24]AT30.08.2017
CZ30.08.2017
DK30.08.2017
EE30.08.2017
ES30.08.2017
FI30.08.2017
HR30.08.2017
IT30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
LV30.08.2017
NL30.08.2017
RO30.08.2017
RS30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
SK30.08.2017
SM30.08.2017
BG30.11.2017
NO30.11.2017
GR01.12.2017
IS30.12.2017
Former [2018/23]AT30.08.2017
CZ30.08.2017
DK30.08.2017
EE30.08.2017
ES30.08.2017
FI30.08.2017
HR30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
LV30.08.2017
NL30.08.2017
RO30.08.2017
RS30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
SK30.08.2017
BG30.11.2017
NO30.11.2017
GR01.12.2017
IS30.12.2017
Former [2018/21]AT30.08.2017
CZ30.08.2017
DK30.08.2017
ES30.08.2017
FI30.08.2017
HR30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
LV30.08.2017
NL30.08.2017
RS30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
BG30.11.2017
NO30.11.2017
GR01.12.2017
IS30.12.2017
Former [2018/15]AT30.08.2017
ES30.08.2017
FI30.08.2017
HR30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
LV30.08.2017
NL30.08.2017
RS30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
BG30.11.2017
NO30.11.2017
GR01.12.2017
IS30.12.2017
Former [2018/12]AT30.08.2017
ES30.08.2017
FI30.08.2017
HR30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
LV30.08.2017
RS30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
BG30.11.2017
NO30.11.2017
GR01.12.2017
IS30.12.2017
Former [2018/11]AT30.08.2017
ES30.08.2017
FI30.08.2017
HR30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
RS30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
BG30.11.2017
NO30.11.2017
GR01.12.2017
IS30.12.2017
Former [2018/10]AT30.08.2017
FI30.08.2017
HR30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
RS30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
NO30.11.2017
Former [2018/09]FI30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
NO30.11.2017
Former [2018/08]FI30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
NO30.11.2017
Former [2018/07]LT30.08.2017
NO30.11.2017
Documents cited:Search[XAYI]US2009257555  (CHALMERS ALEX [US], et al) [X] 1,8,12 * paragraph [0013]; figure - * * paragraph [0059] * * paragraph [0064] * * paragraph [0078] * * paragraph [0112] - paragraph [0113] * [A] 4,5,15 [Y] 3,6,7,11 [I] 2,9,10,13,14;
 [YA]US5600700  (KRUG KRISTOPH D [US], et al) [Y] 3 * column 6, line 42 - column 7, line 50; figure - * [A] 15;
 [YDA]WO2009141613  (RAPISCAN SECURITY PRODUCTS INC [US], et al) [YD] 3,6,7,11 * page 2, line 8 - line 15 * * page 8, line 22 - line 26; figure - * [A] 4,5;
 [A]US5185778  (MAGRAM MARTIN Y [US]) [A] 4,5 * column 6, line 46 - column 7, line 5; figure - *;
 [A]US5974111  (KRUG KRISTOPH D [US], et al) [A] 15 * column 5, line 4 - line 27 * * column 6, line 42 - column 7, line 36 * * column 9, line 53 - column 10, line 15 * * column 12, line 43 - line 62; figure - *;
 [A]US2008205594  (BJORKHOLM PAUL [US]) [A] 15 * paragraph [0069] - paragraph [0071]; figure - *
International search[X]US2009257555  (CHALMERS ALEX [US], et al);
 [Y]US5185778  (MAGRAM MARTIN Y [US]);
 [Y]US2010177868  (SMITH STEVEN WINN [US]);
 [Y]US2011019797  (MORTON EDWARD JAMES [GB])
by applicantUS2009257555
 US5600700
 US5185778