Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2750648

EP2750648 - PANTY-TYPE INCONTINENCE ARTICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2014/28]INCONTINENCE ARTICLE IN THE SHAPE OF PANTS
[2016/31]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.01.2018
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  27.01.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  18.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 31.07.2019  [2019/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Paul Hartmann AG
Paul-Hartmann-Strasse 12
89522 Heidenheim / DE
[2014/28]
Inventor(s)01 / MALOWANIEC, Krzysztof D.
Flamenweg 42
89522 Heidenheim / DE
 [2014/28]
Representative(s)DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Friedrichstraße 6
70174 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2017/09]DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Friedrichstrasse 6
70174 Stuttgart / DE
Former [2014/28]DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Patentanwälte
Gerokstrasse 1
70188 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date12745694.509.08.2012
[2017/09]
WO2012EP65584
Priority number, dateDE2011108198401.09.2011         Original published format: DE102011081984
[2014/28]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013029951
Date:07.03.2013
Language:DE
[2013/10]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2750648
Date:09.07.2014
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.03.2013
[2014/28]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2750648
Date:01.03.2017
Language:DE
[2017/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.03.2013
ClassificationInternational:A61F13/495, A61F13/496, A61F13/49
[2014/28]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/28]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:INKONTINENZARTIKEL IN HÖSCHENFORM[2014/28]
English:PANTY-TYPE INCONTINENCE ARTICLE[2016/31]
French:ARTICLE POUR L'INCONTINENCE SOUS FORME DE CULOTTE[2016/31]
Former [2014/28]INCONTINENCE ARTICLE IN THE SHAPE OF PANTS
Former [2014/28]ARTICLE EN FORME DE CULOTTE POUR INCONTINENTS
Entry into regional phase03.02.2014National basic fee paid 
03.02.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
03.02.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.02.2014Examination requested  [2014/28]
25.09.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.10.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.01.2017Fee for grant paid
18.01.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
18.01.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  11.10.2016
Opposition(s)04.12.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2018/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
27.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
30.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU09.08.2012
CZ01.03.2017
DK01.03.2017
EE01.03.2017
FI01.03.2017
HR01.03.2017
IT01.03.2017
LT01.03.2017
LV01.03.2017
MC01.03.2017
MT01.03.2017
NL01.03.2017
PL01.03.2017
RO01.03.2017
RS01.03.2017
SI01.03.2017
SK01.03.2017
SM01.03.2017
BG01.06.2017
NO01.06.2017
GR02.06.2017
IS01.07.2017
PT03.07.2017
AT09.08.2017
IE09.08.2017
LU09.08.2017
BE31.08.2017
CH31.08.2017
LI31.08.2017
[2019/31]
Former [2018/50]CZ01.03.2017
DK01.03.2017
EE01.03.2017
FI01.03.2017
HR01.03.2017
IT01.03.2017
LT01.03.2017
LV01.03.2017
MC01.03.2017
MT01.03.2017
NL01.03.2017
PL01.03.2017
RO01.03.2017
RS01.03.2017
SI01.03.2017
SK01.03.2017
SM01.03.2017
BG01.06.2017
NO01.06.2017
GR02.06.2017
IS01.07.2017
PT03.07.2017
AT09.08.2017
IE09.08.2017
LU09.08.2017
BE31.08.2017
CH31.08.2017
LI31.08.2017
Former [2018/43]CZ01.03.2017
DK01.03.2017
EE01.03.2017
FI01.03.2017
HR01.03.2017
IT01.03.2017
LT01.03.2017
LV01.03.2017
MC01.03.2017
MT01.03.2017
NL01.03.2017
PL01.03.2017
RO01.03.2017
RS01.03.2017
SI01.03.2017
SK01.03.2017
SM01.03.2017
BG01.06.2017
NO01.06.2017
GR02.06.2017
IS01.07.2017
PT03.07.2017
IE09.08.2017
LU09.08.2017
BE31.08.2017
CH31.08.2017
LI31.08.2017
Former [2018/39]CZ01.03.2017
DK01.03.2017
EE01.03.2017
FI01.03.2017
HR01.03.2017
IT01.03.2017
LT01.03.2017
LV01.03.2017
MC01.03.2017
NL01.03.2017
PL01.03.2017
RO01.03.2017
RS01.03.2017
SI01.03.2017
SK01.03.2017
SM01.03.2017
BG01.06.2017
NO01.06.2017
GR02.06.2017
IS01.07.2017
PT03.07.2017
IE09.08.2017
LU09.08.2017
BE31.08.2017
CH31.08.2017
LI31.08.2017
Former [2018/34]CZ01.03.2017
DK01.03.2017
EE01.03.2017
FI01.03.2017
HR01.03.2017
IT01.03.2017
LT01.03.2017
LV01.03.2017
MC01.03.2017
NL01.03.2017
PL01.03.2017
RO01.03.2017
RS01.03.2017
SI01.03.2017
SK01.03.2017
SM01.03.2017
BG01.06.2017
NO01.06.2017
GR02.06.2017
IS01.07.2017
PT03.07.2017
IE09.08.2017
LU09.08.2017
CH31.08.2017
LI31.08.2017
Former [2018/21]CZ01.03.2017
DK01.03.2017
EE01.03.2017
FI01.03.2017
HR01.03.2017
IT01.03.2017
LT01.03.2017
LV01.03.2017
MC01.03.2017
NL01.03.2017
PL01.03.2017
RO01.03.2017
RS01.03.2017
SI01.03.2017
SK01.03.2017
SM01.03.2017
BG01.06.2017
NO01.06.2017
GR02.06.2017
IS01.07.2017
PT03.07.2017
CH31.08.2017
LI31.08.2017
Former [2018/18]CZ01.03.2017
DK01.03.2017
EE01.03.2017
FI01.03.2017
HR01.03.2017
IT01.03.2017
LT01.03.2017
LV01.03.2017
MC01.03.2017
NL01.03.2017
PL01.03.2017
RO01.03.2017
RS01.03.2017
SI01.03.2017
SK01.03.2017
SM01.03.2017
BG01.06.2017
NO01.06.2017
GR02.06.2017
IS01.07.2017
PT03.07.2017
Former [2018/14]CZ01.03.2017
DK01.03.2017
EE01.03.2017
FI01.03.2017
HR01.03.2017
IT01.03.2017
LT01.03.2017
LV01.03.2017
NL01.03.2017
PL01.03.2017
RO01.03.2017
RS01.03.2017
SI01.03.2017
SK01.03.2017
SM01.03.2017
BG01.06.2017
NO01.06.2017
GR02.06.2017
IS01.07.2017
PT03.07.2017
Former [2018/09]CZ01.03.2017
DK01.03.2017
EE01.03.2017
FI01.03.2017
HR01.03.2017
IT01.03.2017
LT01.03.2017
LV01.03.2017
NL01.03.2017
PL01.03.2017
RO01.03.2017
RS01.03.2017
SK01.03.2017
SM01.03.2017
BG01.06.2017
NO01.06.2017
GR02.06.2017
IS01.07.2017
PT03.07.2017
Former [2017/51]CZ01.03.2017
EE01.03.2017
FI01.03.2017
HR01.03.2017
IT01.03.2017
LT01.03.2017
LV01.03.2017
NL01.03.2017
PL01.03.2017
RO01.03.2017
RS01.03.2017
SK01.03.2017
SM01.03.2017
BG01.06.2017
NO01.06.2017
GR02.06.2017
IS01.07.2017
PT03.07.2017
Former [2017/50]CZ01.03.2017
EE01.03.2017
FI01.03.2017
HR01.03.2017
IT01.03.2017
LT01.03.2017
LV01.03.2017
NL01.03.2017
PL01.03.2017
RO01.03.2017
RS01.03.2017
SK01.03.2017
BG01.06.2017
NO01.06.2017
GR02.06.2017
IS01.07.2017
Former [2017/49]CZ01.03.2017
EE01.03.2017
FI01.03.2017
HR01.03.2017
IT01.03.2017
LT01.03.2017
LV01.03.2017
NL01.03.2017
RO01.03.2017
RS01.03.2017
SK01.03.2017
BG01.06.2017
NO01.06.2017
GR02.06.2017
IS01.07.2017
Former [2017/48]CZ01.03.2017
FI01.03.2017
HR01.03.2017
LT01.03.2017
LV01.03.2017
NL01.03.2017
RS01.03.2017
BG01.06.2017
NO01.06.2017
GR02.06.2017
Former [2017/41]FI01.03.2017
HR01.03.2017
LT01.03.2017
LV01.03.2017
NL01.03.2017
RS01.03.2017
BG01.06.2017
NO01.06.2017
GR02.06.2017
Cited inInternational search[YD]DE102007055524  (HARTMANN PAUL AG [DE]) [YD] 1-9 * the whole document *;
 [Y]US5558660  (DREIER KIMBERLY A [US]) [Y] 1-9 * column 1, line 65 - column 2, line 4; figures 1-3,12 * * column 2, line 40 - line 49 * * column 6, line 10 - line 42 * * column 16, line 17 - column 18, line 4 *
by applicantDE102007055524