Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2866962

EP2866962 - CRUCIBLE FOR A MACHINE FOR CONTINUOUSLY CASTING A BAR OR A COIL OF A METAL ALLOY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.11.2017
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  16.12.2016
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  07.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 18.12.2019  [2019/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Le Bronze Industriel
3 Avenue du Général Leclerc
51600 Suippes / FR
For all designated states
Rautomead Limited
Nobel Road Wester Gourdie Industrial Estate
Dundee, DD2 4UH (Scotland) / GB
[2015/19]
Inventor(s)01 / PRIMAUX, François
41
Route de Rethel
F - 51110 Isles sur Suippe / FR
02 / COOPER, Mervyn
2 Lossley Park
Duncrievie
Glenfarg Perthshire PH2 9QY / GB
03 / BELL, Colin
Flat 10
Tayview Apartments
12 Dock Street
Dundee DD1 4BT / GB
04 / BROWN, Graeme
39 The Holding
Balmuir
Tealing Dundee DD4 0QY / GB
05 / MARNIE, Gavin
28 Victoria Street
Dundee DD4 6EB / GB
06 / FRAME, Brian
6 Cornhill Way
Perth PH1 1LJ / GB
 [2015/19]
Representative(s)Rhein, Alain
Cabinet Bleger-Rhein-Poupon
4A, rue de l'Industrie
67450 Mundolsheim / FR
[2017/03]
Former [2015/19]Rhein, Alain
Cabinet Bleger-Rhein-Poupon
17, Rue de la Forêt
67550 Vendenheim / FR
Application number, filing date12745909.729.06.2012
[2017/03]
WO2012IB53317
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014001848
Date:03.01.2014
Language:EN
[2014/01]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2866962
Date:06.05.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2014
[2015/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2866962
Date:18.01.2017
Language:EN
[2017/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP03.01.2014
ClassificationInternational:B22D11/14, B22D11/10, B22D11/041, B22D11/00, B22D11/04, F27B3/04
[2016/31]
Former International [2016/09]B22D11/14, B22D11/10, B22D11/041, B22D11/00, B22D11/04
Former International [2015/19]B22D11/00, B22D11/041, B22D11/10
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/19]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:TIEGEL FÜR EINE MASCHINE ZUM STRANGGIESSEN EINER STANGE ODER EINER SPULE AUS EINER METALLLEGIERUNG[2015/19]
English:CRUCIBLE FOR A MACHINE FOR CONTINUOUSLY CASTING A BAR OR A COIL OF A METAL ALLOY[2015/19]
French:CREUSET POUR UNE MACHINE POUR LE COULAGE EN CONTINU D'UNE BARRE OU D'UNE BOBINE D'UN ALLIAGE MÉTALLIQUE[2015/19]
Entry into regional phase29.12.2014National basic fee paid 
29.12.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
29.12.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.12.2014Examination requested  [2015/19]
05.01.2015Observations by third parties
29.07.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.02.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
31.05.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.07.2016Observations by third parties
31.08.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.12.2016Fee for grant paid
06.12.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
06.12.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  17.02.2016
Opposition(s)19.10.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
24.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
27.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU29.06.2012
AT18.01.2017
CY18.01.2017
CZ18.01.2017
DK18.01.2017
EE18.01.2017
ES18.01.2017
FI18.01.2017
HR18.01.2017
IT18.01.2017
LT18.01.2017
LV18.01.2017
MC18.01.2017
MK18.01.2017
NL18.01.2017
PL18.01.2017
RO18.01.2017
RS18.01.2017
SE18.01.2017
SI18.01.2017
SK18.01.2017
SM18.01.2017
BG18.04.2017
NO18.04.2017
GR19.04.2017
IS18.05.2017
PT18.05.2017
IE29.06.2017
LU29.06.2017
MT29.06.2017
BE30.06.2017
CH30.06.2017
LI30.06.2017
[2019/51]
Former [2019/48]HU29.06.2012
AT18.01.2017
CY18.01.2017
CZ18.01.2017
DK18.01.2017
EE18.01.2017
ES18.01.2017
FI18.01.2017
HR18.01.2017
IT18.01.2017
LT18.01.2017
LV18.01.2017
MC18.01.2017
NL18.01.2017
PL18.01.2017
RO18.01.2017
RS18.01.2017
SE18.01.2017
SI18.01.2017
SK18.01.2017
SM18.01.2017
BG18.04.2017
NO18.04.2017
GR19.04.2017
IS18.05.2017
PT18.05.2017
IE29.06.2017
LU29.06.2017
MT29.06.2017
BE30.06.2017
CH30.06.2017
LI30.06.2017
Former [2019/31]HU29.06.2012
AT18.01.2017
CZ18.01.2017
DK18.01.2017
EE18.01.2017
ES18.01.2017
FI18.01.2017
HR18.01.2017
IT18.01.2017
LT18.01.2017
LV18.01.2017
MC18.01.2017
NL18.01.2017
PL18.01.2017
RO18.01.2017
RS18.01.2017
SE18.01.2017
SI18.01.2017
SK18.01.2017
SM18.01.2017
BG18.04.2017
NO18.04.2017
GR19.04.2017
IS18.05.2017
PT18.05.2017
IE29.06.2017
LU29.06.2017
MT29.06.2017
BE30.06.2017
CH30.06.2017
LI30.06.2017
Former [2018/43]AT18.01.2017
CZ18.01.2017
DK18.01.2017
EE18.01.2017
ES18.01.2017
FI18.01.2017
HR18.01.2017
IT18.01.2017
LT18.01.2017
LV18.01.2017
MC18.01.2017
NL18.01.2017
PL18.01.2017
RO18.01.2017
RS18.01.2017
SE18.01.2017
SI18.01.2017
SK18.01.2017
SM18.01.2017
BG18.04.2017
NO18.04.2017
GR19.04.2017
IS18.05.2017
PT18.05.2017
IE29.06.2017
LU29.06.2017
MT29.06.2017
BE30.06.2017
CH30.06.2017
LI30.06.2017
Former [2018/39]AT18.01.2017
CZ18.01.2017
DK18.01.2017
EE18.01.2017
ES18.01.2017
FI18.01.2017
HR18.01.2017
IT18.01.2017
LT18.01.2017
LV18.01.2017
MC18.01.2017
NL18.01.2017
PL18.01.2017
RO18.01.2017
RS18.01.2017
SE18.01.2017
SI18.01.2017
SK18.01.2017
SM18.01.2017
BG18.04.2017
NO18.04.2017
GR19.04.2017
IS18.05.2017
PT18.05.2017
IE29.06.2017
LU29.06.2017
BE30.06.2017
CH30.06.2017
LI30.06.2017
Former [2018/23]AT18.01.2017
CZ18.01.2017
DK18.01.2017
EE18.01.2017
ES18.01.2017
FI18.01.2017
HR18.01.2017
IT18.01.2017
LT18.01.2017
LV18.01.2017
MC18.01.2017
NL18.01.2017
PL18.01.2017
RO18.01.2017
RS18.01.2017
SE18.01.2017
SI18.01.2017
SK18.01.2017
SM18.01.2017
BG18.04.2017
NO18.04.2017
GR19.04.2017
IS18.05.2017
PT18.05.2017
IE29.06.2017
LU29.06.2017
CH30.06.2017
LI30.06.2017
Former [2018/21]AT18.01.2017
CZ18.01.2017
DK18.01.2017
EE18.01.2017
ES18.01.2017
FI18.01.2017
HR18.01.2017
IT18.01.2017
LT18.01.2017
LV18.01.2017
MC18.01.2017
NL18.01.2017
PL18.01.2017
RO18.01.2017
RS18.01.2017
SE18.01.2017
SI18.01.2017
SK18.01.2017
SM18.01.2017
BG18.04.2017
NO18.04.2017
GR19.04.2017
IS18.05.2017
PT18.05.2017
LU29.06.2017
CH30.06.2017
LI30.06.2017
Former [2018/14]AT18.01.2017
CZ18.01.2017
DK18.01.2017
EE18.01.2017
ES18.01.2017
FI18.01.2017
HR18.01.2017
IT18.01.2017
LT18.01.2017
LV18.01.2017
MC18.01.2017
NL18.01.2017
PL18.01.2017
RO18.01.2017
RS18.01.2017
SE18.01.2017
SI18.01.2017
SK18.01.2017
SM18.01.2017
BG18.04.2017
NO18.04.2017
GR19.04.2017
IS18.05.2017
PT18.05.2017
Former [2018/11]AT18.01.2017
CZ18.01.2017
DK18.01.2017
EE18.01.2017
ES18.01.2017
FI18.01.2017
HR18.01.2017
IT18.01.2017
LT18.01.2017
LV18.01.2017
MC18.01.2017
NL18.01.2017
PL18.01.2017
RO18.01.2017
RS18.01.2017
SE18.01.2017
SK18.01.2017
SM18.01.2017
BG18.04.2017
NO18.04.2017
GR19.04.2017
IS18.05.2017
PT18.05.2017
Former [2017/51]AT18.01.2017
CZ18.01.2017
DK18.01.2017
EE18.01.2017
ES18.01.2017
FI18.01.2017
HR18.01.2017
IT18.01.2017
LT18.01.2017
LV18.01.2017
NL18.01.2017
PL18.01.2017
RO18.01.2017
RS18.01.2017
SE18.01.2017
SK18.01.2017
SM18.01.2017
BG18.04.2017
NO18.04.2017
GR19.04.2017
IS18.05.2017
PT18.05.2017
Former [2017/50]AT18.01.2017
CZ18.01.2017
DK18.01.2017
EE18.01.2017
ES18.01.2017
FI18.01.2017
HR18.01.2017
IT18.01.2017
LT18.01.2017
LV18.01.2017
NL18.01.2017
PL18.01.2017
RO18.01.2017
RS18.01.2017
SE18.01.2017
SK18.01.2017
BG18.04.2017
NO18.04.2017
GR19.04.2017
IS18.05.2017
PT18.05.2017
Former [2017/49]AT18.01.2017
CZ18.01.2017
EE18.01.2017
ES18.01.2017
FI18.01.2017
HR18.01.2017
IT18.01.2017
LT18.01.2017
LV18.01.2017
NL18.01.2017
PL18.01.2017
RO18.01.2017
RS18.01.2017
SE18.01.2017
SK18.01.2017
BG18.04.2017
NO18.04.2017
GR19.04.2017
IS18.05.2017
PT18.05.2017
Former [2017/48]AT18.01.2017
CZ18.01.2017
ES18.01.2017
FI18.01.2017
HR18.01.2017
LT18.01.2017
LV18.01.2017
NL18.01.2017
PL18.01.2017
RS18.01.2017
SE18.01.2017
BG18.04.2017
NO18.04.2017
GR19.04.2017
IS18.05.2017
PT18.05.2017
Former [2017/40]AT18.01.2017
ES18.01.2017
FI18.01.2017
HR18.01.2017
LT18.01.2017
LV18.01.2017
NL18.01.2017
PL18.01.2017
RS18.01.2017
SE18.01.2017
BG18.04.2017
NO18.04.2017
GR19.04.2017
IS18.05.2017
PT18.05.2017
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0142139  (MITSUBISHI METAL CORP [JP]) [A] 1-14 * column 5, lines 6-13; figure - *;
 [A]EP2039444  (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-14 * table 6 *
ExaminationUS7036554
 DE19747002
by applicantEP1649950
otherUS7036554
 US4248630
 EP2529860
 US5411240
 US7036554