blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2748039 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2748039



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 139
11.01.2016 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
05.03.2015 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
05.02.2015 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
10.01.2015 English translation of the claims Search / examination 2
10.01.2015 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
10.01.2015 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
17.11.2014 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
17.11.2014 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
17.11.2014 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
17.11.2014 Text intended for grant Search / examination 12
14.10.2014 Examination started Search / examination 1
04.06.2014 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
25.04.2014 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
04.04.2014 Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
02.04.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
03.03.2014 Annexes to the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 2
03.03.2014 Annexes to the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 4
03.03.2014 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 5
29.08.2013 Priority search results Search / examination 4
29.08.2013 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 7
24.07.2013 Annex to International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 6
24.07.2013 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
24.07.2013 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
24.07.2013 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
24.07.2013 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
24.07.2013 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
24.07.2013 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
24.07.2013 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
24.07.2013 Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
27.03.2013 Notification of election of EPO Search / examination 1
19.03.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 15
28.02.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
28.02.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
28.02.2013 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 13
18.02.2013 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
18.02.2013 Notification of receipt of demand PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
08.02.2013 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
08.02.2013 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
08.02.2013 Payment of fees and costs PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
03.12.2012 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
03.12.2012 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
03.12.2012 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
04.08.2012 Abstract PCT receiving Office 1
04.08.2012 Claims PCT receiving Office 2
04.08.2012 Description PCT receiving Office 8
04.08.2012 Drawings PCT receiving Office 2