blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2748039


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
12.10.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.11.2018  [2018/46]
13.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.08.2018  [2018/33]
29.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.08.2018  [2018/31]
08.09.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.10.2017  [2017/41]
01.09.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.10.2017  [2017/40]
25.08.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.09.2017  [2017/39]
28.04.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  31.05.2017  [2017/22]
15.07.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  17.08.2016  [2016/33]
29.04.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.06.2016  [2016/22]
01.04.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.05.2016  [2016/18]
25.03.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.04.2016  [2016/17]
19.02.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  23.03.2016  [2016/12]
15.01.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  17.02.2016  [2016/07]
08.01.2016 No opposition filed within time limit published on  10.02.2016  [2016/06]
13.11.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.12.2015  [2015/51]
06.11.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  09.12.2015  [2015/50]
04.11.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  02.12.2015  [2015/49]
04.09.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.10.2015  [2015/41]
21.08.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  23.09.2015  [2015/39]
07.08.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  09.09.2015  [2015/37]
31.07.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  02.09.2015  [2015/36]
24.07.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.08.2015  [2015/35]
06.02.2015 (Expected) grant published on  04.03.2015  [2015/10]
23.01.2015 Change - classification published on  25.02.2015  [2015/09]
23.01.2015 Change - classification published on  25.02.2015  [2015/09]
20.01.2015 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
20.01.2015 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
15.01.2015 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
18.11.2014 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
31.10.2014 Change - extension states published on  03.12.2014  [2014/49]
04.09.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
30.05.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  02.07.2014  [2014/27]
30.05.2014 Request for examination filed published on  02.07.2014  [2014/27]
28.03.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
03.09.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
27.03.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
15.03.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
01.03.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
24.08.2012 PCT data prior to European publication