blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2748039 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201280033894 EP12746281



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9205806Global Dossier 08.12.2015B2
US2014219508 07.08.2014A1
Priority number Date
DE102011111600 25.08.2011
WO2012EP03343 04.08.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN103648853BGlobal Dossier 11.05.2016B
CN103648853 19.03.2014A
Priority number Date
DE102011111600 25.08.2011
WO2012EP03343 04.08.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2748039Global Dossier 04.03.2015B1
EP2748039 02.07.2014A1
Priority number Date
DE102011111600 25.08.2011
WO2012EP03343 04.08.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ES2534284T 21.04.2015T3
Priority number Date
DE102011111600 25.08.2011
WO2012EP03343 04.08.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2013026529Global Dossier 28.02.2013A1
Priority number Date
DE102011111600 25.08.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE102011111600 28.02.2013A1
Priority number Date
DE102011111600 25.08.2011