Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2748039

EP2748039 - METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A VEHICLE BOOT LID OF A VEHICLE AND ASSOCIATED VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.01.2016
Database last updated on 26.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Audi AG
85045 Ingolstadt / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/27]For all designated states
Audi AG
85045 Ingolstadt / DE
Inventor(s)01 / GÜNTER, Christian
Manfred-Hochstatter-Str. 8
85055 Ingolstadt / DE
 [2014/27]
Representative(s)Thielmann, Frank
AUDI AG
Patentabteilung
85045 Ingolstadt / DE
[2014/27]
Application number, filing date12746281.004.08.2012
WO2012EP03343
Priority number, dateDE20111011160025.08.2011         Original published format: DE102011111600
[2014/27]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013026529
Date:28.02.2013
Language:DE
[2013/09]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2748039
Date:02.07.2014
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.02.2013
[2014/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2748039
Date:04.03.2015
Language:DE
[2015/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.02.2013
ClassificationInternational:B60R25/24, B60R25/20
[2015/09]
Former International [2014/27]B60R25/24, B60R25/20, E05F15/20
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/27]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM STEUERN EINER KLAPPE EINES FAHRZEUGS UND ZUGEHÖRIGES FAHRZEUG[2014/27]
English:METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A VEHICLE BOOT LID OF A VEHICLE AND ASSOCIATED VEHICLE[2014/27]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE D'UN HAYON D'UN VÉHICULE ET VÉHICULE ASSOCIÉ[2014/27]
Entry into regional phase25.03.2014National basic fee paid 
25.03.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
25.03.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.02.2013Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
25.03.2014Examination requested  [2014/27]
17.11.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.01.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
12.01.2015Fee for grant paid
12.01.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  17.11.2014
Opposition(s)07.12.2015No opposition filed within time limit [2016/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU04.08.2012
AL04.03.2015
BG04.03.2015
CY04.03.2015
CZ04.03.2015
DK04.03.2015
EE04.03.2015
FI04.03.2015
HR04.03.2015
LT04.03.2015
LV04.03.2015
MC04.03.2015
MK04.03.2015
MT04.03.2015
NL04.03.2015
PL04.03.2015
RO04.03.2015
RS04.03.2015
SE04.03.2015
SI04.03.2015
SK04.03.2015
SM04.03.2015
TR04.03.2015
NO04.06.2015
GR05.06.2015
IS04.07.2015
PT06.07.2015
IE04.08.2015
LU04.08.2015
BE31.08.2015
CH31.08.2015
LI31.08.2015
[2018/46]
Former [2018/31]HU04.08.2012
BG04.03.2015
CY04.03.2015
CZ04.03.2015
DK04.03.2015
EE04.03.2015
FI04.03.2015
HR04.03.2015
LT04.03.2015
LV04.03.2015
MC04.03.2015
MK04.03.2015
MT04.03.2015
NL04.03.2015
PL04.03.2015
RO04.03.2015
RS04.03.2015
SE04.03.2015
SI04.03.2015
SK04.03.2015
SM04.03.2015
TR04.03.2015
NO04.06.2015
GR05.06.2015
IS04.07.2015
PT06.07.2015
IE04.08.2015
LU04.08.2015
BE31.08.2015
CH31.08.2015
LI31.08.2015
Former [2017/39]HU04.08.2012
BG04.03.2015
CY04.03.2015
CZ04.03.2015
DK04.03.2015
EE04.03.2015
FI04.03.2015
HR04.03.2015
LT04.03.2015
LV04.03.2015
MC04.03.2015
MT04.03.2015
NL04.03.2015
PL04.03.2015
RO04.03.2015
RS04.03.2015
SE04.03.2015
SI04.03.2015
SK04.03.2015
SM04.03.2015
NO04.06.2015
GR05.06.2015
IS04.07.2015
PT06.07.2015
IE04.08.2015
LU04.08.2015
BE31.08.2015
CH31.08.2015
LI31.08.2015
Former [2017/22]CZ04.03.2015
DK04.03.2015
EE04.03.2015
FI04.03.2015
HR04.03.2015
LT04.03.2015
LV04.03.2015
MC04.03.2015
MT04.03.2015
NL04.03.2015
PL04.03.2015
RO04.03.2015
RS04.03.2015
SE04.03.2015
SI04.03.2015
SK04.03.2015
NO04.06.2015
GR05.06.2015
IS04.07.2015
PT06.07.2015
IE04.08.2015
LU04.08.2015
CH31.08.2015
LI31.08.2015
Former [2016/33]CZ04.03.2015
DK04.03.2015
EE04.03.2015
FI04.03.2015
HR04.03.2015
LT04.03.2015
LV04.03.2015
MC04.03.2015
NL04.03.2015
PL04.03.2015
RO04.03.2015
RS04.03.2015
SE04.03.2015
SI04.03.2015
SK04.03.2015
NO04.06.2015
GR05.06.2015
IS04.07.2015
PT06.07.2015
IE04.08.2015
LU04.08.2015
CH31.08.2015
LI31.08.2015
Former [2016/22]CZ04.03.2015
DK04.03.2015
EE04.03.2015
FI04.03.2015
HR04.03.2015
LT04.03.2015
LV04.03.2015
MC04.03.2015
NL04.03.2015
PL04.03.2015
RO04.03.2015
RS04.03.2015
SE04.03.2015
SI04.03.2015
SK04.03.2015
NO04.06.2015
GR05.06.2015
IS04.07.2015
PT06.07.2015
LU04.08.2015
CH31.08.2015
LI31.08.2015
Former [2016/18]CZ04.03.2015
DK04.03.2015
EE04.03.2015
FI04.03.2015
HR04.03.2015
LT04.03.2015
LV04.03.2015
MC04.03.2015
NL04.03.2015
PL04.03.2015
RO04.03.2015
RS04.03.2015
SE04.03.2015
SI04.03.2015
SK04.03.2015
NO04.06.2015
GR05.06.2015
IS04.07.2015
PT06.07.2015
LU04.08.2015
Former [2016/17]CZ04.03.2015
DK04.03.2015
EE04.03.2015
FI04.03.2015
HR04.03.2015
LT04.03.2015
LV04.03.2015
NL04.03.2015
PL04.03.2015
RO04.03.2015
RS04.03.2015
SE04.03.2015
SI04.03.2015
SK04.03.2015
NO04.06.2015
GR05.06.2015
IS04.07.2015
PT06.07.2015
LU04.08.2015
Former [2016/12]CZ04.03.2015
DK04.03.2015
EE04.03.2015
FI04.03.2015
HR04.03.2015
LT04.03.2015
LV04.03.2015
NL04.03.2015
PL04.03.2015
RO04.03.2015
RS04.03.2015
SE04.03.2015
SI04.03.2015
SK04.03.2015
NO04.06.2015
GR05.06.2015
IS04.07.2015
PT06.07.2015
Former [2016/07]CZ04.03.2015
DK04.03.2015
EE04.03.2015
FI04.03.2015
HR04.03.2015
LT04.03.2015
LV04.03.2015
NL04.03.2015
PL04.03.2015
RO04.03.2015
RS04.03.2015
SE04.03.2015
SK04.03.2015
NO04.06.2015
GR05.06.2015
IS04.07.2015
PT06.07.2015
Former [2015/50]CZ04.03.2015
EE04.03.2015
FI04.03.2015
HR04.03.2015
LT04.03.2015
LV04.03.2015
NL04.03.2015
PL04.03.2015
RO04.03.2015
RS04.03.2015
SE04.03.2015
SK04.03.2015
NO04.06.2015
GR05.06.2015
IS04.07.2015
PT06.07.2015
Former [2015/49]CZ04.03.2015
EE04.03.2015
FI04.03.2015
HR04.03.2015
LT04.03.2015
LV04.03.2015
NL04.03.2015
RO04.03.2015
RS04.03.2015
SE04.03.2015
SK04.03.2015
NO04.06.2015
GR05.06.2015
PT06.07.2015
Former [2015/41]FI04.03.2015
HR04.03.2015
LT04.03.2015
LV04.03.2015
NL04.03.2015
RS04.03.2015
SE04.03.2015
NO04.06.2015
GR05.06.2015
Former [2015/39]FI04.03.2015
HR04.03.2015
LT04.03.2015
LV04.03.2015
RS04.03.2015
SE04.03.2015
NO04.06.2015
GR05.06.2015
Former [2015/37]FI04.03.2015
HR04.03.2015
LT04.03.2015
SE04.03.2015
NO04.06.2015
GR05.06.2015
Former [2015/36]FI04.03.2015
HR04.03.2015
LT04.03.2015
SE04.03.2015
NO04.06.2015
Former [2015/35]LT04.03.2015
NO04.06.2015
Cited inInternational search[XI]JP2005315024  (FUJITSU TEN LTD, et al) [X] 1,2,4,9,10 * abstract * * paragraph [0084]; figures 1-5 * [I] 3,5-8,11;
 [XDI]DE102006037237  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [XD] 1,2,5,7-9 * abstract * * paragraphs [0010] , [0031]; figures 1,4 * [I] 3,6,11;
 [ID]EP1571601  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [ID] 1,2,5,6,9 * paragraphs [0006] - [0008] - [0011] - [0014]; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]DE102009030274  (DAIMLER AG [DE]) [A] 3,11 * paragraphs [0017] , [0022]; figure . *;
 [A]US2007045019  (CARTER SCOTT J [US], et al) [A] 4,10 * paragraph [0083]; figure 3 *;
 [A]US2007018813  (LIGGITT RICHARD C [US]) [A] 4,10 * paragraph [0016]; figure 3 *;
 [AD]DE10341691  (KIEKERT AG [DE]) [AD] 1,9 * paragraphs [0032] , [0037] - [0039]; figures 2-4 *;
 [A]JP2010236184  (AISIN SEIKI) [A] 1,9 * abstract *
by applicantDE19818263
 EP1571601
 DE10341691
 EP0994444
 DE102005042402
 DE102006037237
 DE102009040395