Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2741780

EP2741780 - METHOD FOR THE CONTROLLED INTRACELLULAR DELIVERY OF NUCLEIC ACIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  27.04.2018
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  21.08.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip27.04.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 30.05.2018  [2018/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ludwig-Maximilians-Universität München
Geschwister-Scholl-Platz 1
80539 München / DE
[2014/25]
Inventor(s)01 / BESHEER, Ahmed
Schirmerweg 12
81245 Munich / DE
02 / NOGA, Matthäus
Schlierseestr. 71
81539 Munich / DE
03 / WINTER, Gerhard
Antdorfer Str. 18
82377 Penzberg / DE
04 / WAGNER, Ernst
Guardinistr. 94
81375 Munich / DE
05 / EDINGER, Daniel
Watzmannstr. 3a
85598 Baldham / DE
 [2014/25]
Representative(s)Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Pilgersheimer Straße 20
81543 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/25]Danner, Stefan
LifeTech IP
Spies Danner & Partner
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Elsenheimerstrasse 47a
80687 München / DE
Application number, filing date12748193.510.08.2012
WO2012EP65735
Priority number, dateEP2011017717510.08.2011         Original published format: EP 11177175
EP2011019503021.12.2011         Original published format: EP 11195030
[2014/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013021056
Date:14.02.2013
Language:EN
[2013/07]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2741780
Date:18.06.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.02.2013
[2014/25]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.02.2013
ClassificationInternational:A61K47/48
[2014/25]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/25]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR GESTEUERTEN INTRAZELLULÄREN FREISETZUNG VON NUKLEINSÄUREN[2014/25]
English:METHOD FOR THE CONTROLLED INTRACELLULAR DELIVERY OF NUCLEIC ACIDS[2014/25]
French:PROCÉDÉ D'ADMINISTRATION INTRACELLULAIRE CONTRÔLÉE D'ACIDES NUCLÉIQUES[2014/25]
Entry into regional phase19.11.2013National basic fee paid 
19.11.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
19.11.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.11.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.11.2013Examination requested  [2014/25]
02.06.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.09.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.12.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.06.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.08.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
21.10.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/22]
17.11.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2018/22]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  02.06.2015
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
10.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
11.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
31.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.201403   M06   Fee paid on   26.09.2014
Cited inInternational search[XDI]WO2011026641  (CUREVAC GMBH [DE]; BAUMHOF PATRICK [DE]; SCHLAKE THOMAS [DE]) [XD] 1,8-10,13 * examples;; claims 1,9,14-16 * [I] 1-4,8-15;
 [A]  - EDINGER D ET AL, "Bioresponsive polymers for the delivery of therapeutic nucleic acids", WILEY INTERDISCIPLINARY REVIEWS: NANOMEDICINE AND NANOBIOTECHNOLOGY 2011 WILEY-BLACKWELL USA, (201101), vol. 3, no. 1, ISSN 1939-5116, pages 33 - 46, XP055048781 [A] 1-15 * pages 38-39, section "Polyplex Shielding";; figure 4 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/wnan.97
 [XP]  - MATTHÄUS NOGA ET AL, "Controlled shielding and deshielding of gene delivery polyplexes using hydroxyethyl starch (HES) and alpha-amylase", JOURNAL OF CONTROLLED RELEASE, (20120401), vol. 159, no. 1, doi:10.1016/j.jconrel.2012.01.006, ISSN 0168-3659, pages 92 - 103, XP055048778 [XP] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jconrel.2012.01.006
by applicantWO2011026641
 US2011054152
 WO2005092928
 US5424302
    - ELBASHIR, S.M. ET AL., NATURE, (2001), vol. 411, pages 494 - 498
    - DE FOUGEROLLES, A. ET AL., NAT. REV. DRUG DISCOV., (2007), vol. 6, pages 443 - 453
    - SCHROEDER; A. ET AL., J. INTERN. MED., (2010), vol. 267, pages 9 - 21
    - LIU, Y.P; BERKHOUT, B., CURR. TOP. MED. CHEM., (2009), vol. 9, pages 1130 - 1143
    - HOWARD, K.A., ADV. DRUG DELIV. REV., (2009), vol. 61, pages 710 - 720
    - FONSECA, S.B ET AL., ADV. DRUG DELIV. REV., (2009), vol. 61, pages 953 - 964
    - NAT. REV. DRUG DISCOV., (2003), vol. 2, pages 214 - 221
    - XU, L. ET AL., J. PHARM. SCI., (2011), vol. 100, pages 38 - 52
    - MISHRA, S. ET AL., EUR. J. CELL BIOL., (2004), vol. 83, pages 97 - 111
    - WALKER, G.F. ET AL., MOL. THER., (2005), vol. 11, pages 418 - 425
    - Organische Chemie, SPRINGER VERLAG, (2009), pages 485 - 496
    - KIRCHEIS R. ET AL., GENE THER., (2001), vol. 8, pages 28 - 40
    - BARTEL, D.P., CELL, (2004), vol. 23, pages 281 - 292
    - HE, L.; HANNON, G.J., NAT. REV. GENET., (2004), vol. 5, pages 522 - 531
    - DORSETT, Y.; TUSCHL, T., NAT. REV. DRUG DISC., (2004), vol. 3, pages 318 - 329
    - RANA, T.M., NAT. REV. MOL. CELL BIOL., (2007), vol. 8, pages 23 - 36
    - SIOLAS, D. ET AL., NAT. BIOTECHNOL., (2004), vol. 23, pages 227 - 231
    - OROM, U.A. ET AL., GENE, (2006), vol. 372, pages 137 - 141
    - KRUTZFELDT, J. ET AL., NATURE, (2005), vol. 438, pages 685 - 689
    - EBERT, M.S. ET AL., NAT. METHODS, (2007), vol. 4, pages 721 - 726
    - IRVINE, A.S. ET AL., NAT. BIOTECH., (2000), vol. 18, pages 1273 - 1278
    - HASHIMOTO, H. ET AL., KUNSTSTOFFE, KAUTSCHUK, FASERN, (1992), vol. 9, pages 1271 - 1279
    - MAEDA, H. ET AL., J. CONTR. RELEASE, (2001), vol. 74, pages 47 - 61
    - LYER, A.K. ET AL., DRUG. DISCOV. TODAY, (2006), vol. 11, pages 812 - 818
    - LOCHMANN, D., J. PHARM. BIOPHARM., (2004), vol. 58, pages 237 - 251
    - VILIJOEN, A.; TWOMEY, P.J., J. CLIN. PATHOL., (2007), vol. 60, pages 584 - 585
    - BRETAUDIERE, R. ET AL., CLIN. CHEM., (1981), vol. 27, pages 806 - 815
    - JUNGE, W. ET AL., CLIN. BIOCHEM., (2001), vol. 34, pages 607 - 615
    - UNGARO, F. ET AL., J. PHARM. BIOMED. ANAL., (2003), vol. 31, pages 143 - 149
    - SAUERBREY, G., ZEITSCHRIFT FUR PHYSIK, (1959), vol. 155, pages 206 - 222
    - CALDWELL, M.L. ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1953), vol. 75, pages 3132 - 3135
    - YOPSHIDA,M.; KISHIKAWA, T., STARCH-STäRKE, (1984), vol. 36, pages 167 - 169
    - ZOU, S.M. ET AL., J. GENE MED., (2000), vol. 2, pages 128 - 134
    - GREISH, K., J. DRUG TARGET., (2007), vol. 15, pages 457 - 464
    - GOULA, D ET AL., GENE THERAPY, (1998), vol. 5, pages 1291 - 1293
    - NIE, Y. ET AL., BIOMATERIALS, (2011), vol. 32, pages 858 - 869