Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2748448

EP2748448 - METHOD AND ARRANGEMENT FOR CONTROLLING MISFIRE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.09.2016
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Wärtsilä Finland Oy
Tarhaajantie 2
65380 Vaasa / FI
[2014/27]
Inventor(s)01 / ÖSTMAN, Fredrik
Koulukatu 32 A 4
FI-65100 Vaasa / FI
02 / PORTIN, Kaj
Punakivenkatu 7
FI-65300 Vaasa / FI
 [2014/27]
Representative(s)Berggren Oy, Helsinki & Oulu
P.O. Box 16
Eteläinen Rautatiekatu 10A
00101 Helsinki / FI
[N/P]
Former [2015/47]Berggren Oy Ab
P.O. Box 16
Eteläinen Rautatiekatu 10A
00101 Helsinki / FI
Former [2014/27]Berggren Oy Ab
P.O. Box 16
Antinkatu 3 C
00101 Helsinki / FI
Application number, filing date12748241.223.07.2012
[2015/47]
WO2012FI50746
Priority number, dateFI2011000582325.08.2011         Original published format: FI 20115823
[2014/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013026950
Date:28.02.2013
Language:EN
[2013/09]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2748448
Date:02.07.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.02.2013
[2014/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2748448
Date:18.11.2015
Language:EN
[2015/47]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.02.2013
ClassificationInternational:F02D35/02, G01M15/11
[2014/27]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/27]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND ANORDNUNG ZUR STEUERUNG VON FEHLZÜNDUNGEN[2014/27]
English:METHOD AND ARRANGEMENT FOR CONTROLLING MISFIRE[2014/27]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET AGENCEMENT POUR LE RÉGLAGE D'UN DÉFAUT D'ALLUMAGE[2014/27]
Entry into regional phase22.01.2014National basic fee paid 
22.01.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
22.01.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.01.2014Examination requested  [2014/27]
18.08.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.10.2015Fee for grant paid
01.10.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
01.10.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.08.2015
Opposition(s)19.08.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
10.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU23.07.2012
AL18.11.2015
AT18.11.2015
BE18.11.2015
BG18.11.2015
CY18.11.2015
CZ18.11.2015
DK18.11.2015
EE18.11.2015
ES18.11.2015
FI18.11.2015
HR18.11.2015
IT18.11.2015
LT18.11.2015
LV18.11.2015
MC18.11.2015
MK18.11.2015
NL18.11.2015
PL18.11.2015
RO18.11.2015
RS18.11.2015
SE18.11.2015
SI18.11.2015
SK18.11.2015
SM18.11.2015
TR18.11.2015
GR19.02.2016
IS18.03.2016
PT18.03.2016
GB23.07.2016
IE23.07.2016
LU23.07.2016
CH31.07.2016
LI31.07.2016
MT31.07.2016
FR01.08.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/45]HU23.07.2012
AT18.11.2015
BE18.11.2015
BG18.11.2015
CY18.11.2015
CZ18.11.2015
DK18.11.2015
EE18.11.2015
ES18.11.2015
FI18.11.2015
HR18.11.2015
IT18.11.2015
LT18.11.2015
LV18.11.2015
MC18.11.2015
MK18.11.2015
NL18.11.2015
PL18.11.2015
RO18.11.2015
RS18.11.2015
SE18.11.2015
SI18.11.2015
SK18.11.2015
SM18.11.2015
TR18.11.2015
GR19.02.2016
IS18.03.2016
PT18.03.2016
GB23.07.2016
IE23.07.2016
LU23.07.2016
CH31.07.2016
LI31.07.2016
MT31.07.2016
FR01.08.2016
Former [2018/38]HU23.07.2012
AT18.11.2015
BE18.11.2015
BG18.11.2015
CY18.11.2015
CZ18.11.2015
DK18.11.2015
EE18.11.2015
ES18.11.2015
FI18.11.2015
HR18.11.2015
IT18.11.2015
LT18.11.2015
LV18.11.2015
MC18.11.2015
MK18.11.2015
NL18.11.2015
PL18.11.2015
RO18.11.2015
RS18.11.2015
SE18.11.2015
SI18.11.2015
SK18.11.2015
SM18.11.2015
GR19.02.2016
IS18.03.2016
PT18.03.2016
GB23.07.2016
IE23.07.2016
LU23.07.2016
CH31.07.2016
LI31.07.2016
MT31.07.2016
FR01.08.2016
Former [2018/31]HU23.07.2012
AT18.11.2015
BE18.11.2015
CY18.11.2015
CZ18.11.2015
DK18.11.2015
EE18.11.2015
ES18.11.2015
FI18.11.2015
HR18.11.2015
IT18.11.2015
LT18.11.2015
LV18.11.2015
MC18.11.2015
MK18.11.2015
NL18.11.2015
PL18.11.2015
RO18.11.2015
RS18.11.2015
SE18.11.2015
SI18.11.2015
SK18.11.2015
SM18.11.2015
GR19.02.2016
IS18.03.2016
PT18.03.2016
GB23.07.2016
IE23.07.2016
LU23.07.2016
CH31.07.2016
LI31.07.2016
MT31.07.2016
FR01.08.2016
Former [2018/28]HU23.07.2012
AT18.11.2015
BE18.11.2015
CY18.11.2015
CZ18.11.2015
DK18.11.2015
EE18.11.2015
ES18.11.2015
FI18.11.2015
HR18.11.2015
IT18.11.2015
LT18.11.2015
LV18.11.2015
MC18.11.2015
MK18.11.2015
NL18.11.2015
PL18.11.2015
RO18.11.2015
RS18.11.2015
SE18.11.2015
SI18.11.2015
SK18.11.2015
SM18.11.2015
GR19.02.2016
IS18.03.2016
PT18.03.2016
GB23.07.2016
IE23.07.2016
LU23.07.2016
CH31.07.2016
LI31.07.2016
FR01.08.2016
Former [2017/36]AT18.11.2015
BE18.11.2015
CZ18.11.2015
DK18.11.2015
EE18.11.2015
ES18.11.2015
FI18.11.2015
HR18.11.2015
IT18.11.2015
LT18.11.2015
LV18.11.2015
MC18.11.2015
NL18.11.2015
PL18.11.2015
RO18.11.2015
RS18.11.2015
SE18.11.2015
SI18.11.2015
SK18.11.2015
SM18.11.2015
GR19.02.2016
IS18.03.2016
PT18.03.2016
GB23.07.2016
IE23.07.2016
LU23.07.2016
CH31.07.2016
LI31.07.2016
FR01.08.2016
Former [2017/23]AT18.11.2015
BE18.11.2015
CZ18.11.2015
DK18.11.2015
EE18.11.2015
ES18.11.2015
FI18.11.2015
HR18.11.2015
IT18.11.2015
LT18.11.2015
LV18.11.2015
MC18.11.2015
NL18.11.2015
PL18.11.2015
RO18.11.2015
RS18.11.2015
SE18.11.2015
SI18.11.2015
SK18.11.2015
SM18.11.2015
GR19.02.2016
IS18.03.2016
PT18.03.2016
GB23.07.2016
CH31.07.2016
LI31.07.2016
FR01.08.2016
Former [2017/03]AT18.11.2015
BE18.11.2015
CZ18.11.2015
DK18.11.2015
EE18.11.2015
ES18.11.2015
FI18.11.2015
HR18.11.2015
IT18.11.2015
LT18.11.2015
LV18.11.2015
NL18.11.2015
PL18.11.2015
RO18.11.2015
RS18.11.2015
SE18.11.2015
SI18.11.2015
SK18.11.2015
SM18.11.2015
GR19.02.2016
IS18.03.2016
PT18.03.2016
Former [2016/49]AT18.11.2015
CZ18.11.2015
DK18.11.2015
EE18.11.2015
ES18.11.2015
FI18.11.2015
HR18.11.2015
IT18.11.2015
LT18.11.2015
LV18.11.2015
NL18.11.2015
PL18.11.2015
RO18.11.2015
RS18.11.2015
SE18.11.2015
SI18.11.2015
SK18.11.2015
SM18.11.2015
GR19.02.2016
IS18.03.2016
PT18.03.2016
Former [2016/39]AT18.11.2015
CZ18.11.2015
DK18.11.2015
EE18.11.2015
ES18.11.2015
FI18.11.2015
HR18.11.2015
IT18.11.2015
LT18.11.2015
LV18.11.2015
NL18.11.2015
PL18.11.2015
RO18.11.2015
RS18.11.2015
SE18.11.2015
SK18.11.2015
SM18.11.2015
GR19.02.2016
IS18.03.2016
PT18.03.2016
Former [2016/38]AT18.11.2015
CZ18.11.2015
EE18.11.2015
ES18.11.2015
FI18.11.2015
HR18.11.2015
IT18.11.2015
LT18.11.2015
LV18.11.2015
NL18.11.2015
PL18.11.2015
RO18.11.2015
RS18.11.2015
SE18.11.2015
SK18.11.2015
SM18.11.2015
GR19.02.2016
IS18.03.2016
PT18.03.2016
Former [2016/36]AT18.11.2015
CZ18.11.2015
EE18.11.2015
ES18.11.2015
FI18.11.2015
HR18.11.2015
IT18.11.2015
LT18.11.2015
LV18.11.2015
NL18.11.2015
PL18.11.2015
RO18.11.2015
RS18.11.2015
SE18.11.2015
SK18.11.2015
GR19.02.2016
IS18.03.2016
PT18.03.2016
Former [2016/34]AT18.11.2015
CZ18.11.2015
ES18.11.2015
FI18.11.2015
HR18.11.2015
IT18.11.2015
LT18.11.2015
LV18.11.2015
NL18.11.2015
PL18.11.2015
RS18.11.2015
SE18.11.2015
GR19.02.2016
IS18.03.2016
PT18.03.2016
Former [2016/25]AT18.11.2015
ES18.11.2015
FI18.11.2015
HR18.11.2015
IT18.11.2015
LT18.11.2015
LV18.11.2015
NL18.11.2015
PL18.11.2015
RS18.11.2015
SE18.11.2015
GR19.02.2016
IS18.03.2016
PT18.03.2016
Former [2016/24]AT18.11.2015
ES18.11.2015
FI18.11.2015
HR18.11.2015
IT18.11.2015
LT18.11.2015
NL18.11.2015
PL18.11.2015
RS18.11.2015
SE18.11.2015
GR19.02.2016
IS18.03.2016
PT18.03.2016
Former [2016/23]ES18.11.2015
HR18.11.2015
IT18.11.2015
LT18.11.2015
NL18.11.2015
RS18.11.2015
SE18.11.2015
IS18.03.2016
Former [2016/22]ES18.11.2015
IT18.11.2015
LT18.11.2015
NL18.11.2015
IS18.03.2016
Former [2016/21]ES18.11.2015
IT18.11.2015
LT18.11.2015
Former [2016/20]ES18.11.2015
LT18.11.2015
Cited inInternational search[A]US6158411  (MORIKAWA KOJI [JP]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2008264360  (DAGCI OGUZ H [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *;
 [A]US7031828  (THOMPSON JOHN M [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *
by applicantJP2004076668