Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2747737

EP2747737 - DENTAL COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING ADDITION-FRAGMENTATION AGENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  23.08.2019
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  10.04.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  11.05.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
3M Innovative Properties Company
3M Center
P.O.Box 33427
St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
[2019/39]
Former [2014/27]For all designated states
3M Innovative Properties Company
3M Center Post Office Box 33427
Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
Inventor(s)01 / JOLY, Guy D.
3M Center
Post Office Box 33427
Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US
02 / ABUELYAMAN, Ahmed S.
3M Center
Post Office Box 33427
Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US
03 / CRAIG, Bradley D.
3M Center
Post Office Box 33427
Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US
04 / FALSAFI, Afshin
3M Center
Post Office Box 33427
Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US
05 / OXMAN, Joel D.
3M Center
Post Office Box 33427
Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US
06 / KREPSKI, Larry R.
3M Center
Post Office Box 33427
Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US
07 / MOSER, William H.
3M Center
Post Office Box 33427
Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US
08 / YURT, Serkan
3M Center
Post Office Box 33427
Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US
 [2014/27]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[2019/39]
Former [2014/27]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date12748367.514.08.2012
[2019/39]
WO2012US50718
Priority number, dateUS201161526437P23.08.2011         Original published format: US 201161526437 P
[2014/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2013028397
Date:28.02.2013
Language:EN
[2013/09]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2747737
Date:02.07.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.02.2013
[2014/27]
Type: B1  Patent specification
No.:EP2747737
Date:25.09.2019
Language:EN
[2019/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP18.04.2013
ClassificationInternational:A61K6/00, A61K6/083
[2014/27]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/27]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:DENTALZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT ADDITIONSFRAGMENTIERUNGSMITTELN[2014/27]
English:DENTAL COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING ADDITION-FRAGMENTATION AGENTS[2014/27]
French:COMPOSITIONS DENTAIRES CONTENANT DES AGENTS D'ADDITION-FRAGMENTATION[2014/27]
Entry into regional phase20.02.2014National basic fee paid 
20.02.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
20.02.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.06.2013Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
20.02.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.02.2014Examination requested  [2014/27]
09.05.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.08.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.09.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.01.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.04.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.08.2019Fee for grant paid
08.08.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
08.08.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.05.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
10.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
11.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
14.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
10.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
15.08.2019Renewal fee patent year 08
Cited inInternational search[Y]US2008269460  (BOWMAN CHRISTOPHER N [US] ET AL) [Y] 1 * paragraph [0008]; claims 14, 16 *;
 [A]US2009030110  (KLEE JOACHIM E [DE] ET AL) [A] 1-23 * paragraph [0024]; claims 1, 4 *;
 [Y]US2006009574  (AERT HUUB V [BE] ET AL) [Y] 1 * paragraphs [0001] , [0 20] , [0 22] *;
 [A]US6316519  (BERGE CHARLES THOMAS [US] ET AL) [A] 1-6 * Formulas H, I; column 16 * * column 12, line 50 - line 58 *;
 [A]US6900280  (MURER PETER [CH]) [A] 1 * column 18, line 62 - column 19, line 13 * * column 17, line 20 - line 23 *
by applicantUS6153705
 WO9801478
 WO9935177
 WO9931144
 WO9858974
 US4547323
 US4886861
 US5324879
 US2011027523
 US2011041736
 US7888400
 US6794520
 US2010021869
 US2005017966
 US5130347
 US5154762
 US5925715
 US5962550
 US6126922
 US5545676
 US5501727
 US4503169
 US6387981
 US6572693
 WO0130305
 US6730156
 WO0130307
 WO03063804
 US7090721
 US7090722
 US7156911
 US7649029
 US7241437
 US2801185
 US4522958
 US6586483
 US6670436
 US7674850
 US2010311858
 US2009011388
 US2011196062
 US6376590
 US7429422
    - G. MOAD ET AL., "Radical addition-fragmentation chemistry in polymer synthesis", POLYMER, (20080303), vol. 49, no. 5, pages 1079 - 1131
    - MCIJS, MACROMOLECULES, (1998), vol. 21, no. 10, pages 3122 - 3124
    - R. R. CARA ET AL., PARTICULATE SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, (2010), vol. 28, pages 191 - 206
    - MATIJEVIC, E.,, Surface & Colloid Science, WILEY INTCRSCICNCC, (1973), vol. 6
    - "Polymerization Shrinkage Kinetics in Visible-Light-Cured Materials: Methods Development", DENTAL MATERIALS, (199110), pages 281 - 286
    - M.J. BENES; J. PESKA, COLLECT. CZECH. CHEM. COMMUN., (1983), vol. 48, pages 3065 - 3070
    - ADAMSON ET AL., "JCSOA9", J. CHCM. SOC., (1949), vol. 144, page 152
    - MOAD, C. L.; MOAD, G.; RIZZARDO, E.; THANG, S. H., MACROMOLECULES, (1996), vol. 29, pages 7717 - 7726
    - HUTSON, L.; KRSTINA, J.; MOAD, G.; MORROW, G. R.; POSTMA, A.; RIZZARDO, E.; THANG, S. H., MACROMOLECULES, (2004), vol. 37, pages 4441 - 4452
 EP20100168240