Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2734120

EP2734120 - A SYSTEM FOR ENABLING GENERATION OF PHOTOACOUSTIC IMAGES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  02.06.2017
Database last updated on 17.07.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  27.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip02.06.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 05.07.2017  [2017/27]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Universiteit Twente
Drienerlolaan 5
7522 NB Enschede / NL
[2014/22]
Inventor(s)01 / MANOHAR, Srirang
Mr. Eenhuisstraat 36
7481 LN Haaksbergen / NL
 [2014/22]
Representative(s)V.O.
P.O. Box 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
[N/P]
Former [2014/22]Jansen, Cornelis Marinus , et al
V.O.
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date12748566.219.07.2012
WO2012NL50520
Priority number, dateEP2011017466220.07.2011         Original published format: EP 11174662
[2014/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013012333
Date:24.01.2013
Language:EN
[2013/04]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2734120
Date:28.05.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.01.2013
[2014/22]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP24.01.2013
ClassificationInternational:A61B10/02, A61B5/00, G01N21/17, G01N21/39, G02B6/00
[2014/22]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/22]
TitleGerman:SYSTEM ZUR AKTIVIERUNG DER ERZEUGUNG PHOTOAKUSTISCHER BILDER[2014/22]
English:A SYSTEM FOR ENABLING GENERATION OF PHOTOACOUSTIC IMAGES[2014/22]
French:SYSTÈME POUR PERMETTRE LA GÉNÉRATION D'IMAGES PHOTO-ACOUSTIQUES[2014/22]
Entry into regional phase13.02.2014National basic fee paid 
13.02.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
13.02.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.02.2014Examination requested  [2014/22]
24.12.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.02.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/27]
28.02.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2017/27]
Request for further processing for:24.12.2014Request for further processing filed
24.12.2014Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
16.01.2015Decision despatched
24.12.2014Request for further processing filed
24.12.2014Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
16.01.2015Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
30.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.201605   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[XYI]US2009156932  (ZHAROV VLADIMIR PAVLOVICH [US]) [X] 1,2,4-8,13,15-19 * paragraphs [0009] , [0014] , [0043] , [0044] , [0066] , [0076] , [0077] , [0106] * [Y] 3,9-11,20 [I] 12;
 [Y]WO2009150563  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [Y] 3 * page 8, line 32 - page 10, line 23 *;
 [Y]US4785796  (MATTSON PHILIP D [US]) [Y] 9-11,20 * column 5, lines 12-35 *;
 [X]WO0024315  (UNIV TEXAS [US]) [X] 1-7,12-18 * page 9, line 15 - page 12, line 5; figure 2 *;
 [Y]WO2011073725  (MALARME LUC [BE], et al) [Y] 9-11,20 * paragraph [0022] *;
 [A]US6083192  (BATH PATRICIA E [US]) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2010029529  (SYNERON MEDICAL LTD [IL], et al) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2004131299  (ADORAM AVNER [IL], et al) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *
by applicantUS2009156932
 WO2009150563