blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2734120 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2734120



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 113
08.06.2017 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
30.05.2017 Closing of application Search / examination 1
28.02.2017 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of renewal fee) Search / examination 1
02.09.2016 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
08.10.2015 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
29.09.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
16.01.2015 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
24.12.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
24.12.2014 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
24.12.2014 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
24.12.2014 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 6
24.12.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
24.12.2014 Request for further processing Search / examination 6
04.11.2014 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-reply to Written Opinion) Search / examination 1
04.11.2014 Claim deemed abandoned Search / examination 2
30.04.2014 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
18.03.2014 Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
14.03.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
11.03.2014 Priority search results copy provided by EPO Search / examination 5
13.02.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
13.02.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
07.02.2014 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
06.02.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 8
29.11.2013 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
12.06.2013 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
13.02.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 25
24.01.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
24.01.2013 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 17
13.11.2012 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 3
13.11.2012 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
13.11.2012 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 3