blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2734120


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
02.06.2017 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  05.07.2017  [2017/27]
27.02.2017 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
03.09.2016 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
06.10.2015 Change - representative
03.07.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
31.03.2015 New entry: Decision on request for further processing
17.03.2015 New entry: Receipt of request for further processing
17.03.2015 New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing
14.02.2015 Amendment by applicant
22.01.2015 New entry: Decision on request for further processing
09.01.2015 Deletion: Loss of particular rights: despatch of communication + time limit
08.01.2015 New entry: Receipt of request for further processing
08.01.2015 New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing
04.11.2014 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
04.11.2014 New entry: Loss of particular rights: despatch of communication + time limit
26.09.2014 Change - extension states published on  29.10.2014  [2014/44]
04.07.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
25.04.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  28.05.2014  [2014/22]
25.04.2014 Request for examination filed published on  28.05.2014  [2014/22]
03.04.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
11.03.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
14.02.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
11.02.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
05.02.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
25.01.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
09.11.2012 PCT data prior to European publication
30.08.2012 PCT data prior to European publication