blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2734120 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

EP11174662 EP12748566



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2014155739Global Dossier 05.06.2014A1
Priority number Date
WO2012NL50520 19.07.2012
EP11174662 20.07.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2734120Global Dossier 28.05.2014A1
Priority number Date
WO2012NL50520 19.07.2012
EP12748566 19.07.2012
EP11174662 20.07.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2013012333Global Dossier 24.01.2013A1
Priority number Date
EP11174662 20.07.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP2548516Global Dossier 23.01.2013A1
Priority number Date
EP11174662 20.07.2011