Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2742167

EP2742167 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DEPOSITING ATOMIC LAYERS ON A SUBSTRATE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.08.2019
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  14.09.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  24.04.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  14.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip30.08.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): SK
published on 02.10.2019  [2019/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nederlandse Organisatie voor toegepast- natuurwetenschappelijk onderzoek TNO
Anna van Buerenplein 1
2595 DA 's-Gravenhage / NL
[2015/17]
Former [2014/25]For all designated states
Nederlandse Organisatie voor toegepast-natuurwetenschappelijk Onderzoek TNO
Schoemakerstraat 97
2628 VK Delft / NL
Inventor(s)01 / KNAAPEN, Raymond Jacobus Wilhelmus
c/o TNO-PLT
Schoemakerstraat 97
NL-2628 VK Delft / NL
02 / OLIESLAGERS, Ruud
c/o TNO-PLT
Schoemakerstraat 97
NL-2628 VK Delft / NL
03 / VAN DEN BERG, Dennis
c/o TNO-PLT
Schoemakerstraat 97
NL-2628 VK Delft / NL
04 / VAN DEN BOER, Matijs C.
c/o TNO-PLT
Schoemakerstraat 97
NL-2628 VK Delft / NL
05 / MAAS, Diederik Jan
c/o TNO-PLT
Schoemakerstraat 97
NL-2628 VK Delft / NL
06 / VAN DER DONCK, Jacques Cor Johan
c/o TNO-PLT
Schoemakerstraat 97
NL-2628 VK Delft / NL
07 / ROOZEBOOM, Freddy
c/o TNO-PLT
Schoemakerstraat 97
NL-2628 VK Delft / NL
 [2014/25]
Representative(s)V.O.
P.O. Box 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
[2018/42]
Former [2014/25]Jansen, Cornelis Marinus
V.O.
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date12748571.230.07.2012
[2018/42]
WO2012NL50540
Priority number, dateEP2011017716610.08.2011         Original published format: EP 11177166
[2014/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013022339
Date:14.02.2013
Language:EN
[2013/07]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2742167
Date:18.06.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.02.2013
[2014/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2742167
Date:17.10.2018
Language:EN
[2018/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.02.2013
ClassificationInternational:C23C16/44, C23C16/52, C23C16/54, C23C16/455, C23C16/458
[2014/25]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/25]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ATOMLAGENABSCHEIDUNG AUF EIN SUBSTRAT[2014/25]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DEPOSITING ATOMIC LAYERS ON A SUBSTRATE[2014/25]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR LE DÉPÔT DE COUCHES ATOMIQUES SUR UN SUBSTRAT[2014/25]
Entry into regional phase03.03.2014National basic fee paid 
03.03.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
03.03.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.03.2014Examination requested  [2014/25]
16.09.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.05.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.11.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.04.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.08.2018Fee for grant paid
21.08.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
21.08.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  17.05.2016
Opposition(s)18.07.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
23.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
22.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
24.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
27.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL17.10.2018
AT17.10.2018
CZ17.10.2018
DK17.10.2018
EE17.10.2018
ES17.10.2018
FI17.10.2018
HR17.10.2018
IT17.10.2018
LT17.10.2018
LV17.10.2018
PL17.10.2018
RO17.10.2018
RS17.10.2018
SE17.10.2018
SK17.10.2018
SM17.10.2018
BG17.01.2019
NO17.01.2019
GR18.01.2019
IS17.02.2019
PT17.02.2019
[2019/40]
Former [2019/37]AL17.10.2018
AT17.10.2018
CZ17.10.2018
DK17.10.2018
EE17.10.2018
ES17.10.2018
FI17.10.2018
HR17.10.2018
IT17.10.2018
LT17.10.2018
LV17.10.2018
PL17.10.2018
RO17.10.2018
RS17.10.2018
SE17.10.2018
SM17.10.2018
BG17.01.2019
NO17.01.2019
GR18.01.2019
IS17.02.2019
PT17.02.2019
Former [2019/35]AL17.10.2018
AT17.10.2018
CZ17.10.2018
DK17.10.2018
ES17.10.2018
FI17.10.2018
HR17.10.2018
IT17.10.2018
LT17.10.2018
LV17.10.2018
PL17.10.2018
RS17.10.2018
SE17.10.2018
BG17.01.2019
NO17.01.2019
GR18.01.2019
IS17.02.2019
PT17.02.2019
Former [2019/34]AL17.10.2018
AT17.10.2018
DK17.10.2018
ES17.10.2018
FI17.10.2018
HR17.10.2018
IT17.10.2018
LT17.10.2018
LV17.10.2018
PL17.10.2018
RS17.10.2018
SE17.10.2018
BG17.01.2019
NO17.01.2019
GR18.01.2019
IS17.02.2019
PT17.02.2019
Former [2019/26]AL17.10.2018
AT17.10.2018
ES17.10.2018
FI17.10.2018
HR17.10.2018
LT17.10.2018
LV17.10.2018
PL17.10.2018
RS17.10.2018
SE17.10.2018
BG17.01.2019
NO17.01.2019
GR18.01.2019
IS17.02.2019
PT17.02.2019
Former [2019/25]AT17.10.2018
ES17.10.2018
FI17.10.2018
HR17.10.2018
LT17.10.2018
LV17.10.2018
PL17.10.2018
RS17.10.2018
SE17.10.2018
BG17.01.2019
NO17.01.2019
GR18.01.2019
IS17.02.2019
Former [2019/24]AT17.10.2018
ES17.10.2018
FI17.10.2018
HR17.10.2018
LT17.10.2018
LV17.10.2018
PL17.10.2018
SE17.10.2018
BG17.01.2019
NO17.01.2019
GR18.01.2019
IS17.02.2019
Former [2019/23]AT17.10.2018
ES17.10.2018
FI17.10.2018
HR17.10.2018
LT17.10.2018
LV17.10.2018
PL17.10.2018
BG17.01.2019
NO17.01.2019
IS17.02.2019
Former [2019/22]FI17.10.2018
LT17.10.2018
PL17.10.2018
BG17.01.2019
NO17.01.2019
IS17.02.2019
Former [2019/21]FI17.10.2018
LT17.10.2018
NO17.01.2019
IS17.02.2019
Former [2019/20]LT17.10.2018
NO17.01.2019
Cited inInternational search[A]US2011076421  (LEE SANG IN [US]) [A] 1-13 * page 8, paragraph 108 - paragraph 109; figures 6, 4, 2a, 24a, 24b,25,26 * * page 9, paragraph 118 - page 10, paragraph 124 * * the whole document * * page 2, paragraph 39 - paragraph 40 * * page 4, paragraph 54 *;
 [AP]EP2360293  (TNO [NL]) [AP] 1,3,5-10,13 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2004067641  (YUDOVSKY JOSEPH [US]) [A] 1-13 * figures 1,2,5 *;
 [A]US2005172897  (JANSEN FRANK [US]) [A] 1-13 * page 2, paragraph 16; figure 1 *;
 [A]  - P.S. MAYDANNIK ET AL, "An atomic layer deposition process for moving flexible substrates", CHEMICAL ENGINEERING JOURNAL, (20110601), vol. 171, no. 1, doi:10.1016/j.cej.2011.03.097, ISSN 1385-8947, pages 345 - 349, XP055016206 [A] 1-13 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cej.2011.03.097
 [T]  - PAUL POODT, "Review Article:Spatial atomic layer deposition: A route towards further industrialization of atomic layer deposition", J. VAC. SCI. TECHNOL., (20111214), vol. 30, no. 1, page 010802-1, XP002666916 [T] 1-13 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1116/1.3670745
by applicantWO2007106076
 US2011076421
 EP2360293
 US2009081885
 US2007281089