Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2742167 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2742167



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 628
21.08.2019 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
29.10.2018 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
20.09.2018 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
21.08.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
21.08.2018 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 2
21.08.2018 French translation of claims Search / examination 5
21.08.2018 German translation of the claims Search / examination 6
25.04.2018 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
25.04.2018 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
25.04.2018 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
25.04.2018 Text intended for grant Search / examination 94
25.04.2018 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 94
09.11.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
09.11.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
09.11.2016 Claims Search / examination 5
09.11.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
09.11.2016 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
21.09.2016 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 2
14.09.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
14.09.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
14.09.2016 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
17.05.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
17.05.2016 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
09.05.2016 Examination started Search / examination 1
08.10.2015 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
29.09.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
18.03.2015 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
12.03.2015 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
09.03.2015 Request for change of address - applicant Search / examination 10
16.09.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
16.09.2014 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 5
16.09.2014 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
16.09.2014 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 5
16.09.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
21.05.2014 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
19.03.2014 Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
17.03.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
17.03.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
17.03.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
17.03.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
17.03.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
17.03.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
17.03.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
12.03.2014 Priority search results copy provided by EPO Search / examination 7
03.03.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
03.03.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
25.02.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 8
18.12.2013 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
14.06.2013 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
06.03.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 107
14.02.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
14.02.2013 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 96
22.01.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
22.01.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
22.01.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 4
05.12.2012 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 3
05.12.2012 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
05.12.2012 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 3
30.07.2012 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
30.07.2012 Annex International Searching Authority 1
30.07.2012 Claims International Searching Authority 5
30.07.2012 Description International Searching Authority 64
30.07.2012 Drawings International Searching Authority 30