Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2742167


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
08.11.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.12.2019 [2019/50]
30.08.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  02.10.2019  [2019/40]
23.08.2019 No opposition filed within time limit published on  25.09.2019  [2019/39]
09.08.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.09.2019  [2019/37]
26.07.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.08.2019  [2019/35]
19.07.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.08.2019  [2019/34]
24.05.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.06.2019  [2019/26]
17.05.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.06.2019  [2019/25]
10.05.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.06.2019  [2019/24]
03.05.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.06.2019  [2019/23]
26.04.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.05.2019  [2019/22]
19.04.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.05.2019  [2019/21]
12.04.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.05.2019  [2019/20]
14.09.2018 (Expected) grant published on  17.10.2018  [2018/42]
07.09.2018 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
24.08.2018 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
24.08.2018 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
31.07.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
24.04.2018 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
27.07.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
14.11.2016 New entry: Reply to examination report
16.09.2016 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
26.07.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
26.05.2016 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
13.05.2016 First examination report
06.10.2015 Change - representative
27.07.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
20.03.2015 Change - applicant published on  22.04.2015  [2015/17]
17.10.2014 Change - extension states published on  19.11.2014  [2014/47]
19.09.2014 Amendment by applicant
26.07.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
16.05.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  18.06.2014  [2014/25]
16.05.2014 Request for examination filed published on  18.06.2014  [2014/25]
03.04.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
11.03.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
04.03.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
26.02.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
15.02.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
30.11.2012 PCT data prior to European publication
30.08.2012 PCT data prior to European publication