Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2741984

EP2741984 - MONITORING SYSTEM FOR TRANSPORT CHAINS FOR CONVEYORS OF ARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.04.2016
Database last updated on 22.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 21.11.2018  [2018/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Rexnord Flattop Europe S.r.l.
Via Dell'Industria 4
42015 Correggio (RE) / IT
[2014/25]
Inventor(s)01 / SALICE, Fabio
Via San Vincenzo 22
I-22063 Cantu' (CO) / IT
02 / MORONI, Carlo
Via Carlo Borromeo 8
I-20871 Vimercate (MB) / IT
03 / MARIANI, Roberto
Via Ada Negri 3
I-20064 Gorgonzola (MI) / IT
04 / GALLI, Roberto
Via Luraschi 16
I-22077 Olgiate Comasco (CO) / IT
 [2015/04]
Former [2014/25]01 / SALICE, Fabio
Via San Vincenzo 22
I-22063 Cantu' (CO) / IT
02 / MORONI, Carlo
Via Carlo Borromeo 8
I-20871 Vimercate (MB) / IT
03 / MARIANI, Roberto
Via Ada Negri 3
I-20064 Gorgonzola (MI) / IT
04 / GALLI, Roberto
Via Luraschi 16
I-22077 Olhiate Comasco (CO) / IT
Representative(s)V.O.
P.O. Box 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
[N/P]
Former [2014/25]Jansen, Cornelis Marinus , et al
V.O.
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date12748674.410.08.2012
WO2012EP65761
Priority number, dateIT2011MI0153712.08.2011         Original published format: IT MI20111537
[2014/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013024057
Date:21.02.2013
Language:EN
[2013/08]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2741984
Date:18.06.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.02.2013
[2014/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2741984
Date:17.06.2015
Language:EN
[2015/25]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.02.2013
ClassificationInternational:B65G43/02
[2014/25]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/25]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:ÜBERWACHUNGSSYSTEM FÜR TRANSPORTKETTEN FÜR ARTIKELFÖRDERER[2014/25]
English:MONITORING SYSTEM FOR TRANSPORT CHAINS FOR CONVEYORS OF ARTICLES[2014/25]
French:SYSTÈME DE SURVEILLANCE POUR CHAÎNES DE TRANSPORT POUR CONVOYEUR D'ARTICLES[2014/25]
Entry into regional phase04.03.2014National basic fee paid 
04.03.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
04.03.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.03.2014Examination requested  [2014/25]
05.08.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.01.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.05.2015Fee for grant paid
08.05.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
08.05.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  07.01.2015
Opposition(s)18.03.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU10.08.2012
AL17.06.2015
AT17.06.2015
BE17.06.2015
CY17.06.2015
CZ17.06.2015
EE17.06.2015
FI17.06.2015
HR17.06.2015
LT17.06.2015
LV17.06.2015
MC17.06.2015
MK17.06.2015
MT17.06.2015
PL17.06.2015
RO17.06.2015
RS17.06.2015
SI17.06.2015
SK17.06.2015
SM17.06.2015
TR17.06.2015
IE10.08.2015
LU10.08.2015
BG17.09.2015
NO17.09.2015
GR18.09.2015
IS17.10.2015
PT19.10.2015
[2018/47]
Former [2018/31]HU10.08.2012
AT17.06.2015
BE17.06.2015
CY17.06.2015
CZ17.06.2015
EE17.06.2015
FI17.06.2015
HR17.06.2015
LT17.06.2015
LV17.06.2015
MC17.06.2015
MK17.06.2015
MT17.06.2015
PL17.06.2015
RO17.06.2015
RS17.06.2015
SI17.06.2015
SK17.06.2015
SM17.06.2015
TR17.06.2015
IE10.08.2015
LU10.08.2015
BG17.09.2015
NO17.09.2015
GR18.09.2015
IS17.10.2015
PT19.10.2015
Former [2017/39]HU10.08.2012
AT17.06.2015
BE17.06.2015
CY17.06.2015
CZ17.06.2015
EE17.06.2015
FI17.06.2015
HR17.06.2015
LT17.06.2015
LV17.06.2015
MC17.06.2015
MT17.06.2015
PL17.06.2015
RO17.06.2015
RS17.06.2015
SI17.06.2015
SK17.06.2015
SM17.06.2015
IE10.08.2015
LU10.08.2015
BG17.09.2015
NO17.09.2015
GR18.09.2015
IS17.10.2015
PT19.10.2015
Former [2017/22]AT17.06.2015
BE17.06.2015
CZ17.06.2015
EE17.06.2015
FI17.06.2015
HR17.06.2015
LT17.06.2015
LV17.06.2015
MC17.06.2015
MT17.06.2015
PL17.06.2015
RO17.06.2015
RS17.06.2015
SI17.06.2015
SK17.06.2015
IE10.08.2015
LU10.08.2015
BG17.09.2015
NO17.09.2015
GR18.09.2015
IS17.10.2015
PT19.10.2015
Former [2017/03]AT17.06.2015
BE17.06.2015
CZ17.06.2015
EE17.06.2015
FI17.06.2015
HR17.06.2015
LT17.06.2015
LV17.06.2015
MC17.06.2015
PL17.06.2015
RO17.06.2015
RS17.06.2015
SI17.06.2015
SK17.06.2015
IE10.08.2015
LU10.08.2015
BG17.09.2015
NO17.09.2015
GR18.09.2015
IS17.10.2015
PT19.10.2015
Former [2016/36]AT17.06.2015
CZ17.06.2015
EE17.06.2015
FI17.06.2015
HR17.06.2015
LT17.06.2015
LV17.06.2015
MC17.06.2015
PL17.06.2015
RO17.06.2015
RS17.06.2015
SI17.06.2015
SK17.06.2015
IE10.08.2015
LU10.08.2015
BG17.09.2015
NO17.09.2015
GR18.09.2015
IS17.10.2015
PT19.10.2015
Former [2016/33]AT17.06.2015
CZ17.06.2015
EE17.06.2015
FI17.06.2015
HR17.06.2015
LT17.06.2015
LV17.06.2015
MC17.06.2015
PL17.06.2015
RO17.06.2015
RS17.06.2015
SK17.06.2015
IE10.08.2015
LU10.08.2015
BG17.09.2015
NO17.09.2015
GR18.09.2015
IS17.10.2015
PT19.10.2015
Former [2016/18]AT17.06.2015
CZ17.06.2015
EE17.06.2015
FI17.06.2015
HR17.06.2015
LT17.06.2015
LV17.06.2015
MC17.06.2015
PL17.06.2015
RO17.06.2015
RS17.06.2015
SK17.06.2015
LU10.08.2015
BG17.09.2015
NO17.09.2015
GR18.09.2015
IS17.10.2015
PT19.10.2015
Former [2016/17]AT17.06.2015
CZ17.06.2015
EE17.06.2015
FI17.06.2015
HR17.06.2015
LT17.06.2015
LV17.06.2015
PL17.06.2015
RO17.06.2015
RS17.06.2015
SK17.06.2015
LU10.08.2015
BG17.09.2015
NO17.09.2015
GR18.09.2015
IS17.10.2015
PT19.10.2015
Former [2016/11]AT17.06.2015
CZ17.06.2015
EE17.06.2015
FI17.06.2015
HR17.06.2015
LT17.06.2015
LV17.06.2015
PL17.06.2015
RO17.06.2015
RS17.06.2015
SK17.06.2015
BG17.09.2015
NO17.09.2015
GR18.09.2015
IS17.10.2015
PT19.10.2015
Former [2016/10]CZ17.06.2015
EE17.06.2015
FI17.06.2015
HR17.06.2015
LT17.06.2015
LV17.06.2015
PL17.06.2015
RO17.06.2015
RS17.06.2015
SK17.06.2015
BG17.09.2015
NO17.09.2015
GR18.09.2015
IS17.10.2015
PT19.10.2015
Former [2016/09]EE17.06.2015
FI17.06.2015
HR17.06.2015
LT17.06.2015
LV17.06.2015
RS17.06.2015
BG17.09.2015
NO17.09.2015
GR18.09.2015
Former [2015/50]FI17.06.2015
HR17.06.2015
LT17.06.2015
LV17.06.2015
RS17.06.2015
BG17.09.2015
NO17.09.2015
GR18.09.2015
Former [2015/49]FI17.06.2015
HR17.06.2015
LT17.06.2015
LV17.06.2015
RS17.06.2015
NO17.09.2015
GR18.09.2015
Cited inInternational search[A]EP1873088  (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [A] 1,9,11 * the whole document *