Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2678027

EP2678027 - METHODS OF IDENTIFYING A PATIENT POPULATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  05.08.2016
Database last updated on 17.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.08.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 07.09.2016  [2016/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Glaxo Group Limited
Glaxo Wellcome House Berkeley Avenue Greenford
Middlesex UB6 0NN / GB
[2014/01]
Inventor(s)01 / GERMASCHEWSKI, Fiona
Gunnels Wood Road
Stevenage Hertfordshire SG1 2NY / GB
02 / LARKIN, Jonathan, David
709 Swedeland Road
King of Prussia PA 19406 / US
03 / LIU, Feng
709 Swedeland Road
King of Prussia PA 19406 / US
04 / LOHR, Thomas
709 Swedeland Road
King of Prussia PA 19406 / US
 [2014/01]
Representative(s)Chiappinelli, Susan Ann , et al
GlaxoSmithKline
Global Patents (CN925.1)
980 Great West Road
Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/01]Le Mière, Jennifer Louise
GlaxoSmithKline Global Patents (CN925.1)
980 Great West Road
Brentford Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB
Application number, filing date12749198.324.02.2012
WO2012US26460
Priority number, dateUS201161446259P24.02.2011         Original published format: US 201161446259 P
[2014/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2012116260
Date:30.08.2012
Language:EN
[2012/35]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2678027
Date:01.01.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.08.2012
[2014/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US30.08.2012
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.07.2015
ClassificationInternational:A61K38/17, G01N33/573
[2015/36]
Former International [2014/01]A61K38/17
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/01]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR IDENTIFIKATION EINER PATIENTENGRUPPE[2014/01]
English:METHODS OF IDENTIFYING A PATIENT POPULATION[2014/01]
French:PROCÉDÉS D'IDENTIFICATION D'UNE POPULATION DE PATIENTS[2014/01]
Entry into regional phase11.09.2013National basic fee paid 
11.09.2013Search fee paid 
11.09.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
11.09.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedCommunication of intention to grant the patent
11.09.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.09.2013Examination requested  [2014/01]
01.03.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/36]
20.04.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2016/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
13.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
08.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XY]WO2011002968  (GLAXO GROUP LTD [US], et al) [X] 6,8-11 * examples 4,15; claim 7 * [Y] 9;
 [E]WO2013109829  (GLAXOSMITHKLINE IP DEV LTD [GB], et al) [E] 1-11 * figure 1 *
 [XY]  MALFAIT A-M ET AL, "Inhibition of ADAM-TS4 and ADAM-TS5 prevents aggrecan degradation in osteoarthritic cartilage", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR BIOCHEMISTRY AND MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, US, (20020621), vol. 277, no. 25, doi:10.1074/JBC.M200431200, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 22201 - 22208, XP002318178 [X] 1 * abstract * [Y] 2-5

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M200431200
 [XY]  CHOCKALINGAM P S ET AL, "Elevated aggrecanase activity in a rat model of joint injury is attenuated by an aggrecanase specific inhibitor", OSTEOARTHRITIS AND CARTILAGE, BAILLIERE TINDALL, LONDON, GB, vol. 19, no. 3, doi:10.1016/J.JOCA.2010.12.004, ISSN 1063-4584, (20101206), pages 315 - 323, (20101214), XP028152877 [X] 1 * tables 2,3 * [Y] 2-5

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.joca.2010.12.004
 [Y]  SWEARINGEN C A ET AL, "Development of a novel clinical biomarker assay to detect and quantify aggrecanase-generated aggrecan fragments in human synovial fluid, serum and urine", OSTEOARTHRITIS AND CARTILAGE, BAILLIERE TINDALL, LONDON, GB, vol. 18, no. 9, ISSN 1063-4584, (20100901), pages 1150 - 1158, (20100713), XP027255880 [Y] 2-5 * abstract *
 [Y]  LARSSON S ET AL, "A37 AGGRECANASE CLEAVAGE IN THE INTERGLOBULAR DOMAIN OF AGGRECAN IS MARKEDLY ELEVATED IN ACUTE ARTHRITIS, OSTEOARTHRITIS AND AFTER KNEE INJURY", OSTEOARTHRITIS AND CARTILAGE, BAILLIERE TINDALL, LONDON, GB, vol. 16, doi:10.1016/S1063-4584(08)60083-7, ISSN 1063-4584, (20080901), page S29, (20080901), XP025689750 [Y] 5,9 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1063-4584(08)60083-7
 [Y]  DUFIELD D R ET AL, "An immunoaffinity liquid chromatography-tandem mass spectrometry assay for detection of endogenous aggrecan fragments in biological fluids: Use as a biomarker for aggrecanase activity and cartilage degradation", ANALYTICAL BIOCHEMISTRY, ACADEMIC PRESS INC, NEW YORK, vol. 406, no. 2, ISSN 0003-2697, (20101115), pages 113 - 123, (20100723), XP027259634 [Y] 4 * abstract *
International search[X]US2008311113  (MORRIS ELISABETH A [US], et al);
 [Y]US7030242  (NOE MARK C [US], et al);
 [Y]US5935796  (FOSANG AMANDA JANE [AU]);
 [Y]US2009202474  (CHOCKALINGAM PRIYA [US], et al);
 [Y]US2009318342  (NAGASE HIDEAKI [GB], et al)
    [] - KEVORKIAN, L. ET AL., "Expression Profiling of Metalloproteinases and Their Inhibitors in Cartilage.", ARTHRITIS & RHEUMATISM, (200401), vol. 50, pages 131 - 141,
    [] - PORTER, S. ET AL., "The ADAMTS metalloproteinases.", BIOCHEM. J., (2005), vol. 386, pages 15 - 27,
    [] - HUGHES, C. ET AL., "Monoclonal antibodies that specifically recognize neoepitope sequences generated by 'aggrecanase' and matrix metalloproteinase cleavage of aggrecan: application to catabolism in situ and in vivo.", BIOCHEM. J., (1995), vol. 305, pages 799 - 804,