blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2678027 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2678027



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 483
10.08.2016 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
02.08.2016 Final instructions (application deemed to be withdrawn/application refused) Search / examination 1
17.05.2016 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
26.04.2016 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 12
20.04.2016 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no declaration of maintenance of the application/non-reply to the Written Opinion) Search / examination 2
18.08.2015 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
31.07.2015 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
31.07.2015 European search opinion Search / examination 4
31.07.2015 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 4
20.07.2015 Search started Search / examination 1
10.04.2014 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
04.12.2013 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
10.10.2013 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
27.09.2013 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
27.09.2013 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
27.09.2013 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
27.09.2013 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
11.09.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
11.09.2013 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
11.09.2013 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
11.09.2013 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
11.09.2013 Converted Sequence Listing Search / examination 68
11.09.2013 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
11.09.2013 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
05.07.2013 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
19.09.2012 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 174
30.08.2012 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
30.08.2012 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 70
30.08.2012 Sequence listing Search / examination 109