blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2678027


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
05.08.2016 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  07.09.2016  [2016/36]
12.05.2016 Change - representative
19.04.2016 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
10.02.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
31.07.2015 Change - classification published on  02.09.2015  [2015/36]
31.07.2015 Change - classification published on  02.09.2015  [2015/36]
31.07.2015 Change - date of supplementary search report published on  02.09.2015  [2015/36]
18.02.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
25.04.2014 Change - extension states published on  28.05.2014  [2014/22]
12.02.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
29.11.2013 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  01.01.2014  [2014/01]
29.11.2013 Request for examination filed published on  01.01.2014  [2014/01]
08.10.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
16.09.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
16.09.2013 Amendment by applicant
14.09.2012 PCT data prior to European publication
31.08.2012 PCT data prior to European publication