blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2678027
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2013336989Global Dossier 19.12.2013A1
Priority number Date
WO2012US26460 24.02.2012
US201161446259 24.02.2011
US201214001202 24.02.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2678027Global Dossier 02.09.2015A4
EP2678027 01.01.2014A1
Priority number Date
WO2012US26460 24.02.2012
US201161446259 24.02.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2012116260Global Dossier 30.08.2012A1
Priority number Date
US201161446259 24.02.2011