Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2679649

EP2679649 - ADDITIVE FOR INCREASING TOUGHNESS OF MARBLE GLUE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  14.12.2018
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  26.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip14.12.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 16.01.2019  [2019/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Wuhan Keda Marble Protective Materials CO., LTD.
No. 2, Zhangbai Road Dongxihu District Wuhan
Hubei 430040 / CN
[2014/01]
Inventor(s)01 / DU, Kunwen
No.2 Zhangbai Road
Dongxihu District
Wuhan
Hubei 430040 / CN
02 / DU, Kunwu
No.2 Zhangbai Road
Dongxihu District
Wuhan
Hubei 430040 / CN
 [2014/01]
Representative(s)Hryszkiewicz, Danuta , et al
Matthias Scholl, Inc.
Friedrichstrasse 123
10117 Berlin / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/01]Zeuner Summerer Stütz
Nußbaumstrasse 8
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date12749505.913.02.2012
WO2012CN71045
Priority number, dateCN2011104387324.02.2011         Original published format: CN201110043873
[2014/01]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2012113291
Date:30.08.2012
Language:ZH
[2012/35]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2679649
Date:01.01.2014
Language:EN
[2014/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN30.08.2012
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:C09J167/06, C09J11/06, C08K5/05, C08K5/06
[2018/03]
Former International [2014/01]C09J167/06, C09J11/06
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/01]
TitleGerman:ZUSATZ ZUR ERHÖHUNG DER ZÄHIGKEIT VON MARMORKLEBSTOFF[2014/01]
English:ADDITIVE FOR INCREASING TOUGHNESS OF MARBLE GLUE[2014/01]
French:ADDITIF POUR AUGMENTER LA RÉSISTANCE DE COLLE À MARBRE[2014/01]
Entry into regional phase11.09.2013Translation filed 
24.09.2013National basic fee paid 
24.09.2013Search fee paid 
24.09.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
24.09.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.09.2013Examination requested  [2014/01]
19.07.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2019/03]
27.08.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2019/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
02.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
26.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
23.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.201807   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]CN101857790  (WUHAN KEDA MARBLE PROTECTIVE MATERIALS CO LTD) [A] 1-5 * Claims * * Examples *;
 [X]EP0953418  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-5 * Claims *
International search[XP]CN102181254  (WUHAN CITY KEDA MARBLE PROT MATERIALS CO LTD);
 [X]EP1225172  (KANSAI PAINT CO LTD [JP]);
 [X]EP1832566  (AIDICO ASOCIACION DE IND DE LA [ES], et al);
 [X]US6245822  (TERADA TAKAHIKO [JP], et al)