Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2790739

EP2790739 - NANOPARTICLES AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  24.08.2018
Database last updated on 14.07.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  22.03.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  07.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip31.05.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): SM
published on 03.07.2019  [2019/27]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Biocant - Associação De Transferência De Tecnologia
Centro de Inovacao em Biotecnologia Biocant Park Parque Tecnologia de Cantanhede Nucleo 04., Lote 3
Cantanhede 3060-197 / PT
[2018/39]
Former [2014/43]For all designated states
Biocant - Associação De Transferência De Tecnologia
Centro de Inovacao em Biotecnologia Biocant Park Parque Tecnologia de Cantanhede Nucleo 04., Lote 3
Cantanhede 3060-197 / PT
Inventor(s)01 / DA SILVA FERREIRA, Lino
Rua teófilo Braga nº 25 3º Ant Esq
3030-076 Coimbra / PT
02 / NEVES PIRES DAS NEVES, Ricardo
Rua Manuel Mendes 25 1ºD
3810-131 Aveiro / PT
03 / GOMES, Renata, Sofia, Mota
125 Coldharbour Lane
London, SE5 9NU / GB
 [2014/49]
Former [2014/43]01 / DA SILVA FERREIRA, Lino
Rua teófilo Braga nº 25 3º Ant Esq
3030-076 Coimbra / PT
02 / NEVES PIRES DAS NEVES, Ricardo
Rua Manuel Mendes 25 1ºD
3810-131 Aveiro / PT
03 / GOMES, Renata, Sofia, Mota
21 Bridge Road
Neasden London NW10 9DG / GB
Representative(s)McNamara, Kathryn
Venner Shipley LLP Byron House Cambridge Business Park Cowley Road
Cambridge CB4 0WZ / GB
[2018/39]
Former [2014/43]Heare, Tanya , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London EC1A 4HD / GB
Application number, filing date12750728.308.08.2012
[2018/39]
WO2012EP65550
Priority number, dateEP2011039800816.12.2011         Original published format: EP 11398008
[2014/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013087234
Date:20.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2790739
Date:22.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.06.2013
[2014/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2790739
Date:26.09.2018
Language:EN
[2018/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP20.06.2013
ClassificationInternational:A61K49/00, A61K47/69, A61K49/18, A61P35/00, A61P9/10, A61P9/04
[2018/09]
Former International [2014/43]A61K49/00, A61K49/18, A61K47/48, A61P35/00, A61P9/10, A61P9/04
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/43]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:NANOTEILCHEN UND IHRE ANWENDUNGEN[2018/09]
English:NANOPARTICLES AND USES THEREOF[2014/43]
French:NANOPARTICULES ET LEURS UTILISATIONS[2014/43]
Former [2014/43]NANOTEILCHEN UND IHRE VERWENDUNGEN
Entry into regional phase26.06.2014National basic fee paid 
26.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
26.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.09.2013Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
26.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/43]
07.01.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.08.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.12.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.06.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05)
08.09.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.03.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.08.2018Fee for grant paid
02.08.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
02.08.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.08.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
28.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
31.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
08.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
17.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.201706   M06   Fee paid on   08.09.2017
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL26.09.2018
AT26.09.2018
CZ26.09.2018
EE26.09.2018
ES26.09.2018
FI26.09.2018
HR26.09.2018
LT26.09.2018
LV26.09.2018
NL26.09.2018
PL26.09.2018
RO26.09.2018
RS26.09.2018
SE26.09.2018
SK26.09.2018
SM26.09.2018
BG26.12.2018
NO26.12.2018
GR27.12.2018
IS26.01.2019
[2019/27]
Former [2019/23]AL26.09.2018
AT26.09.2018
CZ26.09.2018
EE26.09.2018
ES26.09.2018
FI26.09.2018
HR26.09.2018
LT26.09.2018
LV26.09.2018
NL26.09.2018
PL26.09.2018
RO26.09.2018
RS26.09.2018
SE26.09.2018
SK26.09.2018
BG26.12.2018
NO26.12.2018
GR27.12.2018
IS26.01.2019
Former [2019/22]AL26.09.2018
CZ26.09.2018
FI26.09.2018
HR26.09.2018
LT26.09.2018
LV26.09.2018
NL26.09.2018
PL26.09.2018
RO26.09.2018
RS26.09.2018
SE26.09.2018
BG26.12.2018
NO26.12.2018
GR27.12.2018
IS26.01.2019
Former [2019/21]AL26.09.2018
FI26.09.2018
HR26.09.2018
LT26.09.2018
LV26.09.2018
NL26.09.2018
RS26.09.2018
SE26.09.2018
BG26.12.2018
NO26.12.2018
GR27.12.2018
IS26.01.2019
Former [2019/20]AL26.09.2018
FI26.09.2018
HR26.09.2018
LT26.09.2018
LV26.09.2018
NL26.09.2018
RS26.09.2018
SE26.09.2018
BG26.12.2018
NO26.12.2018
GR27.12.2018
Former [2019/12]AL26.09.2018
FI26.09.2018
HR26.09.2018
LT26.09.2018
LV26.09.2018
RS26.09.2018
SE26.09.2018
BG26.12.2018
NO26.12.2018
GR27.12.2018
Former [2019/11]FI26.09.2018
HR26.09.2018
LT26.09.2018
RS26.09.2018
SE26.09.2018
BG26.12.2018
NO26.12.2018
GR27.12.2018
Former [2019/10]FI26.09.2018
LT26.09.2018
RS26.09.2018
SE26.09.2018
BG26.12.2018
NO26.12.2018
GR27.12.2018
Former [2019/08]FI26.09.2018
LT26.09.2018
NO26.12.2018
Former [2019/07]LT26.09.2018
Cited inInternational search[X]WO0050050  (ISIS PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-7,12 * Example 1 page 17-19; example 4 page 23. *;
 [X]WO2008107729  (SZEGEDI TUDOMANYEGYETEM [HU], et al) [X] 1-3,5-7,12 * Example 2 page 12; example 13 page 14, 15 *;
 [XY]WO2009010071  (UNIV AARHUS [DK], et al) [X] 1-3,5-7,12,15-18,20,21,24 * Example 2 pages 9, 10 * [Y] 19;
 [Y]WO2011053803  (UNIV OHIO STATE [US], et al) [Y] 10 * Figure 4, Example 1 page 25 *;
 [XY]  - HAN R. ET AL., "Surface modification of poly(d,L-lactic-co-glycolic acid) nanoparticles with protamine anhanced cross-presentation of encapsulated ovalbumin by bone marrow-derived dendritic cells", JOURNAL OF BIOMEDICAL MATERIAL RESEARCH A, (20101105), vol. 96, no. 1, pages 142 - 148, XP002678573 [X] 1-10,12,15-18,20,21,24 * Abstract; page 143 first column; second column, 3rd paragraph * [Y] 10,11,13,19

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/JBM.A.32860
 [XY]  - VOGEL V. ET AL., "Oligonucleotide-protamine-albumin nanoparticles: preparation, physical properties, and intracellular distribution.", JOURNAL OF CONTROLLED RELEASE, (20050108), vol. 103, pages 99 - 111, XP027664438 [X] 1-3,5-7,9,10,15-18,20,21,24 * Abstract, page 101 first column; page 102, second paragraph. * [Y] 19
 [Y]  - MAN LUNG YEUNG, "siRNA, miRNA and HIV: promises and challenges", CELL RESEARCH, (20050101), vol. 15, doi:10.1038/sj.cr.7290371, pages 935 - 946, XP055011287 [Y] 13 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.cr.7290371
 [Y]  - HORISAWA E. ET AL., "Size-Dependency of DL-Lactide/glycolide Copolymer Particulates for Intra-Articular Delivery System on Phagocytosis in Rat Synovium", PHARMACEUTICAL RESEARCH, (20020201), vol. 19, no. 2, pages 132 - 139, XP002678575 [Y] 10,11 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1014260513728
 [A]  - RUIZ-CABELLO J. ET AL., "In Vivo "Hot Spot" MR Imaging of Neural Stem Cells Using Fluorinated Nanoparticles", MAGNETIC RESONANCE IN MEDICINE, (20080901), vol. 60, no. 6, pages 1506 - 1511, XP002678576 [A] 11 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/MRM.21783
by applicant   - FERREIRA L ET AL., CELL STEM CELL, (2008), vol. 3, pages 136 - 146
    - AHRENS ET AL., NAT BIOTECHNOL, (2005), vol. 23, pages 983 - 987
    - PARTLOW ET AL., FASEB J, (2007), vol. 21, pages 1647 - 1654
    - FERREIRA L, J CELL BIOCHEM, (2009), vol. 108, pages 746 - 752
    - SAHAY G ET AL., J CONTROL RELEASE, (2010), vol. 145, pages 182 - 195
    - DUNCAN, CURR OPIN BIOTECHNOL, (2011), vol. 22, no. 4, pages 492 - 501
    - SUMMERS HD ET AL., NAT NANOTECHNOL, (2011), vol. 6, pages 170 - 174
    - TABATA ET AL., PHARM RES, (1993), vol. 10, pages 487 - 496
    - VAN DE WEERT ET AL., PHARM RES, (2000), vol. 17, pages 1159 - 1167
    - SONG ET AL., EUR J PHARM BIOPHARM, (2008), vol. 69, pages 445 - 453
    - FECZK6 ET AL., CHEM ENG PROCESS, (2011), vol. 50, pages 846 - 853
    - MUNDARGI ET AL., J CONTROL RELEASE, (2008), vol. 125, pages 193 - 209
    - MAIA ET AL., ACS NANO, (2011), vol. 5, no. 1, pages 97 - 106
    - JEONG ET AL., BIOMATERIALS, (2007), vol. 28, pages 1912 - 1917
    - LIN ET AL., BIOCONJUGATE CHEM, (2007), vol. 18, pages 138 - 145
    - OU ET AL., BIOMATERIALS, (2009), vol. 30, pages 5804 - 5814
    - REVERCHON E., J SUPERCRIT FLUID, (1999), vol. 15, pages 1 - 21
    - DU ET AL., BIOMACROMOLECULES, (2008), vol. 9, no. 10, pages 2826 - 33
    - FERREIRA ET AL., BIOMATERIALS, (2007), vol. 28, pages 2706 - 2717
    - NKANSAH ET AL., BIOTECHNOL BIOENG, (2008), vol. 100, no. 5, pages 1010 - 1019
    - LABOUTA ET AL., INT J PHARM, (2010), vol. 395, pages 236 - 242
    - AGARWAL ET AL., J CONTROL RELEASE, (2008), vol. 128, pages 255 - 260
    - ELBAKRY ET AL., NANOLETTERS, (2009), vol. 9, no. 5, pages 2059 - 2064
    - POON ET AL., ACS NANO, (2011), vol. 5, no. 6, pages 4284 - 4292
    - SALAKLANG J ET AL., ANGEW CHEM INT ED ENGL, (2008), vol. 47, pages 7857 - 7860
    - BARTEL DP, CELL, (2004), vol. 116, pages 281 - 297
    - BARTEL DP, CELL, (2009), vol. 136, no. 2, pages 215 - 233
    - WAHID F ET AL., BIOCHIM BIOPHYS ACTA, (2010), vol. 1803, pages 1231 - 1243
    - BENTWICH I ET AL., NAT. GENET., (2005), vol. 37, no. 7, pages 766 - 70
    - LEWIS BP ET AL., CELL, (2005), vol. 120, no. 1, pages 15 - 20
    - FRIEDMAN RC ET AL., GENOME RES., (2009), vol. 19, no. 1, pages 92 - 105
    - LIM LP ET AL., GENES DEV., (2003), vol. 17, no. 8, pages 991 - 1008
    - TRANG P ET AL., ONCOGENE, (2008), vol. 27, no. 2, pages S52 - S57
    - LI C ET AL., AAPS J, (2009), vol. 11, no. 4, pages 747 - 757
    - FASANARO P ET AL., PHARMACOL THERAPEUT, (2010), vol. 125, no. 1, pages 92 - 104
    - FASANARO P ET AL., JBIOL CHEM, (2008), vol. 283, pages 15878 - 15883
    - FAVARO E ET AL., PLOS ONE, (2010), vol. 5, page EIO345
    - HU S ET AL., CIRCULATION, (2010), vol. 122, pages 124 - 131
    - ANAND A. ET AL., NAT MED, (2010), vol. 16, no. 8, pages 909 - 914
    - GHOSH G ET AL., J CLIN INVEST, (2010), vol. 120, pages 4141 - 4154
    - BONAUER A ET AL., SCIENCE, (2009), vol. 324, pages 1710 - 1713
    - SHI MA ET AL., SCI SIGNAL, (2010), vol. 3, page PE40
    - KOTA J ET AL., CELL, (2009), vol. 137, pages 1005 - 1017
    - HU S ET AL., CIRCULATION, (2011), vol. 124, pages 27 - 34
    - OOI A. ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (2010), vol. 107, pages 21505 - 21510
    - NATURE, (2010), vol. 467, page 356
    - SHI S ET AL., PHARM RES, (2012), vol. 29, pages 97 - 109
    - CHENG C ET AL., MOL PHARM, (2012), vol. 9, pages 1481 - 1488
    - GIBBINGS ET AL., TRENDS CELL BIOL, (2010), vol. 20, pages 491 - 501
    - GIBBINGS ET AL., NAT CELL BIOL, (2009), vol. 11, pages 1143 - 1149
    - DE LA FUENTE JM, BIOCONJUG CHEM, (2005), vol. 16, pages 1176 - 1180
    - HOSHINO A ET AL., MICROBIOL IMMUNOL, (2004), vol. 48, pages 985 - 994
    - MATSUO K ET AL., BIOCHEM BIOPHYS RES COMMUN, (2007), vol. 362, pages 1069 - 1072
    - VALADI ET AL., NAT CELL BIOL, (2007), vol. 9, no. 6, pages 654 - 659
    - GIBBINGS ET AL., NAT CELL BIOL, (2009), vol. 11, no. 9, pages 1143 - 1149
    - VERMA ET AL., NATMATER, (2008), vol. 7, pages 588 - 595
    - FERREIRA ET AL., CELL STEM CELL, (2008), vol. 3, pages 136 - 146
    - CONNER ET AL., NATURE, (2003), vol. 422, pages 37 - 44
    - LU ET AL., NANO LETTERS, (2007), vol. 7, pages 149 - 154
    - KOSTARELOS ET AL., NATNANOTECHNOL, (2007), vol. 2, pages 108 - 113
    - DE VRIES ET AL., NAT BIOTECHNOL, (2005), vol. 23, no. 11, pages 1407 - 1413
    - BHARALI ET AL., PNAS, (2005), vol. 102, pages 11539 - 11544
    - FAROKHZAD ET AL., PNAS, (2006), vol. 103, pages 6315 - 6320
    - DVIR ET AL., NANO LETT, (2011), vol. 11, pages 4411 - 4414
    - CARR ET AL., PLOSONE, (2011), page 6
    - MICHAEL ET AL., AM J PHYSIOL, (1995), vol. 269, pages H2147 - 2154
    - PROMPERS ET AL., NMR BIOMED, (2006), vol. 19, pages 927 - 953
    - PHARM RES, (2002), vol. 19, pages 132 - 139
    - CHU W. ET AL., MAGN RESON IMAGING, (1995), vol. 13, pages 661 - 674
    - LEE ET AL., ADV MATER DEERFIELD, (2008), vol. 20, pages 2512 - 2516
    - HORISAWA ET AL., PHARM RES, (2002), vol. 19, pages 132 - 139
    - ANAND ET AL., NAT MED, (2010), vol. 16, pages 909 - 914
    - KATARE ET AL., CIRC RES, (2011), vol. 109, pages 894 - 906
    - KALCHENKO ET AL., J BIOMED OPT, (2006), vol. 11, page 050507