blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2734393 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2734393



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 267
24.07.2019 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
01.10.2018 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
23.08.2018 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
08.05.2018 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
08.05.2018 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
08.05.2018 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
08.05.2018 Text intended for grant Search / examination 22
08.05.2018 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 22
20.04.2018 Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) Search / examination 2
04.04.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
04.04.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
04.04.2018 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 1
04.04.2018 Claims Search / examination 2
04.04.2018 Description Search / examination 1
04.04.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
04.04.2018 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 Search / examination 2
01.12.2017 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
01.12.2017 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
01.12.2017 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
01.12.2017 Text intended for grant Search / examination 22
01.12.2017 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 22
25.10.2017 Examination started Search / examination 1
31.08.2017 Registration under R 23 EPC Search / examination 2
16.08.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
16.08.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
16.08.2017 Letter to the Legal Division Search / examination 1
16.08.2017 Miscellaneous requests concerning client data Search / examination 3
26.06.2017 Notification regarding date of start of examination with possibility to withdraw Search / examination 1
08.10.2015 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
29.09.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
19.09.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
19.09.2014 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
19.09.2014 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
19.09.2014 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
19.09.2014 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 2
19.09.2014 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
19.09.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
30.04.2014 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
13.03.2014 Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
13.03.2014 Registration under R 23 EPC Search / examination 2
11.03.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
11.03.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
11.03.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
06.03.2014 Priority search results copy provided by EPO Search / examination 8
27.02.2014 Annex Search / examination 2
27.02.2014 Letter to the Legal Division Search / examination 1
24.02.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
21.02.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
21.02.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 6
06.02.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
29.11.2013 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
14.06.2013 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
13.02.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 25
24.01.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
24.01.2013 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 22
04.10.2012 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
04.10.2012 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
04.10.2012 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
20.07.2012 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
20.07.2012 Claims International Searching Authority 2
20.07.2012 Description International Searching Authority 14
20.07.2012 Drawings International Searching Authority 6