blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2734393


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
26.07.2019 No opposition filed within time limit published on  28.08.2019 [2019/35]
19.07.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.08.2019 [2019/34]
31.05.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  03.07.2019  [2019/27]
24.05.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.06.2019  [2019/26]
10.05.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.06.2019  [2019/24]
03.05.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.06.2019  [2019/23]
26.04.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.05.2019  [2019/22]
19.04.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.05.2019  [2019/21]
12.04.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.05.2019  [2019/20]
22.02.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.03.2019  [2019/13]
15.02.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.03.2019  [2019/12]
08.02.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.03.2019  [2019/11]
01.02.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.03.2019  [2019/10]
18.01.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.02.2019  [2019/08]
11.01.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.02.2019  [2019/07]
17.08.2018 (Expected) grant published on  19.09.2018  [2018/38]
14.08.2018 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
14.08.2018 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
13.08.2018 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
23.06.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
07.05.2018 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
06.04.2018 Deletion: Communication of intention to grant a patent
30.11.2017 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
01.09.2017 Change - Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution published on  04.10.2017  [2017/40]
05.07.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
05.07.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
06.10.2015 Change - representative
03.07.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
26.09.2014 Change - extension states published on  29.10.2014  [2014/44]
19.09.2014 Amendment by applicant
04.07.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
25.04.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  28.05.2014  [2014/22]
25.04.2014 Request for examination filed published on  28.05.2014  [2014/22]
25.04.2014 Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution published on  28.05.2014  [2014/22]
28.03.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
06.03.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
22.02.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
05.02.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
25.01.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
04.09.2012 PCT data prior to European publication