blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2734393 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201280045907 EP12750852



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9975420Global Dossier 22.05.2018B2
US2014342655 20.11.2014A1
Priority number Date
NL2007162 21.07.2011
WO2012NL50524 20.07.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR20140048965Global Dossier 24.04.2014A
Priority number Date
NL2007162 21.07.2011
WO2012NL50524 20.07.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP6223335BGlobal Dossier 01.11.2017B2
JP2014523833 18.09.2014A
Priority number Date
NL2007162 21.07.2011
WO2012NL50524 20.07.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN103874597BGlobal Dossier 01.12.2017B
CN103874597 18.06.2014A
Priority number Date
NL2007162 21.07.2011
WO2012NL50524 20.07.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2734393Global Dossier 19.09.2018B1
EP2734393 28.05.2014A1
Priority number Date
NL2007162 21.07.2011
WO2012NL50524 20.07.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2013012337Global Dossier 24.01.2013A1
Priority number Date
NL2007162 21.07.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
NL2007162C 22.01.2013C2
Priority number Date
NL2007162 21.07.2011