Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2734393

EP2734393 - ADJUSTMENT DEVICE WITH DRIVE UNIT; AIR INLET WITH SUCH AN ADJUSTMENT DEVICE; MOTOR VEHICLE WITH SUCH AN AIR INLET [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.07.2019
Database last updated on 17.08.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  17.08.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  07.05.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  06.04.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  30.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip26.07.2019No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 28.08.2019 [2019/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MCi (Mirror Controls International) Netherlands B.V.
Pompmolenlaan 29
3447 GK Woerden / NL
[2014/22]
Inventor(s)01 / BOOM, Stephen, Alexander, George, Gustavo
c/o Pompmolenlaan 29
NL-3447 GK Woerden / NL
02 / DE VRIES, Erik, Alfred, Simeon
c/o Pompmolenlaan 29
NL-3447 GK Woerden / NL
03 / BROUWER, Stefan, Frits
c/o Pompmolenlaan 29
NL-3447 GK Woerden / NL
 [2014/22]
Representative(s)V.O.
P.O. Box 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
[2018/38]
Former [2014/22]Jansen, Cornelis Marinus , et al
V.O.
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date12750852.120.07.2012
[2018/38]
WO2012NL50524
Priority number, dateNL2011200716221.07.2011         Original published format: NL 2007162
[2014/22]
Filing languageNL
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013012337
Date:24.01.2013
Language:EN
[2013/04]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2734393
Date:28.05.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.01.2013
[2014/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2734393
Date:19.09.2018
Language:EN
[2018/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP24.01.2013
ClassificationInternational:B60K11/08
[2014/22]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/22]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:EINSTELLUNGSVORRICHTUNG MIT ANTRIEBSEINHEIT; LUFTEINLASS MIT EINER SOLCHEN EINSTELLUNGSVORRICHTUNG; KRAFTFAHRZEUG MIT DERARTIGEM LUFTEINLASS[2014/22]
English:ADJUSTMENT DEVICE WITH DRIVE UNIT; AIR INLET WITH SUCH AN ADJUSTMENT DEVICE; MOTOR VEHICLE WITH SUCH AN AIR INLET[2014/22]
French:DISPOSITIF DE REGLAGE AVEC UNITE D'ENTRAINEMENT ; ENTREE D'AIR MUNIE D'UN TEL DISPOSITIF DE REGLAGE ; VEHICULE A MOTEUR AVEC UNE TELLE ENTREE D'AIR[2014/22]
Entry into regional phase21.02.2014National basic fee paid 
21.02.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
21.02.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.02.2014Examination requested  [2014/22]
19.09.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.12.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.04.2018Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
08.05.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.08.2018Fee for grant paid
10.08.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
10.08.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  01.12.2017
Opposition(s)20.06.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
30.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
30.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
30.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
20.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Executiondeleted
[2017/40]
Former [2014/22]ID:01
For:AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
Date:27.02.2014
[2017/40]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL19.09.2018
AT19.09.2018
CZ19.09.2018
DK19.09.2018
EE19.09.2018
ES19.09.2018
FI19.09.2018
HR19.09.2018
IT19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
LV19.09.2018
NL19.09.2018
PL19.09.2018
RO19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
SK19.09.2018
SM19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
IS19.01.2019
PT19.01.2019
[2019/34]
Former [2019/26]AL19.09.2018
AT19.09.2018
CZ19.09.2018
EE19.09.2018
ES19.09.2018
FI19.09.2018
HR19.09.2018
IT19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
LV19.09.2018
NL19.09.2018
PL19.09.2018
RO19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
SK19.09.2018
SM19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
IS19.01.2019
PT19.01.2019
Former [2019/23]AL19.09.2018
AT19.09.2018
CZ19.09.2018
EE19.09.2018
ES19.09.2018
FI19.09.2018
HR19.09.2018
IT19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
LV19.09.2018
NL19.09.2018
PL19.09.2018
RO19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
SK19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
IS19.01.2019
Former [2019/22]AL19.09.2018
CZ19.09.2018
FI19.09.2018
HR19.09.2018
IT19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
LV19.09.2018
NL19.09.2018
PL19.09.2018
RO19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
IS19.01.2019
Former [2019/21]AL19.09.2018
FI19.09.2018
HR19.09.2018
IT19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
LV19.09.2018
NL19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
IS19.01.2019
Former [2019/20]AL19.09.2018
FI19.09.2018
HR19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
LV19.09.2018
NL19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
Former [2019/12]AL19.09.2018
FI19.09.2018
HR19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
LV19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
Former [2019/11]FI19.09.2018
HR19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
Former [2019/10]FI19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
Former [2019/08]FI19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
NO19.12.2018
Former [2019/07]LT19.09.2018
Cited inInternational search[X]JPS6418744  (NISSAN MOTOR) [X] 1,2,12,14-16 * abstract *;
 [X]WO2007108803  (BOLE MATHEW M [US]) [X] 1,12,14-16 * figure 2b *;
 [X]US5732666  (LEE BYUNG-CHEON [KR]) [X] 1,12,14-16 * abstract *;
 [X]FR2738779  (PLASTIC OMNIUM CIE [FR]) [X] 1,3,14-16 * abstract *;
 [X]DE102006042627  (DECOMA GERMANY GMBH [DE]) [X] 1 * abstract *;
 [XD]US4926921  (HEINEMANN JOACHIM [DE], et al) [XD] 1,6 * the whole document *
by applicantUS4926921
    - P.W. JENSEN, "Raumbedarf und Wirkungsgrad zusammengestzter Planetenradergetriebe", KONSTRUKTION, (1969), vol. 21, no. 5